California Northern District Court
Judge:Thelton E Henderson
Case #: 3:16-cv-01306
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2016
Last checked: Monday Sep 12, 2016 2:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Starbucks Corporation
Represented By
Fred R. Puglisi
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Robin Andrea Achen
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Sascha Von Mende Henry
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Robert James Guite
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin Robles
Represented By
Scott A. Bursor
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Gerald R Healy
Military Justice Attorneys, PLLC
contact info
John Hafemann
Military Justice Attorneys, PLLC
contact info
Julia A. Luster
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Siera Strumlauf
Represented By
Scott A. Bursor
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Gerald R Healy
Military Justice Attorneys, PLLC
contact info
John Hafemann
Military Justice Attorneys, PLLC
contact info
Julia A. Luster
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 11, 2017
87 87 order Order Fri 08/11 2:19 PM
ORDER re: August 11, 2017 Status Conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/11/2017. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
Related: [-]
86 86 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Fri 08/11 12:58 PM
RESPONSE to re 85 Telephone Conference, by Starbucks Corporation. (Guite, Robert) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
Related: [-]
85 85 minutes Telephone Conference Fri 08/11 11:32 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson: Telephone Conference held on 8/11/2017. Court to issue written order. Total Time in Court: 10 Minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiffs' Attorney: Neal Deckant. Defendant Attorneys: Sascha Henry; Robert Guite. This is a text-only Minute Entry (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/11/2017)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2017
84 84 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Thu 08/10 4:13 PM
RESPONSE to re83 Case Management Statement by Starbucks Corporation.(Guite, Robert) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, August 09, 2017
83 83 misc Case Management Statement Wed 08/09 1:18 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Supplemental) filed by Brittany Crittenden, Benjamin Robles, Siera Strumlauf. (Deckant, Neal) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
Related: [-]