Arizona District Court
Judge:G Murray Snow
Case #: 2:16-cv-00956
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2016
Terminated:Apr 15, 2016
Last checked: Monday Oct 03, 2016 2:25 AM MST
Appellant
Teresa Sullivan
Debtor 4802 E Ray Road 23-203
Phoenix, AZ 85044
Appellee
Jamestown Apartments, LLP
Represented By
Chad Philip Miesen
Carpenter Hazlewood Delgado & Bolen PLLC
contact info
Appellee
Jamestown Apartments LLP
Represented By
Chad Philip Miesen
Carpenter Hazlewood Delgado & Bolen PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Clerk US Bankruptcy Court (Phx)
US Bankruptcy Court 230 N 1st Avenue, Ste. 101
Phoenix, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, April 15, 2016
5 5 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 04/15 3:04 PM
ORDER pursuant to the parties' Notice of Settlement and Stipulation to Dismiss4 . IT IS ORDERED granting the Stipulation and dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/15/2016. (KFZ)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 04/15 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation to Dismissal with Prejudice by Jamestown Apartments LLP. (Miesen, Chad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2016
3 3 notice Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/07 10:40 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Jamestown Apartments LLP. (EJA)
Related: [-]
2 2 appeal Notice of Receipt of Matter/Appeal Thu 04/07 10:38 AM
Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2016
1 1 appeal Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter Wed 04/06 2:08 PM
Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
Related: [-]