New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:16-cv-02137
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2016
Terminated:Apr 08, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Sep 18, 2016 5:18 AM EDT
ADR Provider
Columbia University
Office of the General Counsel 412 Low Memorial Library 535 West 116th Street
New York, NY 10027
Defendant
Columbia University
Office of the General Counsel 412 Low Memorial Library 535 West 116th Street
New York, NY 10027
Represented By
Christopher Saleh Bouriat
New York City Law Department
contact info
Rachel Sarah Fischer
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Joseph C. O'Keefe, Jr
Proskauer Rose Llp (newark)
contact info
Susan Deegan Friedfel
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Bettina Barasch Plevan
Proskauer Rose Llp (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Geert Bekaert
560 Riverside Drive, Apt. 15M
New York, NY 10027
Represented By
Edward Hernstadt
Hernstadt Atlas, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ms. Enrichetta Ravina
130 W 78th St #4A
New York City, NY 10024
Represented By
Jeremy Heisler
Sanford Heisler Kimpel, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Enrichetta Ravina
130 W 78th St #4A
New York City, NY 10024
Represented By
David W. Sanford
Sanford Heisler Kimpel, Llp (dc)
contact info
Jeremy Heisler
Sanford Heisler Kimpel, LLP
contact info
Katherine M. Kimpel
Sanford Heisler Kimpel, Llp (dc)
contact info
Alexandra Harwin
Sanford Heisler Kimpel, Llp (dc)
contact info
Andrew C Melzer
Sanford Heisler, LLP
contact info


1. Columbia prof files $20M sex harass suit vs. horndog boss (nydailynews.com)
Submitted Thu 03/24/2016
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 10, 2020
397 397 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 04/10 10:11 AM
DECLARATION of Alexandra Harwin in Support re:371 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs .. Document filed by Enrichetta Ravina..(Harwin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Tuesday, April 07, 2020
396 396 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/07 1:10 PM
ORDER: The Court's March 6, 2020 Opinion and Order directed Ravina to file the exhibits to her October 16, 2019 letter in unredacted form by April 1, 2020. Dkt. 391. Ravina has not yet filed the exhibits. She shall do so no later than April 10, 2020. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/7/2020) (rj)
Related: [-]