Huff v. Ethicon, Inc.
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Phil Gilbert |
Referred: | Reona J Daly |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00368 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 28, 2016 4:49 AM CDT |
Defendant
Ethicon, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Huff
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 07 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, re: jurisdictional defect. Amended complaint due 4/21/2016. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/7/2016. (jdh) |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
51 | 51
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/19 8:38 AM
NOTICE case transferred confirmation received from Northern District of Georgia, 1:17-cv-02268. (dmw2) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
50 | 50
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 06/16 11:19 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION - Case electronically transferred to Northern District of Georgia. (mar) |