Member Case
Lead case is: 1:12-bk-11873

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:12-bk-11889
Case Filed:May 03, 2012
Terminated:Mar 31, 2017

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors25,001-50,000
Est. AssetsMore than $1 billion
Est. Liabilities More than $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
HBC, LLC
10511 E Central Ave
Wichita, KS 67206-2557
Represented By
Ross M. Kwasteniet
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Paul M. Basta
Kirkland & Ellis, LLP
contact info
Douglas Gould
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims and Noticing Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Claims Agent
(f/k/a Bankruptcy Services LLC) 777 Third Avenue, 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Friday, March 31, 2017
7 7 order Application, Final Decree Fri 03/31 11:56 AM
Order signed on 3/31/2017 Granting Application for Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases. Related [+]. (Rodriguez, Maria)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 motion Application, Final Decree Fri 03/31 11:27 AM
Application for Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases (This is an Administrative Entry. For PDF please see Case No. 12-11873 Doc. 2225) . (Rodriguez, Maria)
Related: [-]
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 03/31 3:11 PM
Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2012
5 5 Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Ross M. Kwasteniet on behalf of HBC, LLC. (Kwasteniet, Ross)
Related: [-]
4 4 Schedules filed: Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H Schedules of Assets and Liabilities filed by Ross M. Kwasteniet on behalf of HBC, LLC. (Kwasteniet, Ross)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 04, 2012
3 3 Order signed by Honorable James M. Peck on 5/4/2012 Granting Motion for Joint Administration with main Case No 12-11873 Related [+]. (Rodriguez, Maria)
Related: [-] 2
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-11889 [misc,824] (1046.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 189467. Fee amount 1046.00. (Porter)
Related: [-]
Case Joint Administration; An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Hawker Beechcraft Inc., and that all further pleadings and other papers are filed in, and all further docket entries are made in Case No. 12-11873 (Rodriguez, Maria).
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2012
2 2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Douglas R. Gould on behalf of HBC, LLC. (Gould, Douglas)
Related: [-]
1 1 32 pgs Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Paul M. Basta of Kirkland & Ellis, LLP on behalf of HBC, LLC. (Basta, Paul)
Related: [-]
Judge Stuart M. Bernstein added to the case. (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]