California Central District Court
Judge:Christina A Snyder
Referred: Paul L Abrams
Case #: 8:16-cv-00544
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2016
Terminated:Nov 07, 2016
Last checked: Monday Sep 19, 2016 2:24 AM PDT
Defendant
DOES 1 THROUGH 50, Inclusive
Defendant
Richard Mackaig
25422 Sea Bluffs Dr. #6208
Dana Point, CA 92629
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Richard A. Mackaig
Represented By
Stephen E Abraham
Stephen Abraham Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Jag Simpson
Represented By
Peter C Holzer
Peter C Holzer Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, November 07, 2016
28 28 order Summary Judgment Mon 11/07 5:50 PM
MINUTES(IN CHAMBERS) - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION20 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. In accordance with the foregoing, defendant's motion for summary judgment is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff's request for more time is DENIED. Defendant's request for attorneys= fees is hereby DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2016
27 27 minutes Motion Hearing Summary Judgment Thu 10/27 3:37 PM
MINUTES OF Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication20 before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Hearing held. Tentative order provided. The Court confers with counsel and counsel argue. Plaintiff shall file a Declaration on or before November 3, 2016, as discussed in Court and on the record. The Court takes the above-referenced motion under submission. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2016
26 26 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 09/19 3:09 PM
OBJECTION in support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to in favor of Defendant as to Plaintiff's complaint and each cause of action therein or, alternatively, for summary adjudication as to each cause of action 20 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Peter Holzer filed by Defendant Richard A. Mackaig. (Abraham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 09/19 3:07 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to in favor of Defendant as to Plaintiff's complaint and each cause of action therein or, alternatively, for summary adjudication as to each cause of action 20 filed by Defendant Richard A. Mackaig. (Abraham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/19 10:50 AM
OPPOSITION Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Michael Jag Simpson. (Holzer, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2016
23 23 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 09/14 4:05 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder re: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. The Court is in receipt of the above-referenced filing and the supporting documents attached thereto, which should have been filed as a noticed motion16 . The Court is also in receipt of defendant's Objection filed on 8/24/201617 . The Court hereby denies the withdrawal of counsel for the plaintiff, without prejudice, until after such time the pending Motion for Summary Judgment20 is heard. Thereafter, plaintiff's counsel may renew his request by filing a noticed motion, if needed. Furthermore, the Court hereby denies the request for sanctions, without prejudice. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 05, 2016
22 22 misc For Judicial Notice Mon 09/05 1:09 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to in favor of Defendant as to Plaintiff's complaint and each cause of action therein or, alternatively, for summary adjudication as to each cause of action 20 filed by Defendant Richard A. Mackaig.(Abraham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh 11 - Prejudgment Claim,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh 12 - Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh 13 - Clerk's Judgment,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh 14 - UD Docket,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh 15 - Bankruptcy Petition,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh 16 - Bankruptcy Discharge Order,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exh 17 - Bankruptcy Docket,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exh 18 - Order Granting Relief from Stay (UD)
21 21 notice Notice of Lodging Mon 09/05 12:58 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Separate Statement of Undisptued Facts and Contentions of Law re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to in favor of Defendant as to Plaintiff's complaint and each cause of action therein or, alternatively, for summary adjudication as to each cause of action 20(Abraham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Separate Statement in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment
20 20 motion Summary Judgment Mon 09/05 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to in favor of Defendant as to Plaintiff's complaint and each cause of action therein or, alternatively, for summary adjudication as to each cause of action filed by Defendant Richard A. Mackaig. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Abraham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Richard Mackaig in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen Abraham in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, August 26, 2016
19 19 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Fri 08/26 2:33 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),16 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Request for Substitution of Counsel. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
17 17 misc Objection Wed 08/24 1:41 PM
OBJECTIONS to Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),16 filed by Defendant Richard A. Mackaig.(Abraham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Stephen Abraham in Support of Objection to Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Counsel
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 08/24 10:17 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Peter C Holzer counsel for Plaintiff Michael Jag Simpson. Peter C. Holzer is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Peter C. Holzer.(Holzer, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney,
Att: 2 5 pgs Memorandum In Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff
15 15 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 08/24 8:34 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Abrams for settlement. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) confer with each other and set a date and time for a settlement conference, after clearing the date with Magistrate Judge Abrams' clerk, Christianna Howard, (213) 894-7103. The date selected must be soon enough to comply with any deadlines imposed by the District Judge, but not before the parties have engaged in sufficient discussions to make a settlement conference meaningful. In general, the parties should contact the court clerk at least 30 days prior to the date on which they wish to hold the settlement conference. Please note that settlement conferences are usually conducted on Thursdays and begin at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ch)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2016
18 18 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 08/26 11:24 AM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court confers with counsel and schedules the following dates: Request for leave to file amended pleadings or to add parties 9/22/2016. Settlement Completion Cutoff 12/1/2016. Discovery cut-off 1/3/2017. Motions due by 1/6/2017. Telephone Status Conference re: Settlement set for 12/12/2016 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. All parties are ordered to discuss the matter with their clients and opposing counsel prior to the telephone conference. Counsel for DEFENDANT is ordered to initiate the telephone conference call THROUGH THE TELEPHONE OPERATOR to include all counsel of record, and CHAMBERS on the date and time scheduled. Pretrial Conference/Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 4/3/2017 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2017 09:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Motions in limine shall be noticed for the same date and time of the Pretrial Conference, and filed 21 days prior thereto. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (gk)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12) Tue 08/23 4:58 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Gandhi for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than December 1, 2016. The Court further sets a status conference for December 12, 2016, at 11:00 A.M. (By Telephone). See minute order for telephone instructions. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2016
13 13 misc Report Fri 07/15 7:09 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Richard A. Mackaig. (Abraham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2016
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 06/08 12:21 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2016
11 11 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 05/20 11:05 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (cj)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2016
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/13 5:51 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Richard A. Mackaig identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Abraham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/13 5:50 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Richard A. Mackaig.(Attorney Stephen E Abraham added to party Richard A. Mackaig(pty:dft))(Abraham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2016
8 8 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) Tue 05/10 8:29 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Plaintiff's Notice of Removal6 . The document is stricken. Plaintiff's counsel may file a Notice of Removal as a new action, if he wishes to remove the action to this Court. (gk)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Mon 05/09 4:14 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Plaintiff's Notice of Removal6 . The following error(s) was found: It appears that plaintiff is a defendant in a matter before the Orange County Superior Court, Case No. 30-2016 00839912-CL-UD-HNB. This matter filed as a subsequent filing under SACV 16-00544 CAS (PLAx) should have been filed as a new action. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2016
6 6 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 05/02 11:52 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California In and For the County of Orange, Harbor Justice Center, case number 30-2016 00839912-CL-UD-HNB with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 03/23/2016, receipt number 0973-17518955).(Holzer, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Complaint,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Prejudgment Claim TBF,
Att: 5 Notice of Confirmation of Filing,
Att: 6 EPOS,
Att: 7 Notice OSC Re Dismissal,
Att: 8 Ex Parte TBF,
Att: 9 POS,
Att: 10 Conformed Ex Parte,
Att: 11 Conformed EPOS,
Att: 12 Notice of Confirmation of Filing
Thursday, March 24, 2016
5 5 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/24 4:01 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Richard A. Mackaig. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Thu 03/24 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Exhibit Summons should not have been attached. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs.. (ghap)
Related: [-]
3 3 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 03/24 3:36 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 03/24 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/23 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17518955 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michael Jag Simpson. (Attorney Peter C Holzer added to party Michael Jag Simpson(pty:pla))(Holzer, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons