New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 7:16-bk-22589
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Feb 23, 2018
Claims Deadline:Apr 02, 2018
Converted:Dec 07, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Allways East Transportation Inc.
870 Nepperhan Ave
Yonkers, NY 10703-2011
Represented By
Erica Feynman Aisner
Delbello Donnellan Weingarten Wise & Wiederkehr, LLP
contact info
Julie Cvek Curley
Delbello Donnellan Weingarten Wise & Wiederkehr, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Pasternak
Delbello Donnellan Weingarten Wise & Wiederkehr, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
IPFS Corporation
Represented By
Michael S. Davis
Zeichner Ellman & Krause, LLP
contact info
Trustee
Howard P. Magaliff
Howard P. Magaliff - Chapter 7 Trustee 335 Madison Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Harrison Breakstone
Archer & Greiner, P.C
contact info
Howard P. Magaliff
contact info
Robert N. Michaelson
Rich Michaelson Magaliff Moser, LLP
contact info
Gerard DiConza
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014
Represented By
Andrea Beth Schwartz
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2024 11:03 AM EDT
Thursday, April 28, 2016
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 04/28 10:40 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-22589 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11254920. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Thu 04/28 11:58 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated for: Statement of Operations; Balance Sheet; Employee Income Record and Cash Flow Statement. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Thu 04/28 12:00 PM
Deficiencies Set: Declaration of Schedules due 5/12/2016. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 5/12/2016. Incomplete Filings due by 5/12/2016. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 04/28 10:36 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 05/12/2016. Schedule D due 05/12/2016. Schedule E/F due 05/12/2016. Schedule G due 05/12/2016. Schedule H due 05/12/2016. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 05/12/2016. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/12/2016. Atty Disclosure State. due 05/12/2016. Statement of Operations Due: 05/12/2016. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 05/12/2016. Balance Sheet Due Date:05/12/2016. Employee Income Record Due: 05/12/2016. Cash Flow Statement Due:05/12/2016. Incomplete Filings due by 05/12/2016, Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/26/2016, Disclosure Statement due by 8/26/2016, Initial Case Conference due by 5/31/2016, Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner of Delbello Donnellan Weingarten Wise & Wiederkehr, LLP on behalf of Allways East Transportation Inc.. (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Motion, Authorize Thu 04/28 11:58 AM
Motion to Authorize Payment to Employees for Pre-Petition Wages filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Allways East Transportation Inc. with hearing to be held on 4/29/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Payroll Report
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Interim Order
3 3 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11,12) (BNC) Thu 04/28 12:03 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/25/2016 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (Room 243A, White Plains Courthouse). (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice, Hearing Thu 04/28 12:25 PM
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Interim Hearing on Motion to Authorize Payment to Employees for Pre-Petition Wages Related [+] filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Allways East Transportation Inc.. with hearing to be held on 4/29/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-] 2
5 5 misc Affidavit Thu 04/28 12:40 PM
Affidavit of Erica Feynman Aisner Pursuant to LBR 9077-1 in Support of Request for Hearing on Shortened Notice on Debtor's Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Wages Related [+] Filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Allways East Transportation Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-] 2
6 6 notice Notice, Hearing Thu 04/28 3:15 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of RESCHEDULED Hearing on Interim Relief on Debtors Motion for Entry of Order (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Pay and Honor Certain Prepetition Claims for (a) Wages, Salaries, Employee Benefits and Other Compensation, and (B) Withholdings and Deductions; and (II) Directing the Banks to Receive, Process, Honor and Pay all Checks Presented for Payment and Electronic Payment Requests Relating to the Foregoing, together with Motion and related exhibits thereto Related [+] filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Allways East Transportation Inc.. with hearing to be held on 4/29/2016 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse(Curley, Julie)
Related: [-] 4 ,2 ,5
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service