California Eastern District Court
Judge:Lawrence J O'Neill
Referred: Sheila K Oberto
Case #: 1:16-cv-00363
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2016
Terminated:Jul 24, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Sep 11, 2016 2:38 AM PDT
Defendant
Detective Marius Barsteceanu
Represented By
James J. Arendt
Weakley & Arendt, LLP
contact info
Defendant
County of Kings
Represented By
James J. Arendt
Weakley & Arendt, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Deputy Taylor Lopes
Represented By
James J. Arendt
Weakley & Arendt, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Deputy Thomas Olson
Represented By
James J. Arendt
Weakley & Arendt, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Law Enforcement Officers
Plaintiff
Stacey Berbereia
Represented By
Kevin Gerard Little
Law Office Of Kevin G. Little
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Hanson
Represented By
Kevin Gerard Little
Law Office Of Kevin G. Little
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Albert Hanson
Represented By
Kevin Gerard Little
Law Office Of Kevin G. Little
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly Niz
Represented By
Kevin Gerard Little
Law Office Of Kevin G. Little
contact info

GPO Sep 20 2017
ORDER GRANTING the Parties' Joint Request to Extend the Deadlines for Non-Expert Discovery, Expert Disclosures, and Expert Discovery. The deadline for non-expert discovery is EXTENDED from September 18, 2017 to October 2, 2017. The deadline for expert disclosures is EXTENDED from September 15, 2017 to October 3, 2017. The deadline for supplemental expert disclosures is EXTENDED from October 6, 2017 to October 24, 2017. The deadline for expert discovery is EXTENDED from November 17, 2017 to November 24, 2017. These extensions do not alter any other existing scheduling deadlines, including motion deadlines, pretrial conference, or trial dates. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/19/2017. (Timken, A)
GPO Sep 26 2017
Stipulation and Protective Order authorizing limited disclosure of confidential records, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/26/2018. (Rosales, O)
GPO Nov 02 2017
STIPULATION and ORDER to EXTEND the Deadline for Expert Discovery. (1) The deadline for expert discovery is EXTENDED from November 24, 2017 to December 29, 2017. (2) The deadline for filing dispositive pretrial motions is EXTENDED from December 22, 2017 to January 5, 2018; and (3) The hearing for dispositive pretrial motions is EXTENDED from February 14, 2018, to February 28, 2018. (4) This modification does not change any other existing scheduling deadlines, including the pretrial conference and trial dates. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/2/2017. (Timken, A)
GPO Jan 02 2018
ORDER Granting 22 Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order Granting Defendants Leave to Exceed the 25 Page Limit for Moving Papers, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/2/2018. (Defendants are granted leave from the 25 page limit requirement for moving papers, not to exceed 30 pages. In the interest of fairness, Plaintiffs may also exceed the page limit for their opposition brief by no more than five pages.)(Gaumnitz, R)
GPO Apr 03 2018
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 3, 2018. (ECF No. 26) (Munoz, I)
GPO Apr 17 2018
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 17, 2018. (ECF No. 43). Motion Hearing currently set for 5/14/2018 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
GPO May 07 2018
RDER ON COUNSELS' STIPULATIONS RE: TRIAL EVIDENCE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 7, 2018. Doc. 45(Munoz, I)
GPO Jul 24 2018
ORDER Granting Stipulation for Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 07/23/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
62 62 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 07/24 10:46 AM
ORDER Granting Stipulation for Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 07/23/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 20, 2018
61 61 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 07/20 3:05 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL [FRCP 41(a)] by Marius Barsteceanu, County of Kings, Taylor Lopes, Thomas Olson. (Arendt, James)
Related: [-]