Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:12-bk-32941
Case Filed:May 03, 2012
Creditor Meeting:Jun 12, 2012
Terminated:Jul 24, 2012

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The David Bagwell Company, Debtor
4433 S Versailles Ave
Dallas, TX 75205-3012
Represented By
Gerrit M. Pronske
Pronske & Patel, P.C.
contact info
Debtor
The David Bagwell Company
4433 S Versailles Ave
Dallas, TX 75205-3012
Represented By
Gerrit M. Pronske
Pronske & Patel, P.C.
contact info
Melanie Pearce Goolsby
Pronske & Patel, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
UST U.S. Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, August 31, 2012
34 34 INCORRECT ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - Motion to extend or limit the exclusivity period Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company (Goolsby, Melanie) Modified on 9/5/2012 (Blanco, J.) (9 pgs)
Related: [-]
Proposed order regarding Motion to Extend Exclusive Time to File and Confirm Debtors Plan of Reorganization Related [+]. Document uploaded on 8/31/2012. (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-] 34 Motion to extend or limit the exclusivity period Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Companyf-ID: 1339592149367_17871
Wednesday, July 25, 2012
33 33 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 51. Notice Date 07/25/2012. (Admin.) (5 pgs)
Related: [-] 31 Order granting motion to transfer case to Fort Worth
Tuesday, July 24, 2012
32 32 Application to employ Pronske & Patel, P.C. as Attorney Amended Application to Employ Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company (Goolsby, Melanie) (17 pgs; 4 docs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Service List
Acknowledgment of split/transfer sent case TO another Texas Northern DIVISION - intra, Fort Worth division . Case Number 12-44103 dml-11. (Bradden, T.)
Related: [-]
Bankruptcy case closed. (CASE TRANSFERRED TO FORT WORTH DIVISION 12-44103 DML-11) (Bradden, T.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 23, 2012
31 31 Order granting motion to transfer case to Fort Worth Related [+] Entered on 7/23/2012. (Porter, R.) (2 pgs)
Related: [-] 29
30 30 Debtor-in-possession monthly operating report for filing period 6/1/12 to 6/30/12 filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company. (Goolsby, Melanie) (9 pgs)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 20, 2012
29 29 Agreed Motion to transfer case to Fort Worth divisional office Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company Objections due by 8/13/2012. (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Proposed order regarding Agreed Motion for Intra-District Transfer Related [+]. Document uploaded on 7/20/2012. (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-] 29 Agreed Motion to transfer case to Fort Worth divisional office Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company Objections due by 8/13/2012.f-ID: 1339592149367_8959
Friday, July 06, 2012
28 28 Motion to convert case from chapter 11 to 7 . Fee Amount $15 Filed by Creditor The Ridge at Alta Vista Investments I, LLC (Wade, Cliff)
Related: [-]
27 27 Notice of hearing filed by Creditor The Ridge at Alta Vista Investments I, LLC Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 8/9/2012 at 09:30 AM Dallas Judge Jernigan Ctrm for26 , (Wade, Cliff)
Related: [-] 26 Motion to dismiss case or Convert to Chapter 7 Filed by Creditor The Ridge at Alta Vista Investments I, LLC
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to convert case from chapter 11 to 7 12-32941 sgj11) [motion,mcn11to7] ( 15.00). Receipt number 15713198, amount $ 15.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 05, 2012
26 26 Motion to dismiss case or Convert to Chapter 7 Filed by Creditor The Ridge at Alta Vista Investments I, LLC (Wade, Cliff)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 26, 2012
25 25 Debtor-in-possession monthly operating report for filing period 5/1/12 to 5/31/12 filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company. (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2012
24 24 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 7/25/2012 at 09:30 AM Dallas Judge Jernigan Ctrm for23 and for22 , (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-] 22 Application to employ Pronske & Patel, P.C. as Attorney Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A# 2 Service List),23 Motion for joint administration of cases The David Bagwell Company 12-32941 & Evermore Communities, Ltd. 12-32942 Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company (Attachments: #1 Service List) (Goolsby, Melanie) Modified to add text on 6/12/2012 (Abell, S).
Att: 1 Master Service List
Friday, June 15, 2012
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 6/12/2012 Related [+]
Related: [-] Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/12/2012 at 09:30 AM at Dallas, Room 976. Proofs of Claims due by 9/10/2012. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 06/6/2012.snick, Nancy
Monday, June 11, 2012
23 23 7 pgs Motion for joint administration of cases The David Bagwell Company 12-32941 & Evermore Communities, Ltd. 12-32942 Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company (Goolsby, Melanie) Modified to add text on 6/12/2012 (Abell, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Service List
22 22 Application to employ Pronske & Patel, P.C. as Attorney Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Service List
Friday, June 08, 2012
21 21 Certificate of service re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, & Deadlines filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company Related [+]. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-] 3 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11 & 12,9 Certificate of service
Thursday, June 07, 2012
20 20 Creditor matrix amended to change address . Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company. (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-]
19 19 Creditor matrix amended to add additional creditor(s). Fee Amount $30 . Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company. (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-]
18 18 Cash flow statement for small business. Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company. (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-]
17 17 List of equity security holders filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company. (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Receipt of filing fee for Matrix 12-32941 sgj11) [misc,matrix] ( 30.00). Receipt number 15564377, amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 06, 2012
16 16 20 Largest unsecured creditors . Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company Related [+]. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency
15 15 Statement of financial affairs . Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company Related [+]. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency
14 14 Schedules A, B, D-H with Summary of Schedules. Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company Related [+]. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency
Thursday, May 24, 2012
13 13 Order granting11 Motion to extend time. Related [+] 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 6/6/2012 for4 , Schedule A due 6/6/2012 for4 , Schedule B due 6/6/2012 for4 , Schedule D due 6/6/2012 for4 , Schedule E due 6/6/2012 for4 , Schedule F due 6/6/2012 for4 , Schedule G due 6/6/2012 for4 , Schedule H due 6/6/2012 for4 , Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/6/2012 for4 , Summary of Schedules and Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities and Related Data 28 USC sec. 159 due 6/6/2012 for4 , Entered on 5/24/2012. (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] related document(s)4 Notice of deficiency
12 12 Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor . Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 22, 2012
Proposed order regarding Motion for Order Extending Time for Debtor to File Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs Related [+]. Document uploaded on 5/22/2012. (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix (RE: related document(s)4 Notice of deficiency) Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company (Attachments: # 1 Service List)f-ID: 1332903633881_11802
Thursday, May 17, 2012
11 11 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Related [+] Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency
Att: 1 Service List
Wednesday, May 16, 2012
10 10 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Cliff A. Wade filed by Creditor The Ridge at Alta Vista Investments I, LLC. (Wade, Cliff)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2012
9 9 Certificate of service re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company Related [+]. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-] 3 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11 & 12,8 BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors
Thursday, May 10, 2012
8 8 BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2012. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Meeting of creditors 341
Wednesday, May 09, 2012
7 7 BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/09/2012. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A due 5/17/2012. Schedule B due 5/17/2012. Schedule D due 5/17/2012. Schedule E due 5/17/2012. Schedule F due 5/17/2012. Schedule G due 5/17/2012. Schedule H due 5/17/2012. Summary of Schedules and Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities and Related Data 28 USC sec. 159 due 5/17/2012. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/17/2012. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 5/17/2012. Attorney Fee Disclosure due 5/17/2012 ..
Tuesday, May 08, 2012
6 6 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Laurie Spindler Huffman filed by Creditor Dallas County. (Huffman, Laurie)
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Elizabeth Banda Calvo filed by Creditor City of Colleyville, Grapevine-Colleyville ISD. (Banda Calvo, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 07, 2012
4 4 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A due 5/17/2012. Schedule B due 5/17/2012. Schedule D due 5/17/2012. Schedule E due 5/17/2012. Schedule F due 5/17/2012. Schedule G due 5/17/2012. Schedule H due 5/17/2012. Summary of Schedules and Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities and Related Data 28 USC sec. 159 due 5/17/2012. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/17/2012. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 5/17/2012. Attorney Fee Disclosure due 5/17/2012 .(Moroles, D.) MODIFIED text to match pdf on 5/7/2012 (Moroles, D.)
Related: [-]
3 3 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/12/2012 at 09:30 AM at Dallas, Room 976. Proofs of Claims due by 9/10/2012. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 06/6/2012. (Neary, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 Creditor matrix . Filed by Debtor The David Bagwell Company. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2012
1 1 3 pgs Chapter 11 voluntary petition. Fee Amount $1046 Filed by The David Bagwell Company (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-]
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 12-32941 11) [misc,volp11a] (1046.00). Receipt number 15388720, amount $1046.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]