Prosterman et al v. Airline Tariff Publishing Company, et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Maxine M Chesney |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-02017 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 08, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 15, 2016 3:32 AM PDT |
Defendant
Airline Tariff Publishing Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United Airlines, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
American Airlines, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sylvia N. Sparks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Len Marazzo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa McCarthy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Ann Meeuwsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L. West Oehmig, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Prosterman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah M. Pulfer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dana L. Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert A. Rosenthal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bill Rubinsohn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sondra K. Russell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
June Stansbury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Whalen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clyde D. Stensrud
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Taleff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Talewsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Annette M. Tippetts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diana Lynn Ultican
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Michael Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela S. Ward
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn Fjord
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine R. Arcell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Dean Bradt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Bray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose M. Brito
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jan Marie Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert D. Conway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Crandall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosemary D'Augusta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda K. Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Faust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael C. Malaney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Freeland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Fry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gabriel Garavanian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harry Garavanian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lee M. Gentry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valarie Ann Jolly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gail S. Kosach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Lovell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
135 | 135
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 03/27 10:16 AM
ORDER of U.S. Supreme Court as to117 Notice of Appeal filed by Cynthia Prosterman. (mclS, COURT STAFF) |