Utah District Court
Case #: 2:16-mj-00169
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2016
Terminated:Mar 30, 2016
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2018 12:20 PM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Andrea T. Martinez
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kory Mathew Slater (1)
Terminated: 03/30/2016
Represented By
Wendy M. Lewis
Utah Federal Defender Office
contact info


Tuesday, March 22, 2016
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT as to Kory Mathew Slater (1). Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (ksm)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/22/2016, filed on 3/24/2016 in case as to Kory Mathew Slater. (las)
Related: [-]