Null v. Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Helmick |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-01012 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 29:2661 Family Medical Leave Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 24, 2016 5:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Null
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 02/03 8:13 AM
Order of Case Dismissal with prejudice. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 2/3/2017. (S,AL) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
oth_doc
Proposed Order
Wed 02/01 4:02 PM
Proposed Order of Dismissal filed by Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC. (Cashen, John) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Case Referred to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Minute Order _ Telephone Conference
Thu 01/05 10:14 AM
Order of Telephone Status Conference held on 1/4/2017. The February 3, 2017 discovery deadline is vacated; Case referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II for a January or February settlement conference, or at the earliest possible time. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 1/5/2017. Time: 15 min(SG,D) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minute Order _ Telephone Conference
Wed 12/07 3:56 PM
Order of Telephone Conference held on 12/7/2016. Defense counsel shall provide plaintiff's counsel the analysis at issue in 14 days of this order; Telephone Status Conference set for 1/4/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. The Court shall initiate the call. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/7/2016. Time: 30 min(SG,D) |
|
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minute Order _ Telephone Conference
Thu 09/08 11:19 AM
Order of Telephone Conference held on 9/7/2016. Telephone Conference set for 12/7/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. The Court will initiate the phone call. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/8/2016. Time:.15(S,AL) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Case Management Conference
Thu 06/30 3:54 PM
Order of Case Management Conference held on 6/29/2016. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 2/3/2017. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 10/28/2016. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/7/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick and the Court will initiate the call. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/30/2016. Time: 10 min (SG,D) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Wed 06/22 4:22 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Jennifer Null. (Paoff, Kera) |
|
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
Mon 06/13 9:48 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by John C. Cashen for defendant KUKA Toledo Production Operations, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/13/2016.(SG,D) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/10 2:57 PM
Motion for attorney John C. Cashen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 14660086873, filed by Defendant Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC..(G,CA) |
|
Att: 1 Certificates of Good Standing | ||
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
minutes
~Util - Set Hearings Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
Mon 06/06 12:02 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice: case management conference to be held on 6/29/2016 at 09:30 AM at Chambers 210 before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. (S,AL) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
oth_evt
Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
Thu 05/26 10:37 AM
Notice to Attorney John C. Cashen. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s)4 . (G,CA) |
||
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/25 4:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent KUKA AG (KUKA Aktiengesellschaft), KUKA U.S. Holdings Company, LLC for Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC filed by Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC. (Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/25 3:59 PM
Answer to1 Complaint filed by Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC. (Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service Executed
Mon 05/09 12:14 PM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC on 5/5/2016, date of service not indicated on certified return receipt, filed on behalf of Jennifer Null (Franklin, John) Modified text on 5/9/2016 (H,JD) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Wed 04/27 3:36 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC. (H,JD) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/27 2:49 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-7595672. Filed by Jennifer Null. (Franklin, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Wed 04/27 2:59 PM
Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (H,JD) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/27 3:00 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (H,JD) |
||
oth_evt
Notice re Prompt Service
Wed 04/27 3:36 PM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (H,JD) |