New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:16-cv-02564
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2016
Terminated:Apr 05, 2017
Last checked: Monday Oct 03, 2016 5:41 AM EDT
Defendant
P.O. Richard Caster
Represented By
Matthew Joseph Modafferi
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
P.O. Daniel Dongvort
Represented By
Matthew Joseph Modafferi
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
P.O. JOHN PAUL GIACONA
Defendant
P.O. MICHAEL O'SULLIVAN
Defendant
P.O. JORDAN ROSSI
Defendant
THE CITY OF NEW YORK
Defendant
City Of New York
Represented By
Brian Christopher Francolla
New York City Law Department
contact info
Matthew Joseph Modafferi
New York City Law Department
contact info
Ryan Budhu
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
P.O. John Paul Giacona
Represented By
Matthew Joseph Modafferi
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Michael O'Sullivan
Represented By
Matthew Joseph Modafferi
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
P.O. Jordan Rossi
Represented By
Matthew Joseph Modafferi
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
THABO SEFOLOSHA
Represented By
Elizabeth Eilender
Elizabeth Eilender, Esq
contact info
David Jaroslawicz
Jaroslawicz & Jaros, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thabo Sefolosha
Represented By
Elizabeth Eilender
Elizabeth Eilender, Esq
contact info
Benjamin Brafman
Brafman & Associates, P.C.
contact info
David Jaroslawicz
Jaroslawicz & Jaros, LLC
contact info
Alexander Benjamin Spiro
Brafman & Associates P.C.
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 10, 2017
56 56 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Mon 04/10 2:45 PM
STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT: The above-reference action is hereby dismissed against defendants, with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, or attorneys' fees except as specified in paragraph "2" below. Defendant City of New York hereby agrees to pay plaintiff Thabo Sefolosha the sum of $4,000,000.00 in full satisfaction of all claims, including claims for costs, expenses and attorney's fees. In consideration for the payment of this sum, plaintiff agrees to dismissal of all claims against the defendants and to release defendants City of New York, Officer Giacona, Officer Rossi, Caster, Officer Dongvort and Officer O'Sullivan, their successors or assigns; and all past and present officials, employees, representatives, and agents of the City of New York or any entity represented by the Office of the Corporation Counsel, from any and all liability, claims, or rights of action alleging a violation of plaintiff's civil rights and any and all related state law claims, from the beginning of the world to the date of the General Release, including claims for costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/7/2017) (tro)
Related: [-]
55 55 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Mon 04/10 2:38 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The above-referenced action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/7/2017) (tro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
54 54 order Order of Dismissal Wed 04/05 12:49 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: All parties have indicated that they agree to settle this case for the amount proposed by the Court at the conclusion of the March 30, 2017 settlement conference. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within thirty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same thirty-day period to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(B) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/5/2017) (ap)
Related: [-]