Colorado District Court
Judge:Michael E Hegarty
Referred: Nina Y Wang
Case #: 1:16-cv-00916
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2016
Terminated:Apr 03, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 19, 2016 3:15 AM MDT
Counter Claimant
Jacques Henri Taylor
Represented By
Courtney Paige Hirsekorn
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
John (Jack) Markham Tanner
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Charles McMillin
Represented By
Courtney Paige Hirsekorn
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
John (Jack) Markham Tanner
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Gregory Mack
Represented By
Courtney Paige Hirsekorn
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
John (Jack) Markham Tanner
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Fitness Opportunities Inc.
Represented By
Courtney Paige Hirsekorn
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
John (Jack) Markham Tanner
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Kevin Dunn
Represented By
Courtney Paige Hirsekorn
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
John (Jack) Markham Tanner
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Matthew Bernier
Represented By
John Allan Arsenault
Donelson Barry, LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC
Represented By
Lisa A. Hogan
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, Llp-Denver
contact info
Matthew C. Arentsen
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, Llp-Denver
contact info
Mitchell J. Langberg
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, Llp-Los Angeles
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Dunn
Represented By
Courtney Paige Hirsekorn
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
John (Jack) Markham Tanner
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Fitness Opportunities Inc.
Represented By
Courtney Paige Hirsekorn
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
John (Jack) Markham Tanner
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jacques Henri Taylor
Represented By
Courtney Paige Hirsekorn
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
John (Jack) Markham Tanner
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Charles McMillin
Represented By
Courtney Paige Hirsekorn
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
John (Jack) Markham Tanner
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Gregory Mack
Represented By
Courtney Paige Hirsekorn
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
John (Jack) Markham Tanner
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Fitness Opportunities Inc. d/b/a Physicians Fitness
Represented By
John (Jack) Markham Tanner
Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Bernier
Represented By
John Allan Arsenault
Donelson Barry, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC
Represented By
Lisa A. Hogan
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, Llp-Denver
contact info
Matthew C. Arentsen
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, Llp-Denver
contact info
Mitchell J. Langberg
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, Llp-Los Angeles
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
117 117 1 pgs order Judgment - Clerk Tue 04/03 4:29 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk on 4/3/18. (rkeec)
Related: [-]
116 116 10 pgs misc Settlement Agreement Tue 04/03 4:11 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Defendant Matthew Bernier. (tsher, )
Related: [-]
115 115 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Tue 04/03 4:08 PM
ORDER on114 Joint Motion for Approval, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/3/2018. The Court enters the Settlement Agreement (ECF No. 114-1) as an Order of the Court and, by operation of this entry of final judgment, the Court dismisses this action with prejudice as to all claims and all remaining Parties. (tsher, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
114 114 6 pgs motion Order Thu 03/29 4:57 PM
Joint MOTION for Order to For Approval of Settlement Agreement as Stipulated Final Judgment by Counter Claimant Matthew Bernier.(Arsenault, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
113 113 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Party Wed 03/28 9:11 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting111 Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims Between MAT and Mack, Dunn, Taylor, McMillin, and Fitness Opportunities, Inc. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/28/2018. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove Defendants Mack, Dunn,Taylor, McMillin, and Fitness Opportunities, Inc. from the case caption. (mdave, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
112 112 minutes Status Conference Tue 03/27 2:29 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 3/27/2018. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
Related: [-]
111 111 motion Dismiss Party Tue 03/27 12:47 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Mack, Dunn, Taylor, McMillin and Fitness Opportunities Inc d/b/a Physicians Fitness by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC.(Langberg, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
110 110 order Minute Order Tue 03/27 11:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/27/2018. A Telephone Status Conference set for 3/27/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All parties shall conference together and call Chambers at 303-844-4507 at the scheduled time. (mdave, )
Related: [-]