Arizona District Court
Judge:Neil V Wake
Case #: 2:16-cv-00765
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2016
Terminated:Jan 26, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Sep 17, 2016 2:13 AM MST
Defendant
Kari Savage
Represented By
Jason Keith Reed
Mesa City Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Tom Steffa
Represented By
Jason Keith Reed
Mesa City Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Frank Milstead
Represented By
Jason Keith Reed
Mesa City Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
John Meza
Represented By
Jason Keith Reed
Mesa City Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Mesa, City of
Represented By
Jason Keith Reed
Mesa City Attorneys Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Nick Grasso
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
David Blanco
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Kirk Wieder
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Whitt
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashley Butler
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald Tizzano
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Sungaard
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Lonnie Schleicher
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
William John Sanders
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Mae Sanders
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Maria Riojas
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Preble
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Victor Kittle
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Christopher Price
Terminated: 07/29/2016
Defendant
Patricia A Tracey
Terminated: 07/29/2016
Represented By
Jason Keith Reed
Mesa City Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Karen Savage
Terminated: 07/29/2016
Represented By
Jason Keith Reed
Mesa City Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Richard Garcia
Terminated: 07/29/2016
Represented By
Jason Keith Reed
Mesa City Attorneys Office
contact info
Plaintiff
HAMC 81 LLC
Terminated: 07/29/2016
Represented By
Marcy Elissa Golomb
Marcy E Golomb Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, January 26, 2017
33 33 order Clerks Judgment Thu 01/26 10:08 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the Court's Order filed December 23, 2016, judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. Plaintiffs to take nothing, and this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (LAD)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2016
32 32 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 12/23 9:00 AM
ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc.27 ) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by 01/20/17. If Plaintiffs do not file an amended complaint by 01/20/17, the Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing this case with prejudice and close this case. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V. Wake on 12/23/16. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2016
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 09/15 2:19 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:27 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Mesa, City of, John Meza, Frank Milstead, Kari Savage, Tom Steffa. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Jason
Wednesday, September 07, 2016
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 09/07 2:05 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:27 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club.(Golomb, Marcy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit a,
Att: 2 Exhibit b,
Att: 3 Exhibit c,
Att: 4 Exhibit e,
Att: 5 Exhibit f,
Att: 6 Exhibit g,
Att: 7 Exhibit h,
Att: 8 Exhibit D Part One,
Att: 9 Exhibit D Part two,
Att: 10 Exhibit D Part Three
Wednesday, August 31, 2016
29 29 order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Wed 08/31 11:47 AM
ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation (Doc.28 ). FURTHER ORDERED extending the time within which Plaintiffs may file their Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss from 08/29/16 to 09/06/16. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V. Wake on 8/31/16. (NKS)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Stipulation Wed 08/31 12:09 AM
STIPULATION to extend time to file Respomse to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club.(Golomb, Marcy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Doctor letter
Thursday, August 11, 2016
27 27 motion Dismiss Case Thu 08/11 4:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Mesa, City of, John Meza, Frank Milstead, Kari Savage, Tom Steffa. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Jason
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
Friday, July 29, 2016
26 26 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 07/29 11:06 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First against All Defendants filed by Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club.(Golomb, Marcy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2016
25 25 order Order on Stipulation Fri 07/15 3:12 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation for Plaintiffs to file an Amended Complaint (Doc.24 ), and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation (Doc.24 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiffs shall file an Amended Complaint by July 29, 2016. Defendants City of Mesa, Commissioner Garcia, Patricia Tracey, Chief John Meza, Frank Milstead, Officer Steffa, and Officer Savage shall respond to the Amended Complaint in the time specified by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/15/2016. (REK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2016
24 24 misc Stipulation Thu 07/14 3:12 PM
STIPULATION for Plaintiffs to File Their First Amended Complaint by Richard Garcia, Mesa, City of, John Meza, Frank Milstead, Karen Savage, Tom Steffa, Patricia A Tracey. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Jason
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 06, 2016
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 07/06 11:17 AM
ORDER granting the Request for Extension (Doc.22 ). FURTHER ORDERED extending the time for Defendants City of Mesa, Commissioner Garcia, Patricia Tracey, Chief John Meza, Frank Milstead, Officer Steffa, and Officer Savage to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to and including 07/20/16. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/6/16. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2016
22 22 motion Extension of Time Tue 07/05 6:14 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint by Richard Garcia, Mesa, City of, John Meza, Frank Milstead, Karen Savage, Tom Steffa, Patricia A Tracey. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Jason
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
21 21 service Service Unexecuted Wed 06/22 4:21 PM
Service Returned Unexecuted by Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club : Complaint, Summons, Certificate of Corporate Disclosure and Order as to Christopher Price. (Golomb, Marcy)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Service Executed Wed 06/22 4:18 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club: Certificate of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Corporate Disclosure and Order upon Patricia Tracey on 6/14/16. (Golomb, Marcy)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Service Executed Wed 06/22 4:17 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club: Certificate of Service re: Complaint Summons, Corporate Disclosure and Order upon Richard Garcia on 6/14/16. (Golomb, Marcy)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Service Executed Wed 06/22 4:15 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club: Certificate of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Corporate Disclosure and Order upon Frank Milstead on 6/17/16. (Golomb, Marcy)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Service Executed Wed 06/22 4:13 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club: Certificate of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Corporate Disclosure and Order upon John Meza on 6/20/16. (Golomb, Marcy)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Service Executed Wed 06/22 4:11 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club: Certificate of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Corporate Disclosure and Order upon Tom Steffa on 6/17/16. (Golomb, Marcy)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Service Executed Wed 06/22 4:09 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Corporate Disclosure, Order upon Detectibe Savage on 6/21/16. (Golomb, Marcy)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service Executed Wed 06/22 4:06 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club: re: Complaint, Summons, Corporate Disclosure and Order upon City of Mesa on 6/14/16.(Golomb, Marcy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Proof of Service Tom Steffa,
Att: 2 Affidavit Service of Savage,
Att: 3 Affidavit Service Tracey,
Att: 4 Affidavit Service Garcia,
Att: 5 Affidavit Price,
Att: 6 Affidavit Meza,
Att: 7 Affidavit Milstead
Tuesday, May 24, 2016
13 13 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 05/24 3:59 PM
ORDER that this action shall be dismissed on or after 06/22/16, without further notice to Plaintiffs, unless before then Plaintiffs have served Defendants with process and have filed with the clerk of the court proof. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 5/24/16. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2016
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/04 4:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HAMC 81 LLC. (Golomb, Marcy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2016
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 03/25 10:09 AM
Summons Issued as to Frank Milstead. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2016
10 10 service Summons Submitted Thu 03/24 7:06 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club. (Golomb, Marcy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
9 9 order Order Wed 03/23 2:03 PM
ORDER that if any Defendant files a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) and 12(c) and if Plaintiffs contend any further amendment of their Complaint (Doc.1 ) can cure any alleged deficiency, Plaintiffs must submit, no later than the time they file a response to a motion to dismiss, a proposed amended complaint containing all further allegations Plaintiffs could make. FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event a motion to dismiss is granted in any part, no leave will be grant to amend the Complaint beyond what is offered in that proposed amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file notice of service. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 3/23/16. (NKS)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Submitted Wed 03/23 10:19 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club. (Golomb, Marcy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2016
7 7 order Order Tue 03/22 2:31 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file notice of service. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 3/22/16. (NKS)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Tue 03/22 10:25 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by HAMC 81 LLC, Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club, Donald Tizzano, Lonnie Schleicher, Wayne Whitt, Charles Sungaard, Kirk Wieder, Jennifer Mae Sanders, Matthew Preble, Victor Kittle, Nick Grasso, Jose Maria Riojas, Ashley Butler, David Blanco, William John Sanders. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 03/22 10:24 AM
Summons Issued as to Richard Garcia, Mesa, City of, John Meza, Christopher Price, Karen Savage, Tom Steffa, Patricia A Tracey. (REK)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/22 10:19 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to HAMC 81 LLC, Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club. (REK)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2016
3 3 misc New Case Opened Tue 03/22 10:18 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-12764803. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V. Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 16-00765 PHX-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Tue 03/22 10:17 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by David Blanco, Ashley Butler, Nick Grasso, HAMC 81 LLC, Victor Kittle, Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club, Matthew Preble, Jose Maria Riojas, Jennifer Mae Sanders, William John Sanders, Lonnie Schleicher, Charles Sungaard, Donald Tizzano, Wayne Whitt, Kirk Wieder. (submitted by Marcy Golomb) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/22 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-12764803 filed by Jose Maria Riojas, Matthew Preble, William John Sanders, Wayne Whitt, Mesa Hell's Angels Motorcycle Club, Ashley Butler, Donald Tizzano, Nick Grasso, Jennifer Mae Sanders, Charles Sungaard, HAMC 81 LLC, Victor Kittle, Lonnie Schleicher, Kirk Wieder, David Blanco. (submitted by Marcy Golomb)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet