Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Mark E Walker
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 5:16-cv-00104
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2016
Terminated:Mar 13, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 27, 2016 5:31 AM EDT
Defendant
BAY COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD
802 W. 12th Street
Lynn Haven, FL 32444
Represented By
DIXON ROSS MCCLOY, JR
Harrison Sale Mccloy Etc - Panama City Fl
contact info
HEATHER KENNEDY HUDSON
Harrison Sale Mccloy Etc - Panama City Fl
contact info
Defendant
SAMUEL BLAND
"KEITH" IN HIS INDIVIDUAL AND OFFICIAL CAPACITIES 802 W. 12th Street
Lynn Haven, FL 32444
Represented By
DIXON ROSS MCCLOY, JR
Harrison Sale Mccloy Etc - Panama City Fl
contact info
HEATHER KENNEDY HUDSON
Harrison Sale Mccloy Etc - Panama City Fl
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM HUSFELT
Represented By
DIXON ROSS MCCLOY, JR
Harrison Sale Mccloy Etc - Panama City Fl
contact info
HEATHER KENNEDY HUDSON
Harrison Sale Mccloy Etc - Panama City Fl
contact info
Defendant
GLEN MANLEY
INDIVIDUALLY 802 W. 12th Street
Lynn Haven, FL 32444
Represented By
DIXON ROSS MCCLOY, JR
Harrison Sale Mccloy Etc - Panama City Fl
contact info
HEATHER KENNEDY HUDSON
Harrison Sale Mccloy Etc - Panama City Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES HALE
310 East Bradford Road
Tallahassee, FL 32303
Represented By
MARIE A MATTOX
Marie A Mattox Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
JULIE HALE
310 East Bradford Road
Tallahassee, FL 32303
Represented By
MARIE A MATTOX
Marie A Mattox Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
ESTATE OF VERN EPPINETTE
Terminated: 05/20/2016
INDIVIDUALLY 802 W. 12th Street
Lynn Haven, FL 32444
Represented By
DIXON ROSS MCCLOY, JR
Harrison Sale Mccloy Etc - Panama City Fl
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 13, 2017
42 42 order Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion) Mon 03/13 9:46 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re 41 Order, (jcw)
Related: [-]
41 41 order Order Mon 03/13 9:41 AM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL re 40 Notice of Settlement. The clerk must enter judgment stating, "The parties are ordered to comply with their settlement agreement. The court reserves jurisdiction to enforce the order to comply with the settlement agreement. All claims in this case are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41." The clerk must close the file. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/13/2017. (jcw)
Related: [-]
40 40 2 pgs notice Notice of Settlement Mon 03/13 7:45 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by JAMES HALE, JULIE HALE (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2017
39 39 order Pretrial Order Thu 03/09 3:31 PM
AMENDED ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/9/2017. Attorney Conference to take place by 5/16/2017 . Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/30/2017 . Jury Trial set for 7/10/2017 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2017 12:15 PM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2017
38 38 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 03/07 10:48 AM
ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES AND RESETTING JURY TRIAL re denying as moot 37 Joint MOTION to Set Status Conference. The jury trial is rescheduled for Monday, July 10, 2017. The Clerk shall cancel the pretrial now scheduled for April 5, 2017, along with the jury trial scheduled for May 1, 2017, and the deadlines as set forth in ECF No. 30, and shall enter a revised pretrial order. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/7/2017. ( Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/14/2017 ., Mediation to take place by 3/31/2017 ., Mediation Report due by 4/14/2017 ., Jury Trial set for 7/10/2017 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE MARK E WALKER.) (jcw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2017
37 37 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/06 5:30 PM
Joint MOTION to Set Status Conference by JAMES HALE. (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
36 36 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 03/01 6:12 PM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Seventh Supplemental Statement of Compliance With Rule 26 by JAMES HALE, JULIE HALE (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2017
35 35 misc Rule 26 Disclosures Thu 02/16 11:35 AM
RULE 26 Disclosures by BAY COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, SAMUEL BLAND, ESTATE OF VERN EPPINETTE, WILLIAM HUSFELT, GLEN MANLEY. (MCCLOY, DIXON)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2017
34 34 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 02/06 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Sixth Supplemental Statement of Compliance With Rule 26 by JAMES HALE, JULIE HALE (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
33 33 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/17 7:51 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re 32 MOTION to Extend Time to Complete Discovery File Dispositive Motions and Conduct Mediation filed by GLEN MANLEY, WILLIAM HUSFELT, SAMUEL BLAND, BAY COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/17/2017 . Discovery due by 2/28/2017 . Mediation to take place by 3/3/2017 . Mediation Report due by 4/11/2017 . Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/17/17. (kgc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 16, 2017
32 32 motion Extend Time Mon 01/16 4:16 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to Complete Discovery File Dispositive Motions and Conduct Mediation by BAY COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, SAMUEL BLAND, WILLIAM HUSFELT, GLEN MANLEY. (MCCLOY, DIXON)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 01/16 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Fifth Supplemental Statement of Compliance With Rule 26 by JAMES HALE, JULIE HALE (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2016
30 30 order Pretrial Order Thu 12/29 11:00 AM
ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/29/2016. Attorney Conference to take place by 3/14/2017 . Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/28/2017 . Jury Trial set for 5/1/2017 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2017 12:15 PM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
29 29 misc Amended Document - NOT Motion Wed 12/21 10:40 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by BAY COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, SAMUEL BLAND, WILLIAM HUSFELT, GLEN MANLEY. Defendants' Third Amended Statement of Compliance with Rule 26 . (MCCLOY, DIXON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2016
28 28 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 12/13 4:34 PM
NOTICE Defendants' Second Amended Statement of Compliance with Rule 26 by BAY COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, SAMUEL BLAND, WILLIAM HUSFELT, GLEN MANLEY (MCCLOY, DIXON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2016
27 27 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 11/03 3:45 PM
NOTICE Defendants' Amended Statement of Compliance With Rule 26 by BAY COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, SAMUEL BLAND, WILLIAM HUSFELT, GLEN MANLEY (MCCLOY, DIXON)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
26 26 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 11/02 6:05 PM
NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental Statement of Compliance With Rule 26 by JAMES HALE, JULIE HALE (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2016
25 25 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 10/05 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Statement Of Compliance With Rule 26 by JAMES HALE, JULIE HALE (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
24 24 misc Status Report Wed 09/28 11:28 AM
STATUS REPORT by BAY COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, SAMUEL BLAND, WILLIAM HUSFELT, GLEN MANLEY. (MCCLOY, DIXON)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 09/28 8:58 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:11 Initial Scheduling Order - Status report has not been filed. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2016
23 23 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 09/14 7:10 PM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Statement of Compliance With Rule 26 by JAMES HALE, JULIE HALE (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 09/14 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Service of Proposals for Settlement by BAY COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, SAMUEL BLAND, WILLIAM HUSFELT, GLEN MANLEY (MCCLOY, DIXON) Modified on 9/14/2016 to remove all caps text. (jws)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2016
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 08/25 8:52 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/23/2016 . (jcw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
21 21 misc Status Report Wed 08/24 8:35 AM
STATUS REPORT by BAY COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, SAMUEL BLAND, WILLIAM HUSFELT, GLEN MANLEY. (MCCLOY, DIXON)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2016
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 08/22 9:04 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:11 Scheduling Order - Status report has not been filed. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2016
20 20 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation Thu 07/14 2:05 PM
SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER: Discovery due by 1/16/2017 . Dispositive Motions to be filed by 2/6/2017 . Mediation Report due by 2/27/2017 . Jury Trial set for 5/1/2017 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/14/2016. (jem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2016
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 07/13 8:37 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (jcw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2016
19 19 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Tue 07/12 5:10 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2016
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 07/01 8:17 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/1/2016 . (kgc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2016
18 18 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 06/24 11:41 AM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint by BAY COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, SAMUEL BLAND, WILLIAM HUSFELT, GLEN MANLEY. (MCCLOY, DIXON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2016
17 17 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 06/16 12:11 PM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE AND ACCEPTING THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AS FILED re 15 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff's third amended complaint, ECF No. 16 , is accepted as filed. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/16/2016. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/15 5:22 PM
Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JAMES HALE. (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Amend/Correct - for Requesting Leave of Court to Amend Wed 06/15 5:21 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct by JAMES HALE. (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2016
14 14 30+ pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/10 9:50 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JAMES HALE. (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2016
13 13 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Mon 06/06 3:37 PM
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME re 12 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiffs shall file their second amended complaint on or before June 10, 2016. Defendants shall file their response to the second amended complaint on or before June 17, 2016. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/6/2016. (jcw)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extend Time Mon 06/06 2:00 PM
MOTION to Extend Time by BAY COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, WILLIAM HUSFELT, GLEN MANLEY. (MCCLOY, DIXON)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/06 3:40 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings - Answer to second amended complaint due by 6/17/2016 . Second Amended Complaint due by 6/10/2016 . (jcw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2016
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/31 9:30 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/31/2016. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/14/2016 . Discovery due by 9/26/2016 . Status Report due by 6/30/2016 .) (jcw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2016
10 10 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 05/20 12:08 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTIONS AS MOOT re 8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/20/2016. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2016
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 05/19 8:32 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JAMES HALE. (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2016
8 8 motion More Definite Statement Dismiss Strike Thu 05/05 9:36 AM
MOTION for More Definite Statement ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/19/2016) .), MOTION to Dismiss ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/19/2016) .), MOTION to Strike by BAY COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, SAMUEL BLAND, ESTATE OF VERN EPPINETTE, WILLIAM HUSFELT, GLEN MANLEY. (MCCLOY, DIXON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2016
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 04/26 7:42 AM
Summons Issued as to ESTATE OF VERN EPPINETTE, GLEN MANLEY. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2016
6 6 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 04/25 12:59 PM
NOTICE Notice of Summonses to be issued by Clerk by JAMES HALE, JULIE HALE re1 Complaint (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 summons
Monday, April 11, 2016
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 04/11 10:37 AM
Summons Issued as to BAY COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, SAMUEL BLAND, WILLIAM HUSFELT. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 10, 2016
4 4 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Sun 04/10 12:14 PM
NOTICE OF SUMMONSES TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK by JAMES HALE, JULIE HALE re1 Complaint (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 summons,
Att: 2 summons
Friday, April 01, 2016
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/01 9:15 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Fri 04/01 8:37 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re1 Complaint filed by JULIE HALE, JAMES HALE. In accordance with N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a completed Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44, Rev. 12/12) is to be filed as a separate filing with each civil case. Therefore, please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet," which is found under "Other Documents. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2016
1 1 30+ pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-3537021.), filed by JAMES HALE, JULIE HALE. (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet