Delaware District Court
Judge:Gregory M Sleet
Case #: 1:16-cv-00233
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:25 Clayton Act
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2016
Terminated:May 05, 2016
Last checked: Monday Oct 03, 2016 5:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Baker Hughes Inc.
Represented By
Molly S. Boast
contact info
S. Mark Hurd
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Heather S. Tewksbury
contact info
Anne Shea Gaza
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Charles Platt
contact info
Samantha G. Wilson
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Harmut Schneider
contact info
James M. Yoch, Jr.
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Ethan Haller Townsend
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
David C. McBride
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Defendant
Halliburton Co.
Represented By
William C. Lavery
contact info
Wallace M. Allan
contact info
Anne Shea Gaza
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Samantha G. Wilson
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
James M. Yoch, Jr.
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
David C. McBride
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Stephen Weissman
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Blake W. Rushforth
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
John R. Read
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jennifer Lynne Hall
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Angela L. Hughes
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


1. DOJ Challenges Halliburton-Baker Hughes Deal (wsj.com)
Submitted Thu 04/07/2016
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 05, 2016
utility Terminate Case - Civil Thu 05/05 9:57 AM
CASE CLOSED. The May 18, 2016 Oral Argument has been removed from the Court's calendar. (mdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2016
34 34 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/04 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America(Hall, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Letter to Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Jennifer Hall
Tuesday, May 03, 2016
33 33 notice Notice - Other Tue 05/03 5:31 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Ethan H. Townsend) by Baker Hughes Inc. (Flynn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2016
32 32 discov Notice of Service Fri 04/29 12:45 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by United States of America.(Hall, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2016
31 31 discov Notice of Service Thu 04/28 6:17 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Halliburton Company's Initial Disclosures filed by Halliburton Co..(Gaza, Anne)
Related: [-]
30 30 discov Notice of Service Thu 04/28 5:59 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Baker Hughes Incorporated's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Baker Hughes Inc..(Flynn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2016
29 29 order SO ORDERED Wed 04/27 11:46 AM
SO ORDERED - re28 Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Discovery filed by Halliburton Co. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/27/2016. (mdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2016
28 28 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Mon 04/25 8:49 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Discovery re15 Proposed Order by Halliburton Co.. (Gaza, Anne) Modified on 4/25/2016 (mdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
27 27 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 04/22 11:32 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Baker Hughes Inc.. (Townsend, Ethan)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Fri 04/22 2:34 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Wallace M. Allan, Stephen Weissman, William C. Lavery for Halliburton Co. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2016
26 26 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Thu 04/21 3:51 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Halliburton Co.. (Gaza, Anne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2016
25 25 service Waiver of Service Exexuted - 60 day ddl Tue 04/19 11:35 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America: For Halliburton Co. waiver sent on 4/6/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Hughes, Angela)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2016
24 24 service Waiver of Service Exexuted - 60 day ddl Mon 04/18 4:55 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America: For Baker Hughes Inc. waiver sent on 4/6/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Hughes, Angela)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Mon 04/18 10:34 AM
SO ORDERED - re23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wallace M. Allan filed by Halliburton Co. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/18/2016. (mdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2016
order SO ORDERED Fri 04/15 9:49 AM
SO ORDERED - re15 Joint Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by United States of America. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/15/2016. (mdb)
Related: [-]
order Oral Order Fri 04/15 10:21 AM
ORAL ORDER SCHEDULING AN ORAL ARGUMENT HEARING: An Oral Argument Hearing re: D.I.5 has been set in this matter for Wednesday, May 18, 2016, at 10:00 AM in courtroom 4A before the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/15/2016. (ctd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2016
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/14 6:58 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wallace M. Allan - filed by Halliburton Co.. (Wilson, Samantha)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Brief - Reply Thu 04/14 5:34 PM
REPLY BRIEF re5 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division filed by Baker Hughes Inc., Halliburton Co..(Gaza, Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/14 5:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Read on behalf of United States of America Related [+]
Related: [-] ad, John
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/14 9:12 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 04/14 10:12 AM
SO ORDERED - re14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Molly S. Boast, Heather S. Tewksbury, Hartmut Schneider and Charles C. Platt filed by Baker Hughes Inc.,11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard G. Parker, Edward D. Hassi, Katrina Robson, Stephen Weissman, Joseph A. Ostoyich, James G. Kress, Thomas J. Dillickrath, and William C. Lavery filed by Halliburton Co. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/14/2016. (mdb)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Thu 04/14 3:04 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles Platt,Heather S. Tewksbury,Harmut Schneider for Baker Hughes Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Thu 04/14 3:22 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Molly S. Boast for Baker Hughes Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2016
20 20 misc Declaration Wed 04/13 4:55 PM
DECLARATION of Rachelle Ketchum re18 Answering Brief in Opposition, by United States of America.(Hall, Jennifer) Modified on 4/13/2016 (nms).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12
19 19 misc Declaration Wed 04/13 4:52 PM
DECLARATION of Blake Rushforth re18 Answering Brief in Opposition, by United States of America.(Hall, Jennifer) Modified on 4/13/2016 (nms).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
18 18 24 pgs respm Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition Wed 04/13 4:46 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re5 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division filed by United States of America.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/25/2016. (Hall, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/13 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by S. Mark Hurd on behalf of Baker Hughes Inc. (Hurd, S.)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/13 3:42 PM
RECUSAL ORDER (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/13/2016. (nms)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/13 1:03 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
15 15 misc Proposed Order Tue 04/12 4:39 PM
PROPOSED ORDER Joint Proposed Stipulated Protective Order by United States of America. (Hall, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2016
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/11 2:11 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Molly S. Boast, Heather S. Tewksbury, Hartmut Schneider and Charles C. Platt - filed by Baker Hughes Inc.. (Townsend, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2016
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/08 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Yoch, Jr on behalf of Halliburton Co. (Yoch, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/08 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha G. Wilson on behalf of Halliburton Co. (Wilson, Samantha)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/08 2:58 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard G. Parker, Edward D. Hassi, Katrina Robson, Stephen Weissman, Joseph A. Ostoyich, James G. Kress, Thomas J. Dillickrath, and William C. Lavery - filed by Halliburton Co.. (Gaza, Anne)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Letter Fri 04/08 2:46 PM
Letter to John A. Cerino, Clerk of the United States District Court from Anne Shea Gaza regarding Defendants' request for expedited treatment - re9 MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue,5 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. (Gaza, Anne) Modified on 4/8/2016 (mdb)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Expedite Fri 04/08 2:39 PM
MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue - filed by Baker Hughes Inc., Halliburton Co..(McBride, David) Modified on 4/8/2016 (mdb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 7.1.1 Statement,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 misc Declaration Fri 04/08 2:34 PM
DECLARATION re5 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division - Declaration of Lee Whitley - by Baker Hughes Inc., Halliburton Co.. (Gaza, Anne)
Related: [-]
7 7 5 pgs misc Declaration Fri 04/08 2:33 PM
DECLARATION re5 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division -Declaration of Christopher J. Bellotti - by Baker Hughes Inc., Halliburton Co.. (Gaza, Anne)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Fri 04/08 2:30 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re5 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division filed by Baker Hughes Inc., Halliburton Co..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/25/2016. (Gaza, Anne)
Related: [-]
5 5 5 pgs motion Transfer Case Fri 04/08 2:26 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division - filed by Baker Hughes Inc., Halliburton Co..(McBride, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7.1.1 Statement,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
utility Remark Fri 04/08 3:15 PM
Remark : Exit copies of D.I.9 MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and D.I.10 Letter to John A. Cerino to Duty Judge (GMS). (klc)
Related: [-]
order Oral Order Fri 04/08 4:32 PM
ORAL ORDER - granting Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue (9 ). The Response is due April 13, 2016 and the Reply is due April 14, 2016. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/8/2016. (mdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2016
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/07 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Angela L. Hughes on behalf of United States of America (Hughes, Angela)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/07 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Blake W. Rushforth on behalf of United States of America (Rushforth, Blake)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2016
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Wed 04/06 9:43 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sec)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/06 9:43 AM
COMPLAINT filed against Baker Hughes Inc., Halliburton Co. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by United States of America.(sec)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service No Summons Issued Wed 04/06 9:43 AM
No Summons Issued. (sec)
Related: [-]