LHF Productions, Inc. v. Doe 1 et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00551 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 12, 2016 2:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Scott Swiberg
|
|
Defendant
Paul Rand
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Theresa Penny
|
|
Defendant
Thomas Kinison
|
|
Defendant
Kdaya Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Patricia Holmes
|
|
Defendant
Alissa Cavanaugh
9900 12TH AVE W APT P-103
EVERETT, WA 98204 |
|
Defendant
Mohd Arafat
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doe 17
|
|
Plaintiff
LHF Productions Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LHF Productions, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LHF Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Doe 9
Terminated: 07/11/2016
|
|
Defendant
Christina Schafer
Terminated: 09/13/2016
|
|
Defendant
Nina Rubenstein
Terminated: 08/11/2016
|
|
Defendant
Lee Hunt
Terminated: 09/23/2016
|
|
Defendant
Igor Grizhinku
Terminated: 09/23/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 1
Terminated: 07/12/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 8
Terminated: 07/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 10
Terminated: 07/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 11
Terminated: 07/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 12
Terminated: 07/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 13
Terminated: 06/22/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 14
Terminated: 07/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 15
Terminated: 07/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 16
Terminated: 07/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 7
Terminated: 07/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 2
Terminated: 07/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 3
Terminated: 07/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 4
Terminated: 07/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 5
Terminated: 07/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 6
Terminated: 07/14/2016
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
93 | 93
utility
Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright
Mon 08/13 12:17 PM
REPORT on the determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office with dkts.90 ,91 ,92 . (SWT) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
92 | 92
order
Judgment by Court
Tue 08/07 4:01 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT. Pursuant to the Order of Default Judgment (Dkt #70 ) entered 2/15/2017: Defendants are jointly and severally liable for statutory damages in the amount of $750; Defendant Kdaya Johnson is individually liable for attorneys' fees in the amount of $550 and costs in the amount of $143.53. Defendant Theresa Penny is individually liable for attorneys' fees in the amount of $550 and costs in the amount of $148.53. Defendant Scott Swiberg is individually liable for attorneys' fees in the amount of $550 and costs in the amount of $93.53. Defendant Thomas Kinison is individually liable for attorneys' fees in the amount of $550 and costs in the amount of $90.53. (TH) |
|
91 | 91
order
Judgment by Court
Tue 08/07 1:54 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Patricia Holmes (Doe 5), (Dkt.87 ), is GRANTED IN PART. (See Judgment for further details) (SWT) |
|
90 | 90
order
1 - Order
Tue 08/07 1:50 PM
ORDER granting in part plaintiff's87 MOTION for Default Judgment Against Patricia Holmes , signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT) |
|
89 | 89
order
Judgment - Default ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 08/07 1:38 PM
PLEASE DISREGARD. JUDGMENT BY THE COURT: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Patricia Holmes (Doe 5), (Dkt. 87 ), is GRANTED IN PART. (See Judgment for details) (SWT) Modified to indicate this was posted prematurely in error on 8/7/2018 (SWT) |