Sullivan et al v. Phillipsburg Marble Co., Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis A Kaplan |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-02867 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 15, 2016 5:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
Phillipsburg Marble Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremiah Sullivan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 12/05 4:52 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Cancel Conference in light of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Carol G. Dell, Esq. and Vanessa M. Kelly, Esq. dated December 5, 2016. Document filed by Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, in his fiduciary capacity as a Trustee of the Stone Setters Local 84 Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, Vacation Fund, Apprentice Fund and Industry Promotion Fund), Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, as President of the Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 1, New York, B.A.C.I.U., AFL-CIO), Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, as a Trustee and Administrator of the Bricklayers Local No. 1 Welfare and Insurance Fund).(Dell, Carol) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 12/05 3:38 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Phillipsburg Marble Co., Inc. and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, in his fiduciary capacity as a Trustee of the Stone Setters Local 84 Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, Vacation Fund, Apprentice Fund and Industry Promotion Fund), Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, as President of the Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 1, New York, B.A.C.I.U., AFL-CIO), Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, as a Trustee and Administrator of the Bricklayers Local No. 1 Welfare and Insurance Fund).(Dell, Carol) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 10/14 5:21 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Vanessa M. Kelly dated October 12, 2016. Document filed by Phillipsburg Marble Co., Inc.. Return Date set for 10/20/2016 at 03:00 PM.(Kelly, Vanessa) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated So Ordered Adjournment | ||
Wednesday, July 20, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 07/20 3:48 PM
SO ORDERED STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed, by and between the parties in the above-captioned matter through their undersigned attorneys, that, having received sufficient service of process in this matter, Defendant Phillipsburg Marble Company, Inc. ("Phillipsburg Marble") shall be permitted to answer the Complaint in this action on or before July 19, 2016. The answer was originally due on June 20, 2016. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 7/20/2016) (kl) |
|
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 07/20 4:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Scheduling Conference held on 7/20/2016. (Mohan, Andrew) |
||
minutes
~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 07/20 4:23 PM
Minute Order Proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2016 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 21B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (Mohan, Andrew) |
||
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 07/19 2:19 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:10 Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Vanessa M. Kelly dated July 19, 2016. Document filed by Phillipsburg Marble Co., Inc..(Kelly, Vanessa) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Ordered Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Answer | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/19 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vanessa Marie Kelly on behalf of Phillipsburg Marble Co., Inc.. (Kelly, Vanessa) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/19 1:49 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Phillipsburg Marble Co., Inc..(Kelly, Vanessa) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/19 1:47 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Phillipsburg Marble Co., Inc..(Kelly, Vanessa) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 06/22 4:33 PM
ORDER RESCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This action having been assigned to me for all purposes, it is hereby, ORDERED as follows: 1. Counsel receiving this order shall promptly mail copies hereof to all other counsel of record or, in the case of parties for which no appearance has been made, to such parties. 2. Counsel for all parties are directed to confer regarding an agreed scheduling order. If counsel are able to agree on a schedule and the agreed schedule calls for filing of the pretrial order not more than six (6) months from the date of this order, counsel shall sign and file within twenty-one (21) days from the date hereof a consent order in the form annexed for consideration by the Court. If such a consent order is not filed within the time provided, a conference will be held on 7/20/16 in courtroom 21B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York at 3:30pm. Initial Conference set for 7/20/2016 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 21B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/22/2016) (mro) |
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 06/15 3:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Phillipsburg Marble Co., Inc. waiver sent on 4/20/2016, answer due 6/20/2016. Document filed by Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, in his fiduciary capacity as a Trustee of the Stone Setters Local 84 Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, Vacation Fund, Apprentice Fund and Industry Promotion Fund); Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, as President of the Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 1, New York, B.A.C.I.U., AFL-CIO); Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, as a Trustee and Administrator of the Bricklayers Local No. 1 Welfare and Insurance Fund). (Dell, Carol) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/19 2:25 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Phillipsburg Marble Co., Inc.. (dgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/19 2:21 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (dgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/19 2:24 PM
Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (dgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/19 2:24 PM
Case Designated ECF. (dgo) |
||
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/18 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Meredith Morgan on behalf of Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, in his fiduciary capacity as a Trustee of the Stone Setters Local 84 Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, Vacation Fund, Apprentice Fund and Industry Promotion Fund), Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, as President of the Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 1, New York, B.A.C.I.U., AFL-CIO), Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, as a Trustee and Administrator of the Bricklayers Local No. 1 Welfare and Insurance Fund). (Morgan, Katherine) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/18 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carol Giuliano Dell on behalf of Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, in his fiduciary capacity as a Trustee of the Stone Setters Local 84 Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, Vacation Fund, Apprentice Fund and Industry Promotion Fund), Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, as President of the Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 1, New York, B.A.C.I.U., AFL-CIO), Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, as a Trustee and Administrator of the Bricklayers Local No. 1 Welfare and Insurance Fund). (Dell, Carol) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/18 3:41 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Phillipsburg Marble Company, Inc., re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, in his fiduciary capacity as a Trustee of the Stone Setters Local 84 Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, Vacation Fund, Apprentice Fund and Industry Promotion Fund), Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, as President of the Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 1, New York, B.A.C.I.U., AFL-CIO), Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, as a Trustee and Administrator of the Bricklayers Local No. 1 Welfare and Insurance Fund). (Dell, Carol) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/18 3:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dell, Carol) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/18 3:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Phillipsburg Marble Co., Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12198306)Document filed by Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, in his fiduciary capacity as a Trustee of the Stone Setters Local 84 Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, Vacation Fund, Apprentice Fund and Industry Promotion Fund), Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, as President of the Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 1, New York, B.A.C.I.U., AFL-CIO), Jeremiah Sullivan(Jeremiah Sullivan, as a Trustee and Administrator of the Bricklayers Local No. 1 Welfare and Insurance Fund).(Dell, Carol) |