9
|
|
9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/18 5:12 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by craigslist, Inc... (Viscounty, Perry) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
misc
Patent/Trademark Copy
Mon 04/11 11:02 AM
REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/11 10:57 AM
Summons Issued as to RadPad, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 04/11 10:56 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2016. Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 04/11 10:06 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 4/25/2016. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by craigslist, Inc. (Viscounty, Perry) (Filed on 4/8/2016) Modified on 4/11/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
Certificate of Interested Entities by craigslist, Inc. (Viscounty, Perry) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
Proposed Summons. (Viscounty, Perry) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against RadPad, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-10358456). Filed by craigslist, Inc.(Viscounty, Perry) (Filed on 4/8/2016) Modified on 4/11/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|