Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:16-bk-11003
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2016
Terminated:Aug 13, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$10,000,000,001 to $50 billion
Est. Liabilities $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
SunEdison Canada, LLC
13736 Riverport Dr
Maryland Heights, MO 63043-4820
Represented By
Jay M. Goffman
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Monday, August 13, 2018
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 08/13 4:33 PM
Case Closed. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
6 6 order Order, Final Decree Fri 08/10 2:33 PM
Order of Final Decree Authorizing Closing Of Case Signed On 8/10/2018. (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2016
5 5 misc Schedules Wed 07/20 11:46 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual /Schedule of Assets and Liabilities for SunEdison Canada, LLC (Case No. 16-11003 Filed by Scott Eric Ratner on behalf of SunEdison Canada, LLC. (Ratner, Scott)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Wed 07/20 10:50 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual /Statement of Financial Affairs for SunEdison Canada, LLC (Case No. 16-11003 Filed by Scott Eric Ratner on behalf of SunEdison Canada, LLC. (Ratner, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2016
3 3 order Motion, Joint Administration Mon 04/25 10:40 AM
Order signed on 4/25/2016, Granting Debtors' Motion for Order (I)Directing Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) and (II) Waiving Requirements of Bankruptcy Code Section 342(c)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 2002(n) Related [+] (The Docket in Case No. 16-10992 SMB) should be consulted for all matters affecting the above listed case) . (Richards, Beverly)
Related: [-] 2
Thursday, April 21, 2016
2 2 motion Motion, Joint Administration Thu 04/21 2:23 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Debtors' Motion for Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) and (II) Waiving Requirements of Bankruptcy Code Section 342(c)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 2002(n) filed by Jay M. Goffman on behalf of SunEdison Canada, LLC with hearing to be held on 4/22/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 4/22/2016,. (Goffman, Jay)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 04/21 11:01 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Jay M. Goffman of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP on behalf of SunEdison Canada, LLC. (Goffman, Jay)
Related: [-]
Judge Stuart M. Bernstein added to the case. (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]
misc Add Judge Thu 04/21 11:03 AM
Judge Stuart M. Bernstein added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 04/21 8:16 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-11003 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11245020. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1