Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James T Trimble, Jr
Referred: Kathleen Kay
Case #: 2:16-cv-00523
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2016
Terminated:Aug 01, 2016

Debtor
Prison Medical Servies
Mayor Melvin "Kip" Holden Government Building 222 St. Louis Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70801
Last checked: Monday Oct 17, 2016 4:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Dr. Charles Bridges
Prison Medical Services Administrator Mayor Melvin "Kip" Holden Government Building 222 St. Louis Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70801
Defendant
Sid J. Gautreaux, III
Sheriff of East Baton Rouge Parish T.T. Edwards East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Office
Baton Rouge, LA 70801
Defendant
Lt. Colonel Dennis Grimes
East Baton Rouge Parish Prison 2867 General Issac Smith Ave
Baton Rouge, LA 70807
Defendant
Chad Guillot
Represented By
Arthur H Andrews
East Baton Rouge Parish Atty'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Sheriffs Officer
East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Office, T.T. Edwards East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office
Baton Rouge, LA 70801
Defendant
Lt. James Sandridge
East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Department T.T. Edwards East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office
Baton Rouge, LA 70801
Defendant
Charles Bridges
Represented By
John W L Swanner
Seale Smith Et Al
contact info
Defendant
Sid J Gautreaux, III
Represented By
Catherine S St Pierre
Erlingson Banks
contact info
Tara Lynn Johnston
Erlingson Banks
contact info
Mary G Erlingson
Erlingson Banks
contact info
Defendant
Dennis Grimes
Represented By
Catherine S St Pierre
Erlingson Banks
contact info
Tara Lynn Johnston
Erlingson Banks
contact info
Mary G Erlingson
Erlingson Banks
contact info
Defendant
James Sandridge
Represented By
Catherine S St Pierre
Erlingson Banks
contact info
Tara Lynn Johnston
Erlingson Banks
contact info
Mary G Erlingson
Erlingson Banks
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Medical Staff
Represented By
Arthur H Andrews
East Baton Rouge Parish Atty'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Officers
Represented By
Catherine S St Pierre
Erlingson Banks
contact info
Arthur H Andrews
East Baton Rouge Parish Atty'S Office
contact info
Tara Lynn Johnston
Erlingson Banks
contact info
Mary G Erlingson
Erlingson Banks
contact info
Plaintiff
Tina Fugate
Represented By
Lee Marc Schwalben
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, August 03, 2016
utility District Transfer/Remand Record Received Thu 08/04 2:15 PM
DISTRICT COURT TRANSFER Record Received electronically by Middle District of Louisiana on 08/03/2016, case number 3:16-cv-00364. (crt,Reeves, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2016
43 43 motion Dismiss Mon 08/01 11:45 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Dr. Bridges from plaintiff's claims against him and in response to Document 39 filed by plaintiff by Charles Bridges.(aty,Swanner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 2 Proposed order
transfer District Transfer Out (Form Included) Mon 08/01 4:25 PM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from Western District of Louisiana to Middle District of Louisiana. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2016
44 44 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 08/01 4:13 PM
MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER granting13 Motion to Dismiss;14 Motion to Dismiss;19 Motion to Dismiss and37 Motion to Dismiss to the extent that the court finds that the instant lawsuit was filed in the improper venue. It is ORDERED based on the determining that this lawsuit was filed in an improper venue, that the instant lawsuit be TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 7/29/2016. (crt,Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2016
42 42 respm Response to Motion Thu 07/21 11:30 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims against Dr. Bridges filed by Charles Bridges.(aty,Swanner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit First page of original petition for damages,
Att: 2 Proposed order
Friday, July 15, 2016
41 41 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 07/15 1:49 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sid J Gautreaux, III, Dennis Grimes, James Sandridge, Unknown Officers.(aty,St Pierre, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Dilatory Exception
Thursday, July 14, 2016
40 40 misc Suggestion of Death Thu 07/14 2:43 PM
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Tina Fugate by Tina Fugate. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
39 39 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/14 11:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Fugate. Charles Bridges served on 7/12/2016, answer due 8/2/2016.(aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 letter attached to complaint and summons
notice Notice of Corrective Action Tue 07/19 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Lee Marc Schwalben on behalf of Tina Fugate regarding39 Summons Returned Executed. Action taken: Modified docket entry to indicate Attachment #1 inadvertently submitted in 29x40 paper size; clerk re-saved and reattached to docket entry as properly sized pdf document. (crt,Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2016
38 38 notice Notice of Motion Setting (without oral argument) Tue 07/12 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding37 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's claims against Dr. Bridges. Motions referred to James T Trimble, Jr. Motion day set for 8/24/2016 before Judge James T Trimble Jr. (crt,Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2016
37 37 motion Dismiss Mon 07/11 11:02 AM
MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's claims against Dr. Bridges by Charles Bridges.(aty,Swanner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order,
Att: 2 5 pgs Memorandum / Brief
Thursday, July 07, 2016
36 36 17 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 07/07 5:18 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants, Chad Guillot, Unknown Medical Staff and Unknown Officers filed by Tina Fugate.(aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Malpractice Claim,
Att: 2 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Claim
35 35 respm Response to Motion Thu 07/07 5:16 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants, Chad Guillot, Unknown Medical Staff and Unknown Officers filed by Tina Fugate. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
34 34 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 07/07 3:41 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims against Dr. Bridges,18 MOTION to Dismiss Charlie Bridges, M.D. filed by Tina Fugate.(aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Malpractice Claim,
Att: 2 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Claim
33 33 respm Response to Motion Thu 07/07 3:38 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims against Dr. Bridges,18 MOTION to Dismiss Charlie Bridges, M.D. filed by Tina Fugate. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2016
32 32 respm Response to Motion Fri 07/01 6:01 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re19 MOTION to Dismiss,11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tina Fugate. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
31 31 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 07/01 5:57 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re19 MOTION to Dismiss,11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tina Fugate.(aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Medical Malpractice Claim,
Att: 2 Exhibit Acknowledgement from Patient's Compensation Fund
Thursday, June 30, 2016
30 30 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/30 11:36 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Fugate. Unknown Medical Staff served on 6/29/2016, answer due 7/20/2016. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
29 29 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/30 11:34 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Fugate. Sid J Gautreaux, III served on 6/29/2016, answer due 7/20/2016. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/30 11:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Fugate. Dennis Grimes served on 6/29/2016, answer due 7/20/2016. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/30 11:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Fugate. Charles Bridges served on 6/29/2016, answer due 7/20/2016. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/30 11:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Fugate. Chad Guillot served on 6/29/2016, answer due 7/20/2016. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/30 11:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Fugate. James Sandridge served on 6/29/2016, answer due 7/20/2016. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2016
24 24 notice Notice of Motion Setting (without oral argument) Thu 06/23 8:31 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants, Chad Guillot, Unknown Medical Staff and Unknown Officers. Motion referred to Judge James T Trimble, Jr. Motion day set for 7/27/2016 before Judge James T Trimble Jr. (crt,Brown, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
23 23 misc Corrective Document Wed 06/22 4:56 PM
CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Motion to Dismiss filed by Chad Guillot, Unknown Medical Staff, Unknown Officers((City/Parish Officers)) regarding14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants, Chad Guillot, Unknown Medical Staff and Unknown Officers .(aty,Andrews, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 16 pgs Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 2 Proposed order
Tuesday, June 21, 2016
22 22 notice Notice of Motion Setting (without oral argument) Tue 06/21 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding19 MOTION to Dismiss. Motions referred to James T Trimble, Jr. Motion day set for 7/27/2016 before Judge James T Trimble Jr. (crt,Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Motion Setting (without oral argument) Tue 06/21 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims against Dr. Bridges. Motions referred to James T Trimble, Jr. Motion day set for 7/27/2016 before Judge James T Trimble Jr. (crt,Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Corrective Document Tue 06/21 2:20 PM
CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Table of Contents and Authorities re13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Charles Bridges . (aty,Swanner, John) Modified on 6/21/2016 to edit text (Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Tue 06/21 10:21 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Sid J Gautreaux, III, Dennis Grimes, James Sandridge, Unknown Officers.(aty,Erlingson, Mary) Modified on 6/21/2016 to edit text (Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 16 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, June 20, 2016
18 18 motion Dismiss Mon 06/20 2:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Charlie Bridges, M.D. by Charles Bridges.(aty,Swanner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
notice Notice of Corrective Action Tue 06/21 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to John W L Swanner on behalf of Charles Bridges regarding document filed in ERROR as18 MOTION to Dismiss Charlie Bridges, M.D. Action taken: Modified docket entry to reflect "Filed in Error"; corrected and refiled as20 Corrective Document/ Table of Contents and Authorities. (crt,Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2016
17 17 notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 06/17 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency to Mary G Erlingson on behalf of Sid J Gautreaux, III, Dennis Grimes, James Sandridge, Unknown Officers regarding11 MOTION to Dismiss. Reason: A table of contents and table of cases, statutes and other authorities is required for a brief which exceeds ten pages. (crt,Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 06/17 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency to Arthur H Andrews on behalf of Chad Guillot, Unknown Medical Staff, Unknown Officers (City/Parish Officers) regarding14 MOTION to Dismiss. Reason: A table of contents and table of cases, statutes and other authorities is required for a brief which exceeds ten pages. (crt,Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 06/17 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency to John W L Swanner on behalf of Charles Bridges regarding13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims against Dr. Bridges. Reason: A table of contents and table of cases, statutes and other authorities is required for a brief which exceeds ten pages. (crt,Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2016
14 14 motion Dismiss Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 06/16 4:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendants, Chad Guillot, Unknown Medical Staff and Unknown Officers, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Defendants, Chad Guillot, Unknown Medical Staff and Unknown Officers by Chad Guillot, Unknown Medical Staff, Unknown Officers.(Attorney Arthur H Andrews added to party Chad Guillot(pty:dft), Attorney Arthur H Andrews added to party Unknown Medical Staff(pty:dft), Attorney Arthur H Andrews added to party Unknown Officers(pty:dft))(aty,Andrews, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 2 Proposed order
13 13 motion Dismiss Thu 06/16 4:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims against Dr. Bridges by Charles Bridges.(aty,Swanner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 2 Proposed order
Monday, June 13, 2016
12 12 notice Notice of Motion Setting (without oral argument) Mon 06/13 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding11 MOTION to Dismiss. Motions referred to James T Trimble, Jr. Motion day set for 7/27/2016 before Judge James T Trimble Jr. (crt,Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2016
11 11 motion Dismiss Fri 06/10 3:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Sid J Gautreaux, III, Dennis Grimes, James Sandridge, Unknown Officers.(Attorney Mary G Erlingson added to party Sid J Gautreaux, III(pty:dft), Attorney Mary G Erlingson added to party Dennis Grimes(pty:dft), Attorney Mary G Erlingson added to party James Sandridge(pty:dft), Attorney Mary G Erlingson added to party Unknown Officers(pty:dft))(aty,Erlingson, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed order Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 07, 2016
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Tue 06/07 2:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Lt. Colonel James Sandridge on 06/02/2016, filed by Tina Fugate. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Tue 06/07 2:46 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Presiding Officers on 06/02/2016, filed by Tina Fugate. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Tue 06/07 2:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Sheriff S. Gauthreaux, III on 06/02/2016, filed by Tina Fugate. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2016
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Fri 06/03 1:44 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Prison Medical Services Staff on 5/26/2016, filed by Tina Fugate. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Fri 06/03 1:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Lt. Colonel Dennis Grimes on 5/26/2016, filed by Tina Fugate. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Fri 06/03 1:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Chad Guillot on 5/26/2016, filed by Tina Fugate. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Fri 06/03 1:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Dr. Charles Bridges on 5/26/2016, filed by Tina Fugate. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/22 3:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Tina Fugate. (aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Fri 04/22 12:26 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Charles Bridges, Sid J Gautreaux, III, Dennis Grimes, Chad Guillot, James Sandridge, Unknown Medical Staff, Unknown Officers. (crt,Whidden, C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/20 5:37 PM
COMPLAINT on behalf of Tina Fugate, Individually and on behalf of her deceased son, Randall Toler against Charles Bridges, Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Dennis Grimes, Chad Guillot, Sheriffs Officer, Prison Medical Servies, James Sandridge with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3051784) filed by Tina Fugate.(Attorney Lee Marc Schwalben added to party Tina Fugate(pty:pla))(aty,Schwalben, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/22 12:25 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James T Trimble, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Whidden, C)
Related: [-]