The Wuster v. Jia Dyi Enterprise Co., Ltd. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Amy Totenberg |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00890 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 17, 2016 6:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Apex Global Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Jia Dyi Enterprise Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Lone Wolf Distributors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Palco Marketing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Spartan Imports
|
|
Defendant
WE Tactical Training Ltd., Co.
|
|
Defendant
Ye Kai Enterprise Co., Ltd.
|
|
Plaintiff
The Wuster
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
KWA Performance Industries, Inc.
Terminated: 05/12/2016
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
43 | 43
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 10/03 2:49 PM
Certified copy of ORDER of USCA DISMISSING38 Notice of Appeal filed by The Wuster for want of prosecution because the Appellant failed to file CORRECTED appendix within the time fixed by the rules; Motion for extension to file response to motion filed by Appellant The Wuster is DENIED AS MOOT; Motion for sanctions filed by Appellee Lone Wolf Distributors, Inc., is DENIED AS MOOT. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 16-14826 AA. (kac) |
|
Wednesday, July 20, 2016 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified
Wed 07/20 2:08 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re:38 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 16-14826 AA. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (kac) |
||
Wednesday, July 13, 2016 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
USCA Acknowledgment
Wed 07/13 11:03 AM
USCA Acknowledgment of38 Notice of Appeal filed by The Wuster. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 16-14826 AA. (kac) |
|
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
Documents forwarded to USCA
Tue 07/12 11:33 AM
Forwarded docket sheets reflecting Payment of Appeal Fees to USCA re:38 Notice of Appeal filed by The Wuster. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 00-00000 00. (kac) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
appeal
Payment of Appeal Fees online
Fri 07/08 7:08 AM
Payment of Appeal Fees re38 Notice of Appeal by The Wuster. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113E-6556849. (Woodard, Jamie) |
||
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Fri 06/24 8:53 AM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Clerk's Judgment, Orders and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:38 Notice of Appeal. (kac) |
|
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 06/24 8:50 AM
NOTICE Of Filing Appeal Transmission Letter by The Wuster re:38 Notice of Appeal. (kac) |
|
38 | 38
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 06/24 8:26 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to37 Clerk's Judgment,36 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, by The Wuster. Transcript Order Form due on 7/8/2016 (Woodard, Jamie) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 06/23 8:16 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT DISMISSING this civil action. (jtj) |
|
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 06/23 8:10 AM
ORDER GRANTING13 and27 Motions to Dismiss. The case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Wuster is free to re-file its contribution and indemnity claims when they are ripe, taking care, when it does, to sufficiently allege jurisdiction. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/22/2016. (jtj) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 06/23 8:17 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jtj) |
||
Friday, June 17, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 06/17 6:14 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Wuster.(Woodard, Jamie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jamie P. Woodard, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Kent Wu, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in Related Case, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Order on Motion to Amend in Related Case | ||
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Fri 06/10 1:39 PM
CERTIFICATE of Compliance re15 Order, by Kenton Jones Coppage on behalf of Palco Marketing, Inc. (Coppage, Kenton) Modified on 6/10/2016 to edit event text (bnw) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/09 1:14 PM
ORDER GRANTING26 Application of KENDAL B. REED for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/09/2016. (jtj) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/08 2:22 PM
NOTICE by The Wuster re1 Complaint, of Receipt of Responsive Paper from Defendant Jia Dyi Enterprise Co., Ltd.(Woodard, Jamie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Responsive Paper From Defendant | ||
31 | 31
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Wed 06/08 2:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re15 Order, by Jamie Ponder Woodard on behalf of The Wuster (Woodard, Jamie) |
|
30 | 30
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/08 2:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The Wuster of Defendant Jia Dyi Enterprise Co., Ltd.(Woodard, Jamie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service | ||
29 | 29
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Wed 06/08 2:05 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by The Wuster. (Woodard, Jamie) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Tue 06/07 1:35 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Palco Marketing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cybergun International, S.A. for Palco Marketing, Inc.. (Coppage, Kenton) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
misc
Approval of Application for Admission PHV
Mon 06/06 12:46 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:26 APPLICATION for Admission of KENDAL B. REED Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6464823). Attorney Kendal B. Reed added appearing on behalf of Palco Marketing, Inc. (pb) |
||
Friday, June 03, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Dismiss
Fri 06/03 1:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Palco Marketing, Inc..(Coppage, Kenton) |
|
Att: 1 Brief | ||
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/19 3:46 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of KENDAL B. REED Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6464823)by Palco Marketing, Inc..(Coppage, Kenton) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 05/19 2:37 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lone Wolf Distributors, Inc.. (Birg, Erika) |
|
utility
Submission to District Judge
Thu 05/19 9:53 AM
Submission of13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, submitted to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) |
||
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 05/12 12:46 PM
ORDER GRANTING23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint. The time within which Palco may appear by answer or motion is extended to June 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/12/2016. (jtj) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint
Thu 05/12 12:21 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, through and including June 3, 2016, by Palco Marketing, Inc..(Coppage, Kenton) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Thu 05/12 8:06 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to KWA Performance Industries, Inc. only pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i). (jtj) |
||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Thu 05/12 12:29 PM
Submission of23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, through and including June 3, 2016, , submitted to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) |
||
Wednesday, May 11, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 05/11 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant KWA Performance Industries, Inc. filed by The Wuster (Woodard, Jamie) |
|
Sunday, May 01, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Sun 05/01 6:05 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Wuster.(Woodard, Jamie) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kent Wu, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jamie P. Woodard, Esq., | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Order in Underlying Litigation on Personal Jurisdiction, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Order in Underlying Litigation on Motion to Amend | ||
Tuesday, April 26, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Tue 04/26 5:21 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel (Certificate of Compliance) by Lucas Allen Westby on behalf of Lone Wolf Distributors, Inc. (Westby, Lucas) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Leave of Absence
Tue 04/26 5:19 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 1-6, 2016, by Erika C. Birg. (Birg, Erika) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Tue 04/26 5:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel (Certificate of Compliance) by Erika C. Birg on behalf of Lone Wolf Distributors, Inc. (Birg, Erika) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/26 12:45 PM
ORDER GRANTING16 Motion for Extension of Time. The time within which KWA may appear by answer or motion is extended by a period of 30 days. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/26/2016. (jtj) |
|
utility
Submission to District Judge
Tue 04/26 9:37 AM
Submission of16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, submitted to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) |
||
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 04/25 8:17 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Appear by Answer or Motion re:1 Complaint, by The Wuster.(Woodard, Jamie) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Wed 04/20 4:49 PM
STANDING ORDER: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel In Cases Proceeding Before The Honorable Amy Totenbert. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/20/2016. (tcc) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/18 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Allen Westby on behalf of Lone Wolf Distributors, Inc. (Westby, Lucas) |
|
Friday, April 15, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 04/15 2:16 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Lone Wolf Distributors, Inc..(Birg, Erika) |
|
Att: 1 Brief | ||
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 04/11 12:04 PM
Return of Service Executed by The Wuster. Lone Wolf Distributors, Inc. served on 3/27/2016. Answer due 4/17/2016. (Woodard, Jamie) Modified on 4/11/2016 to reflect e-filed document. (jtj) |
|
11 | 11
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 04/11 12:02 PM
Return of Service Executed by The Wuster. KWA Performance Industries, Inc. served on 4/05/2016. Answer due 4/26/2016. (Woodard, Jamie) Modified on 4/11/2016 to reflect e-filed document. (jtj) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 03/24 12:51 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Apex Global Trading Co., Ltd., Jia Dyi Enterprise Co., Ltd., KWA Performance Industries, Inc., Lone Wolf Distributors, Inc., Palco Marketing, Inc., Spartan Imports, WE Tactical Training Ltd., Co., and Ye Kai Enterprise Co., Ltd. (jtj) |
|
9 | 9
service
Proposed Summons
Thu 03/24 12:13 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by The Wuster to Defendant Jia Dyi Enterprise Co., Ltd. (Woodard, Jamie) |
|
8 | 8
service
Proposed Summons
Thu 03/24 12:12 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by The Wuster to Defendant KWA Performance Industries, Inc. (Woodard, Jamie) |
|
7 | 7
service
Proposed Summons
Thu 03/24 12:11 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by The Wuster To Defendant Ye Kai Enterprise Co., Ltd. (Woodard, Jamie) |
|
6 | 6
service
Proposed Summons
Thu 03/24 12:09 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by The Wuster to Defendant Spartan Imports (Woodard, Jamie) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proposed Summons
Thu 03/24 12:08 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by The Wuster to Defendant Apex Global Trading Co., Ltd. (Woodard, Jamie) |
|
4 | 4
service
Proposed Summons
Thu 03/24 12:06 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by The Wuster to Defendant WE Tactical Training Ltd., Co. (Woodard, Jamie) |
|
3 | 3
service
Proposed Summons
Thu 03/24 12:05 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by The Wuster to Defendant Lone Wolf Distributors, Inc. (Woodard, Jamie) |
|
2 | 2
service
Proposed Summons
Thu 03/24 12:03 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by The Wuster to Defendant Palco Marketing, Inc. d/b/a Palco Sports (Woodard, Jamie) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/21 3:42 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by The Wuster. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6354974.)(rjs) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |