North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:David S Cayer
Case #: 3:10-cv-00556
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2010
Terminated:Jun 24, 2011

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, June 23, 2011
18 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Wireless Communications, Inc. (Chapman, Karen) Modified text on 6/24/2011 (tmg).
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2011
17 17 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 5 days. Discovery due by 10/17/2011. Motions due by 11/21/2011. Mediation deadline set for 11/7/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/16/2011. (tmg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2011
16 16 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Kane, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2011
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. (tmg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2011
15 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Epicor Software Corporation.(Kane, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2011
14 14 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss, counts I, II, III, IV, VII, VIII and IX are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/10/11. (com)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2011
13 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss by Epicor Software Corporation. (Kane, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2010
12 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Reply due by 1/3/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/21/2010. (bsw)
Related: [-]
11 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re:8 MOTION to Dismiss by Epicor Software Corporation.Responses due by 1/7/2011.(Kane, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: consent to extension,
Att: 2 Exhibit B: proposed order
Friday, December 17, 2010
10 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Dismiss by Wireless Communications, Inc.. Replies due by 12/30/2010. (James, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2010
9 9 23 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re8 MOTION to Dismiss by Epicor Software Corporation.(Kane, Margaret) Modified text on 12/1/2010, Memo in support - not motion (tmg).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
8 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Epicor Software Corporation.Responses due by 12/17/2010. (Kane, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2010
7 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wireless Communications, Inc. (James, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2010
Added Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer; District Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to case. (tob)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer no longer assigned to case as a referral Judge. (tob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2010
6 6 Joint Stipulation of CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by all parties. (Kane, Margaret) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/9/2010) (tmg).
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2010
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen H. Chapman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Chapman, Karen)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Notice of Removal. Epicor Software Corporation answer due 11/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/5/2010. (tmg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2010
3 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Epicor Software Corporation. (Kane, Margaret). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2010
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Epicor Software Corporation (Kane, Margaret)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of Mecklenburg County, North Carolina, case number 10-CVS-18891. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0419-1200358), filed by Epicor Software Corporation.(Kane, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings
Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and referred to Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Initial Scheduling Order] and[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form] pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (tmg)
Related: [-]