Member Case
Lead case is: 1:12-bk-12020

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:12-bk-12045
Case Filed:May 14, 2012
Terminated:Mar 16, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
PATI A, LLC
1100 Virginia Dr
Fort Washington, PA 19034-3204
Represented By
Larren M. Nashelsky
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 05/15/2012 3:44 AM EDT
Monday, May 14, 2012
Judge Martin Glenn added to the case. (Vaccaro, Amanda).
Related: [-]
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-12045 [misc,824] (1046.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 8555873. Fee amount 1046.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 9/11/2012, Disclosure Statement due by 9/11/2012, Initial Case Conference due by 6/13/2012, Filed by Larren M. Nashelsky of Morrison & Foerster LLP on behalf of PATI A, LLC. (Nashelsky, Larren)
Related: [-]
2 2 Motion for Joint Administration / Debtors' Motion For Order Under Bankruptcy Rule 1015 Authorizing Joint Administration Of The Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases filed by Larren M. Nashelsky on behalf of PATI A, LLC. (Nashelsky, Larren)
Related: [-]
3 3 Order signed on 5/14/2012 by United States Bankruptcy Judge James M. Peck directing joint administration of chapter 11 cases 12-12019 Through 12-12040 and 12-12042 Through 12-12071 Case Number 12-12020 Should be Consulted for all Matters Affecting This Case Related [+]. (Tetzlaff, Deanna)
Related: [-] 2