New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:16-cv-02729
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2016
Terminated:Aug 16, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Oct 09, 2016 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Antinori Restaurant, Inc.
Defendant
Elio & Sons, LLC
Defendant
Sammy Gashiano
Defendant
San Marino at Soho Inc.
Plaintiff
Jose Bravo
Represented By
Anne Melissa Seelig
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe
Represented By
Anne Melissa Seelig
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, August 16, 2016
14 14 3 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Tue 08/16 3:45 PM
OPINION & ORDER: Accordingly, in light of the factors mentioned above, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice and without costs for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/16/2016) (lmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2016
13 13 order Order to Show Cause Mon 07/25 11:41 AM
ORDER: Plaintiffs are directed to advise the Court in writing why they have failed to serve the summons and complaint on Defendants within the 90-day period, or, if the Defendants have been served, when and in what manner such service was made. If no written communication is received by August 5, 2016 showing good cause why such service was not made within 90 days, the Court will dismiss the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/22/2016) (kko)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2016
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/28 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Melissa Seelig on behalf of Jose Bravo, John Doe. (Seelig, Anne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2016
11 11 misc Consent to Sue Tue 04/26 4:36 PM
CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jose Bravo.(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2016
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 04/13 2:38 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sammy Gashiano. (dgo)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 04/13 2:36 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elio & Sons, LLC. (dgo)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 04/13 2:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Antinori Restaurant, Inc.. (dgo)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 04/13 2:32 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to San Marino at Soho Inc.. (dgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 04/13 2:29 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (dgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 04/13 2:30 PM
Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (dgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 04/13 2:30 PM
Case Designated ECF. (dgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/12 2:12 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sammy Gashiano, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Bravo, John Doe. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/12 2:11 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elio & Sons, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Bravo, John Doe. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/12 2:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Antinori Restaurant, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Bravo, John Doe. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/12 2:09 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to San Marino at Soho Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Bravo, John Doe. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/12 2:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/12 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Antinori Restaurant, Inc., Elio & Sons, LLC, Sammy Gashiano, San Marino at Soho Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12176413)Document filed by Jose Bravo, John Doe.(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]