Tennessee Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jennie D Latta
Case #: 2:12-bk-24257
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2012
Dismissed:Aug 02, 2013
Terminated:Aug 26, 2013

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $50,001 to $100,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Bogie's Deli Mendenhall S & G, LLC
715 S Mendenhall Rd
Memphis, TN 38117-5212
Represented By
Earnest E. Fiveash, Jr.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee One Memphis Place 200 Jefferson Avenue, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38103


Docket last updated: 04/25/2012 2:47 AM CDT
Monday, April 23, 2012
Matrix Filed by Earnest E. Fiveash Jr. on behalf of Debtor Bogie's Deli Mendenhall S & G, LLC. (Fiveash, Earnest)
Related: [-]
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-24257 [misc,volp11a] (1046.00) filing fee. Receipt number 18253415, amount $1046.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Filing Fee Due $1046, Filed by Bogie's Deli Mendenhall S & G, LLC Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 10/22/2012. Disclosure Statement due by 10/22/2012. (Fiveash, Earnest)
Related: [-]