Pacific Sunwear of California, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-10882 |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 03, 2016 |
Claims Deadline: | Sep 26, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Sep 06, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Pacific Sunwear of California, Inc.
3450 E Miraloma Ave
Anaheim, CA 92806-2101 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
1. | Court allows Pacific Sunwear to exit Chapter 11, acquired by Golden Gate Capital (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 09/08/2016 | |
2. | PacSun Files Chapter 11 (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/07/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago |
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 09/25 9:32 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51019 Closed (NAB) |