Massachusetts District Court
Judge:F Dennis Saylor, IV
Case #: 1:16-cv-10659
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2016
Terminated:Jun 13, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Oct 01, 2016 6:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Mr. Roger Goodell
Defendant
Mr. Robert K. Kraft
Defendant
National Football League
Represented By
John D. Donovan, Jr.
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
John P. Bueker
Ropes & Gray - Ma
contact info
Defendant
Roger Goodell
Represented By
John D. Donovan, Jr.
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
John P. Bueker
Ropes & Gray - Ma
contact info
Defendant
Robert K. Kraft
Represented By
Daniel L. Goldberg
Bingham Mccutchen LLP
contact info
Charles L. Solomont
Bingham Mccutchen LLP
contact info
Emma D. Hall
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ms. Feihua Chang
Plaintiff
Mr. Michael DiMauro
Plaintiff
Mr. Todd Orsatti
Represented By
Seth Carey
Carey Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Mr. Joseph Payne
Plaintiff
Mr. David Vacarro
Plaintiff
Kenneth Wlodarczyk
Plaintiff
Fairuz Zein
Plaintiff
New England Patriots Fans
Represented By
Seth Carey
Carey Law
contact info

GPO Apr 08 2016
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered denying 3 Motion for TRO; denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Cox, Spencer)
GPO Jun 10 2016
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered granting 35 Motion to Dismiss; denying 41 Motion to Amend; denying 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants' motions to dismiss 20 and 35 are GRANTED. Count Eight of the complaint is dismissed. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining claims under state law. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the complaint 41 is DENIED. (Cox, Spencer)
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 13, 2016
49 49 order Order On Motion to Alter Judgment Wed 07/13 12:13 PM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying47 Motion to Alter Judgment. Defendants'47 Motion to Alter Judgment is DENIED. Defendants may renew their request for sanctions against plaintiffs or their counsel, including any request for attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, 28 U.S.C. sec. 1927, or other provision of law, within 21 days of the date of this order. (Cox, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2016
48 48 respm Response to Motion Tue 07/12 4:17 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re47 MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(b) filed by New England Patriots Fans. (Carey, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2016
47 47 motion Alter Judgment Fri 06/24 2:15 PM
MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(b) by Roger Goodell, National Football League.(Donovan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
46 46 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 06/16 8:13 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to22 Notice of Appeal filed by New England Patriots Fans. Appeal22 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
45 45 appeal USCA Judgment Thu 06/16 8:12 AM
USCA Judgment as to22 Notice of Appeal filed by New England Patriots Fans (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2016
44 44 order Order Mon 06/13 8:44 AM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2016
43 43 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Amend Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 06/10 4:55 PM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered granting35 Motion to Dismiss; denying41 Motion to Amend; denying20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants' motions to dismiss20 and35 are GRANTED. Count Eight of the complaint is dismissed. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining claims under state law. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the complaint41 is DENIED. (Cox, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2016
42 42 order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 06/07 4:46 PM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting40 Motion to Stay Discovery. Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery or for a Protective Order is GRANTED. No party shall take discovery pending further order of the Court. (Cox, Spencer)
Related: [-]
41 41 motion Amend Tue 06/07 1:32 PM
First MOTION to Amend1 Amended Complaint, by New England Patriots Fans.(Carey, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Amended Complaint
Thursday, June 02, 2016
40 40 motion Stay Thu 06/02 11:12 AM
MOTION to Stay Discovery OR for a Protective Order by Roger Goodell, National Football League.(Donovan, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2016
39 39 respm Opposition to Motion Mon 05/16 3:31 PM
Amended Opposition re20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (subject matter) and MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New England Patriots Fans. (Carey, Seth)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 14, 2016
38 38 respm Response to Motion Sat 05/14 1:05 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (subject matter) and MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New England Patriots Fans. (Carey, Seth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2016
37 37 order Order on Motion to Withdraw Reference Thu 04/28 9:27 AM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING34 Motion to Withdraw31 Motion for Entry of Default and32 Motion for Default and supporting affidavits. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2016
36 36 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 04/27 2:47 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert K. Kraft. (Hall, Emma)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Dismiss Wed 04/27 2:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Robert K. Kraft.(Hall, Emma)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Withdraw Reference Wed 04/27 2:43 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Reference to Motion for Entry of Default and Motion for Default and supporting affidavits by New England Patriots Fans.(Carey, Seth)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Opposition to Motion Wed 04/27 2:35 PM
Opposition re31 MOTION for Entry of Default of Defendant Robert Kraft ,32 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Robert Kraft filed by Robert K. Kraft.(Hall, Emma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
32 32 motion Default Judgment Wed 04/27 11:50 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Robert Kraft by New England Patriots Fans.(Carey, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Supplement Certificate of Service
31 31 motion Entry of Default Wed 04/27 11:47 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default of Defendant Robert Kraft by New England Patriots Fans.(Carey, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support for Entry of Default,
Att: 2 Supplement Cerificate of Service
Monday, April 25, 2016
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/25 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Goldberg on behalf of Robert K. Kraft (Goldberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
29 29 appeal USCA Case Number Mon 04/25 11:03 AM
USCA Case Number 16-1445 for22 Notice of Appeal filed by New England Patriots Fans. (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
28 28 appeal Notice of Interlocutory Appeal Fri 04/22 5:45 PM
Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re22 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/22 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Solomont on behalf of Robert K. Kraft (Solomont, Charles)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/22 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emma D. Hall on behalf of Robert K. Kraft (Hall, Emma)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/22 4:14 PM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Plaintiffs'23 Expedited Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is DENIED. Plaintiffs have not submitted sworn affidavits as to their financial circumstances, as required by statute. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1). Furthermore, the Court hereby certifies that such an appeal would not be taken in good faith, as it is plainly without merit. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 04/22 12:02 PM
Opposition re23 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Roger Goodell, National Football League. (Donovan, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2016
23 23 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/21 7:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by New England Patriots Fans.(Carey, Seth)
Related: [-]
22 22 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 04/21 7:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to9 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by New England Patriots Fans Fee Status: IFP requested. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at[LINK:http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov] MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 5/11/2016. (Carey, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2016
21 21 23 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 04/15 5:42 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (subject matter) and MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Roger Goodell, National Football League. (Donovan, John)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/15 5:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (subject matter) and , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 4/29/2016) by Roger Goodell, National Football League.(Donovan, John)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/15 8:18 AM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot18 Motion for removal of plaintiff Michael DiMauro. Plaintiff has been removed as per the Court's electronic order 17 . (Cox, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2016
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/14 1:47 PM
MOTION for Removal of Plaintiff Michael DiMauro.(Maynard, Timothy)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/14 9:38 AM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting16 Motion to Remove Plaintiffs Michael DiMauro and Feihua Chang. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/14 12:18 AM
MOTION Remove two Plaintiffs by New England Patriots Fans.(Carey, Seth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/12 5:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Bueker on behalf of Roger Goodell, National Football League (Bueker, John)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/12 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Donovan, Jr on behalf of Roger Goodell, National Football League (Donovan, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/12 1:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed National Football League served on 4/6/2016, answer due 4/27/2016. (Carey, Seth)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/12 1:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Roger Goodell served on 4/6/2016, answer due 4/27/2016. (Carey, Seth)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/12 1:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Robert K. Kraft served on 4/6/2016, answer due 4/27/2016. (Carey, Seth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2016
10 10 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/11 11:09 AM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying2 Expedited Motion for Abbreviated Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2016
9 9 order Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Fri 04/08 5:59 PM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered denying3 Motion for TRO; denying3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Cox, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2016
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 04/05 2:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Roger Goodell, Robert K. Kraft, National Football League. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Maynard, Timothy)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 04/05 2:16 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Abaid, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff Tue 04/05 2:10 PM
Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff: Amended Complaint was edited to reflect Complaint; A Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction was deleted from CM/ECF due to counsel error resulting in duplicate motion on the docket; Attachments were removed from the second filed Motion for TRO/ PI and re-docketed correctly as a Memorandum in Support and Affidavit in Support. Motion events were edited/added to reflect correct event type. As a result of significant edits being made to the docket, docket entry numbers were edited. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
5 5 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Tue 04/05 1:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re4 EXPEDITED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by New England Patriots Fans.(DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
4 4 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 04/05 1:49 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re4 EXPEDITED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by New England Patriots Fans. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Tue 04/05 2:25 AM
EXPEDITED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by New England Patriots Fans.(Carey, Seth). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 4/5/2016 (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
Att: 11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on TRO
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/05 1:51 AM
EXPEDITED MOTION for Abbreviated Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by New England Patriots Fans.(Carey, Seth) Modified event type and text on 4/5/2016 (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 15 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/05 1:39 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6053505 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) filed by New England Patriots Fans.(Carey, Seth) Modified on 4/5/2016 (Abaid, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplement Category Form,
Att: 3 Supplement Entry of Appearance