United States Of America v. Certain Funds on Deposit in Various Accounts Detailed Herein, and All Funds Traceable Thereto
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Alvin K Hellerstein |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-02800 |
Nature of Suit | 690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other |
Cause | 18:981 Civil Forfeiture |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 11, 2016 4:38 AM EDT |
All Defendants
Certain Funds on Deposit in Various Accounts Detailed Herein, and All Funds Traceable Thereto
|
|
All Plaintiffs
United States Of America
U.S. Attorney's Office, S.D.N.Y. 1 St. Andrew's Plaza
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Defendant-in-Rem
Certain Funds on Deposit in Various Accounts Detailed Herein, and All Funds Traceable Thereto
|
|
Plaintiff
United States Of America
U.S. Attorney's Office, S.D.N.Y. 1 St. Andrew's Plaza
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Fri 07/10 10:05 AM
Mailed 4 certified copies of12 Judgment to Assistant United States Attorney, Alexander J. Wilson, Co-Chief of the Money Laundering and Transnational Criminal Enterprises Unit, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York, 10007. (nb) |
||
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 07/09 9:27 AM
JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED AS FOLLOWS: 1. Subject Account-14 shall be, and the same hereby is forfeited to the Plaintiff United States of America. 2. The United States Marshals Service (or its designee) shall dispose of the Subject Account-14, according to law. 3. The Clerk of the Court shall forward four certified copies of this Judgment of Forfeiture to Assistant United States Attorney, Alexander J. Wilson, Co-Chief of the Money Laundering and Transnational Criminal Enterprises Unit, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York, 10007. So Ordered., Motions terminated:10 MOTION for Judgment of Forfeiture . filed by United States Of America. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/8/20) (yv) |
|
Thursday, May 21, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Thu 05/21 12:05 PM
DECLARATION of AUSA Eun Young Choi in Support re:10 MOTION for Judgment of Forfeiture .. Document filed by United States Of America..(Choi, Eun Young) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Judgment of Forfeiture | ||
10 | 10
motion
Judgment of Forfeiture
Thu 05/21 12:00 PM
MOTION for Judgment of Forfeiture . Document filed by United States Of America..(Choi, Eun Young) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Wed 01/25 10:49 AM
Mailed four certified copies of9 Default Judgment to Assistant United States Attorney, Jason H. Cowley, Chief of the Money Laundering and Asset Forfeiture Unit, One St. Andrew's Place, New York, NY 10007. (anc) |
||
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment - Default
Tue 01/24 12:08 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE FOR CERTAIN FUNDS: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED AS FOLLOWS: 1. All right, title and interest in the Subject Funds, as defined above, is hereby forfeited and vested in the United States of America. 2. The United States Marshals Service shall take possession of the Subject Funds and dispose of the same according to law. 3. The Clerk of the Court shall forward four certified copies of this Final Judgment of Forfeiture to Assistant United States Attorney, Jason H. Cowley, Chief of the Money Laundering and Asset Forfeiture Unit, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York, 10007. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/24/2017) (cla) |
|
misc
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
Tue 01/24 5:29 PM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:9 Default Judgment, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (cla) |
||
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Wed 12/21 2:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Assistant United States Attorney Edward B. Diskant in Support re:7 MOTION for a Final Judgment of Forfeiture as to Certain Assets .. Document filed by United States Of America.(Diskant, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Q | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 12/21 2:03 PM
MOTION for a Final Judgment of Forfeiture as to Certain Assets . Document filed by United States Of America.(Diskant, Edward) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Fri 09/30 1:51 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to a. Any and all funds including but not limited to $284,483.00 in United States currency on deposit in account number 201100290413 at Eurobank Cyprus, Ltd., and all funds traceable thereto ("SubjectAccount-1 "); b. Any and all funds including but not limited to $7,087,347.00 inUnited States Currency on deposit in account number 001201100291563, in the name of Moonbigtwo at Eurobank Cyprus, Ltd., and all funds traceable thereto ("Subject Account-2"); c. Any and all funds including but not limited to $324, 705.00 in United States currency on deposit in account number 240-07-448428-01 in the name of Glendown Holdings at Hellenic Bank, Cyprus, and all funds traceable thereto ("Subject Account-3"); d. Any and all funds including but not limited to 399,898.00 in Euros on deposit in account number 240-01-448428-01 in the name of Glendown Holdings at Hellenic Bank, Cyprus, and all fundstraceable thereto ("Subject Account-4"); e. Any and all funds including but not limited to $636,900.00 in United States currency on deposit in account numberLV69KBRB1111217256001, in the name of Deltaway Systems LP at Trasta Komercbanka, Latvia, and all funds traceable thereto ("Subject Account-7");f. Any and all funds up to and including $320,000.00 on deposit in account number LV54MULT1010910170010, in the name of Burgenland AG Inc. at Meridian Trade Bank, Latvia, and all funds traceable thereto ("Subject Account-8");g. Any and all funds including but not limited to $981,026.00 in UnitedStates currency on deposit in account number L V24CBBR1122808800010, in the name of Nokletto Industries Limited at Baltikum Bank AS, Latvia, and all funds traceable thereto ("Subject Account-9"); h. Any and all funds including but not limited to $3,030.90 in United States currency on deposit in account numberL V 43RTMBOOOO 179806172, in the name of Max Crown S.A. at Reitumu Banka, Latvia, and all funds traceable thereto ("Subject Account-1 O"); i. Any and all funds including but not limited to $325,000.00 in United States currency on deposit in account number LV35RTMB0000628806803, at Reitumu Banka, Latvia, and all funds traceable thereto ("Subject Account-11); J. Any and all funds including but not limited to $67,800.00 on deposit in account number T674010044100013509, at AB BND Bankas, Lithuania, and all funds traceable thereto ("Subject Account-12); k. Any and all funds including but not limited to 872,603.84 in Euros on deposit in account number HU05103000021053865248820011, in the name of"Romantick Style Ltd" at MKB Bank ZRT, Hungary, and all funds traceable thereto ("Subject Account-17"); 1. Any and all funds including but not limited to $67,520.37 on deposit in account number LV78LATB0006020137348, maintained in the name of "Ideals Solutions Group S.A.," at Norvik Banka JSC, Latvia, and all funds traceable thereto ("Subject Account-18"); m. Any and all funds including but not limited to $2,911,745.26 ondeposit in account number LV65KBRB1111216560001, maintained in the name of "Privaled Construction LP" at Trasta Komercbanka, Latvia, and all funds traceable thereto ("Subject Account-19"); n. Any and all funds including but not limited to $3,836,200.00 on deposit in account number L V72KBRB 111123 2037001, maintained in the name of "Corwald Transit LP" at Trasta Komercbanka, Latvia, and all funds traceable thereto ("Subject Account-20"); which are part of the above captioned Defendant-in-rem and that the time to file a claim withrespect to the said Defendant-in-rem has expired. The default of all persons is hereby noted. (km) |
|
Thursday, August 04, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Memo Endorsement
Mon 08/08 2:18 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:4 Letter filed by United States Of America. ENDORSEMENT: At such time as the gov't is ready to seek forfeiture and to obtain adjudication of the absence of rightful claims, the gov't should submit competent proof, by affidavit or declarations, and not by default. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/4/2016) (mro) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Wed 08/03 5:06 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Edward B. Diskant dated August 3, 2016 re: Case Status. Document filed by United States Of America.(Diskant, Edward) |
|
Friday, July 22, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Service by Publication
Fri 07/22 1:38 PM
SERVICE BY PUBLICATION. A Notice of Forfeiture was published in the www.forfeiture.gov on April 21, 2016 through May 20, 2016. Document filed by United States Of America. (Diskant, Edward) |
|
Friday, April 15, 2016 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 04/15 2:39 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edward B. Diskant. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code pd (paid). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to none (no fee required). (rch) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 04/15 2:46 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Edward B. Diskant. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Certain Funds on Deposit in Various Accounts Detailed Herein, and All Funds Traceable Thereto, United States Of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (rch) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/15 2:51 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/15 2:52 PM
Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/15 2:52 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rch) |
||
Thursday, April 14, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/14 4:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Diskant, Edward) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint for Forfeiture
Thu 04/14 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against Certain Funds on Deposit in Various Accounts Detailed Herein, and All Funds Traceable Thereto.Document filed by United States Of America.(Diskant, Edward) |