California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Referred: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:16-cv-01574
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2016
Terminated:Nov 12, 2020
Last checked: Monday Sep 26, 2016 1:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Dr. Robert M Califf
Represented By
Marissa Ann Piropato
Natural Resources Section
contact info
Mary Margaret Englehart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Kevin William McArdle
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Food and Drug Administration
Represented By
Marissa Ann Piropato
Natural Resources Section
contact info
Mary Margaret Englehart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Kevin William McArdle
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By
Marissa Ann Piropato
Natural Resources Section
contact info
Mary Margaret Englehart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Kevin William McArdle
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Represented By
Marissa Ann Piropato
Natural Resources Section
contact info
Mary Margaret Englehart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Kevin William McArdle
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Intervenor Dft
AquaBounty Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Stanley H Abramson
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Karen E Carr
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Donald C. McLean
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Lynn R. Fiorentino
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Golden Gate Salmon Association
Represented By
Stephen Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Brettny Elaine Hardy
Earthjustice
contact info
Adam Keats
Center For Food Safety
contact info
George Andreas Kimbrell
Center For Food Safety
contact info
Plaintiff
The Quinault Indian Nation
Represented By
Stephen Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Adam Keats
Center For Food Safety
contact info
Plaintiff
Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations
Represented By
Stephen Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Brettny Elaine Hardy
Earthjustice
contact info
Adam Keats
Center For Food Safety
contact info
George Andreas Kimbrell
Center For Food Safety
contact info
Plaintiff
Kennebec Reborn
Represented By
Stephen Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Brettny Elaine Hardy
Earthjustice
contact info
Adam Keats
Center For Food Safety
contact info
George Andreas Kimbrell
Center For Food Safety
contact info
Plaintiff
Institute for Fisheries Resources
Represented By
Stephen Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Brettny Elaine Hardy
Earthjustice
contact info
Adam Keats
Center For Food Safety
contact info
George Andreas Kimbrell
Center For Food Safety
contact info
Plaintiff
Friends of the Earth
Represented By
Stephen Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Brettny Elaine Hardy
Earthjustice
contact info
Adam Keats
Center For Food Safety
contact info
George Andreas Kimbrell
Center For Food Safety
contact info
Plaintiff
Friends of Merrymeeting Bay
Represented By
Stephen Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Brettny Elaine Hardy
Earthjustice
contact info
Adam Keats
Center For Food Safety
contact info
George Andreas Kimbrell
Center For Food Safety
contact info
Plaintiff
Food and Water Watch
Represented By
Stephen Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Brettny Elaine Hardy
Earthjustice
contact info
Adam Keats
Center For Food Safety
contact info
George Andreas Kimbrell
Center For Food Safety
contact info
Plaintiff
Ecology Action Centre
Represented By
Stephen Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Brettny Elaine Hardy
Earthjustice
contact info
Adam Keats
Center For Food Safety
contact info
George Andreas Kimbrell
Center For Food Safety
contact info
Plaintiff
Center for Food Safety
Represented By
Stephen Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Brettny Elaine Hardy
Earthjustice
contact info
Adam Keats
Center For Food Safety
contact info
George Andreas Kimbrell
Center For Food Safety
contact info
Plaintiff
Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By
Stephen Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Brettny Elaine Hardy
Earthjustice
contact info
Adam Keats
Center For Food Safety
contact info
George Andreas Kimbrell
Center For Food Safety
contact info
Plaintiff
Cascadia Wildlands
Represented By
Stephen Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Brettny Elaine Hardy
Earthjustice
contact info
Adam Keats
Center For Food Safety
contact info
George Andreas Kimbrell
Center For Food Safety
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2016
ORDER GRANTING 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Brettney E. Hardy. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 03/31/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016) Modified on 4/1/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
GPO Mar 31 2016
ORDER GRANTING 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Stephen D. Machuda. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 03/31/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016) Modified on 4/1/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
GPO Aug 30 2016
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 50 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.(vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
GPO Oct 04 2018
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 145 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Thomas E. Price, Robert M Califf, United States Food and Drug Administration, Sylvia Mathews Burwell. Plaintiffs' Opp/Cross-Motion for Judgment on Pleadings due by 10/26/2018. Defendants' Reply/Opp to Pls. Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings due by 12/17/2018. Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings due by 1/14/2019. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 4, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
GPO Dec 19 2019
ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 198 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
GPO Nov 05 2020
Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 254 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 244 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment.(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
335 335 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/16 12:52 PM
NOTICE by Alex M. Azar, Stephen Hahn, United States Food and Drug Administration of Satisfaction on Remand(Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Environmental Assessment,
Att: 2 Exhibit Amended Finding of No Significant Impact