Lamour v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jose E Martinez |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-21449 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 15:0002 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 19, 2016 5:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jean Edner Lamour
AN INDIVIDUAL c/o Richman Greer 250 Australian Avenue South Suite 1504
West Palm Beach, FL 33401 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Silvia Kaplun
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sebastian Rojas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Turel Tal Schwartz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
136 | 136
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Thu 07/12 3:36 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re135 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, by Nathaniel Mark Edenfield on behalf of Jean Edner Lamour (Edenfield, Nathaniel) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
135 | 135
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 07/11 9:27 AM
ORDER granting134 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Gerald F. Richman; Stephen John Schultz; Thomas G. Schultz; Nathaniel Mark Edenfield and Adam Michael Myron withdrawn from case. Deadline to obtain new counsel 8/10/2018. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/10/18. See attached document for full details. (rms1) |