Case Filed:Apr 12, 2012
Creditor Meeting:Dec 11, 2012
Claims Deadline:Sep 26, 2014
Converted:Oct 22, 2012
Terminated:May 29, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Salta Group, Inc.
666 Vernon Ave
Glencoe, IL 60022-1619
Represented By
Law Office of William J Factor
contact info
Sara E Lorber
The Law Office Of William J. Factor
contact info
William J Factor
The Law Office Of William J. Factor, Ltd
contact info
David Paul Holtkamp
The Law Office Of William J. Factor, Ltd
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Alex D Moglia, ESQ
Moglia Advisors 1325 Remington Rd, Ste H
Schaumburg, IL 60173
Represented By
Stuart Evans
Carlson Dash LLC
contact info
Jeffrey E Altshul
Carlson Dash LLC
contact info
Kurt M. Carlson
Carlson Dash LLC
contact info
Carlson Dash LLC
contact info
Colleen E McManus
Carlson Dash, LLC
contact info
Autumn L. Sharp
Carlson Dash, LLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604
Represented By
Denise A Delaurent
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/13/2012 2:42 AM CDT
Thursday, April 12, 2012
1 1 7 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Fee Amount $1046, Filed by William J Factor on behalf of Salta Group, Inc. (Factor, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 Declaration Re: Electronic Filing of Petition and Accompanying Documents. Filed by William J Factor on behalf of Salta Group, Inc.. (Factor, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-14899 [misc,volp11a] (1046.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19896038. Fee Amount $1046.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]