SDI Wireless, LLC v. Locus Telecommunications, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth M Karas |
Case #: | 7:16-cv-02826 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 12, 2016 5:12 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Locus Telecommunications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
SDI Wireless, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Locus Telecommunications, Inc.
2200 Fletcher Avenue
Fort Lee, NJ 07024 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SDI Wireless, LLC
1091 Yonkers Avenue
Yonkers, NY 10704 |
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Guillermo Builes
39 East Ruby Avenue Apt B4
Palisades Park, NJ 07650 |
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Sohel Distributors NY LLC
1091 Yonkers Avenue
Yonkers, NJ 10704 |
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Locus Telecommunications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
order
Memo Endorsement
Thu 06/30 10:16 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:22 Letter in response to 5-6-16 letter of Clifford K. Williams. filed by SDI Wireless, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: As discussed at the conference on June 29, 2016, the Parties have agreed to the dismissal of all claims without prejudice, and that this dispute will be continued in the New Jersey action that already has been filed. The Clerk is therefore respectfully requested to close this case. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/29/16) (yv) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 06/29 2:54 PM
Minute Entry for status conference held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/29/2016: Joseph Goldberg appeared on behalf of Plaintiff; John Coyle appeared on behalf of Defendant. No court reporter served. The Court dismissed all causes of action without prejudice. (RM) |
||
Tuesday, May 31, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/31 2:12 PM
ORDER ADMITTING JOHN D. COYLE PRO HAC VICE granting4 Motion for John D. Coyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the Unites State District for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/25/16) (yv) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Fri 05/27 1:58 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 4 MOTION for John D. Coyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12197271. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) |
||
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 05/25 12:14 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:26 Letter filed by Locus Telecommunications. Inc. Response to Docket Entries 24/25. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a conference on June 29, 2016, at 2:30. ( Status Conference set for 6/29/2016 at 02:30 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/19/2016) (rj) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Wed 05/18 4:25 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Clifford K. Williams dated May 18, 2016 re: Response to Docket Entries 24/25. Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc..(Williams, Clifford) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Memo Endorsement
Fri 05/13 2:17 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:24 Letter Response to letter docket entry #19, filed by SDI Wireless, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Locus is to respond to this letter by 5/18/16. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/13/16) (yv) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Thu 05/12 5:29 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Joseph Goldberg dated 5/12/16 re: Response to letter docket entry #19. Document filed by SDI Wireless, LLC.(Goldberg, Joseph) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Memo Endorsement
Mon 05/09 4:49 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:19 Letter on Docket Entries 14/11 filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SDI is to respond to this letter by 5/16/16. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/9/16) (yv) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Mon 05/09 4:37 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Joseph Goldberg dated 05/09/2016 re: In response to 5-6-16 letter of Clifford K. Williams. Document filed by SDI Wireless, LLC.(Goldberg, Joseph) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/09 3:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sohel Distributors NY LLC. (sj) |
|
20 | 20
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/09 3:31 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Guillermo Builes. (sj) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Fri 05/06 5:18 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Clifford K. Williams dated 5/6/2016 re: Docket Entries 14/11. Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc..(Williams, Clifford) |
|
18 | 18
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 05/06 3:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sohel Distributors NY LLC, re:11 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim. Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Williams, Clifford) |
|
17 | 17
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 05/06 3:38 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Guillermo Builes, re:11 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim. Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Williams, Clifford) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Fri 05/06 2:47 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Clifford K. Williams dated May 6, 2016 re: Docket Entries 14/11. Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc..(Williams, Clifford) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/06 11:51 AM
ORDER ADMITTING WILLIAM K. MOSCA, JR. PRO HAC VICE granting10 Motion for William K. Mosca, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the Unites State District for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/6/16) (yv) |
|
misc
Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Non-ECF Document Error
Fri 05/06 9:38 AM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Joseph Goldberg to E-MAIL Document No. 14 Notice of voluntary dismissal to wpclerk@nysd.uscourts.gov with handwritten signatures. This document is not filed via ECF. (jk) |
||
Thursday, May 05, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 05/05 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Locus Telecommunications, Inc.. Document filed by SDI Wireless, LLC. (Goldberg, Joseph) |
|
13 | 13
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 05/05 3:07 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sohel Distributors NY LLC, re:11 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim. Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Williams, Clifford) |
|
12 | 12
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 05/05 3:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Guillermo Builes, re:11 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim. Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Williams, Clifford) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 05/05 3:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Sohel Distributors NY LLC, Guillermo Builes., COUNTERCLAIM against SDI Wireless, LLC. Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc..(Williams, Clifford) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/05 12:07 PM
MOTION for William K. Mosca, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12266475. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc..(Williams, Clifford) |
|
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Thu 05/05 12:17 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 10 MOTION for William K. Mosca, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12266475. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 05/06 3:07 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. 13 Request for Issuance of Summons, 12 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Incorrect form used. The correct form is Third Party Summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) |
||
Tuesday, April 26, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 04/26 9:27 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 6.1(b) FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE REPLY, (Locus Telecommunications, Inc. answer due 5/10/2016.) ENDORSEMENT: Motion is granted, the typo notwithstanding. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/22/16) (yv) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/22 3:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Williams, Clifford) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 04/21 1:32 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Clifford Kelley Williams. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:294 Breach of Contract; Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Citizenship Plaintiff code 1 (Citizen of This State); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Arbitration code e (Exempt). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Origin code has been modified to 2 ; the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Arbitration code has been deleted. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/21 1:36 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/21 1:36 PM
Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/21 1:36 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/19 5:29 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent KDDI U.S. Holding, Inc. for Locus Telecommunications, Inc.. Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc..(Williams, Clifford) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/19 11:49 AM
FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc..(Williams, Clifford) Modified on 4/19/2016 (lb) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/19 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 53547/2016..Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc..(Williams, Clifford) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - PDF Error
Tue 04/19 10:19 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Clifford Kelley Williams to RE-FILE Document 2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The PDF attached is the Notice of Removal, re-file and attach the correct PDF for the Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ldi) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
Tue 04/19 4:54 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Clifford Kelley Williams to RE-FILE Document 6 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb) |
||
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/18 12:49 PM
MOTION for John D. Coyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12197271. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc..(Williams, Clifford) |
|
Friday, April 15, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/15 1:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Williams, Clifford) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/15 1:34 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent KDDI U.S. Holding, Inc. for Locus Telecommunications, Inc.. Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc..(Williams, Clifford) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/15 1:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 53547/2016. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12191941).Document filed by Locus Telecommunications, Inc..(Williams, Clifford) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Mon 04/18 4:38 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Clifford Kelley Williams to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 4/20/2016. (sj) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/21 1:26 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Clifford Kelley Williams to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf) |