New Hampshire District Court
Case #: 1:16-mj-00028
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2016
Terminated:Apr 20, 2016
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2018 3:51 PM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Arnold H. Huftalen
Us Attorney'S Office (nh)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ryan J. Vallee (1)
Terminated: 04/20/2016
Represented By
Jonathan R. Saxe
Federal Defender'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/21/2020 3:16 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 16, 2016
ENDORSED ORDER granting 3 Motion to Seal as to Ryan J. Vallee (1). Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (kad)
Related: [-]
Arrest Warrant Issued as to Ryan J. Vallee by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Original warrant and copies to US Marshal and US Probation.(kad)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Ryan J. Vallee.(kad)
Related: [-]
NOTICE to Attorneys of Record: Defendant taken into custody. The case has been unsealed. All future pleadings shall be filed in accordance with this district's Supplemental Rules for Electronic Case Filing. (kad)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Ryan J. Vallee. Initial Appearance set for 3/16/2016 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (kad)
Related: [-]
ENDORSED ORDER approving 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Jonathan Saxe appointed in the case as to Ryan J. Vallee (1). Text of Order: Request approved. Appoint counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (kad)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Ryan J. Vallee held on 3/16/2016. Defendant advised of rights & charges. Court approves financial affidavit. Upon motion of the government, defendant ordered temporarily detained pending a preliminary and detention hearing st for 3/21/2016 at 11:00 a.m. (Tape #3:42) (Govt Atty: Arnie Huftalen) (Defts Atty: Jonathan Saxe) (USP: Matt DiCarlo)(Total Hearing Time: 4 min.) (kad)
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone as to Ryan J. Vallee (1). Original document available in clerks office. (kad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 15 pgs Redacted Affidavit
3 3 MOTION to Seal at Level I until defendant is taken into custody by USA as to Ryan J. Vallee. (kad)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel with Financial Declaration by Ryan J. Vallee. Document available in clerks office. (kad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Financial Declaration
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Ryan J. Vallee. Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing set for 3/21/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (kad)
Related: [-]