Washington Western District Court
Judge:John C Coughenour
Case #: 2:16-cv-00615
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2016
Terminated:Feb 07, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 25, 2016 2:07 AM PDT
Defendant
City of Bellevue
Represented By
Kasey D Huebner
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Geoffrey M Grindeland
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Defendant
Jamie Collins
Represented By
Kasey D Huebner
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Geoffrey M Grindeland
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Defendant
Matthew McDade
Represented By
Kasey D Huebner
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Geoffrey M Grindeland
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Defendant
Dion Robertson
Represented By
Kasey D Huebner
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Geoffrey M Grindeland
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Defendant
Eric Steppe
Represented By
Kasey D Huebner
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Geoffrey M Grindeland
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Defendant
Officer Jamie Collins
Represented By
Kasey D Huebner
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Geoffrey M Grindeland
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Defendant
Officer Matthew McDade
Represented By
Kasey D Huebner
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Geoffrey M Grindeland
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Defendant
Officer Dion Robertson
Represented By
Kasey D Huebner
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Geoffrey M Grindeland
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Defendant
Officer Eric Steppe
Represented By
Kasey D Huebner
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Geoffrey M Grindeland
Mills Meyers Swartling
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard L. Pope
Lake Hills Legal Services, P.C. 15600 NE 8th Street Suite B-358
Bellevue, WA 98008
Plaintiff
Richard L Pope, Jr
Represented By
Richard Lamar Pope, Jr
Lake Hills Legal Services PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 07, 2017
35 35 order Judgment by Court Tue 02/07 9:43 AM
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE (RM)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/07 9:38 AM
ORDER Granting25 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
33 33 respm Surreply Fri 01/06 3:25 PM
SURREPLY filed by Defendants City of Bellevue, Jamie Collins, Matthew McDade, Dion Robertson, Eric Steppe re25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Grindeland, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
32 32 respm Response to Motion Tue 01/03 11:44 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Richard L Pope, Jr, to25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Pope, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
31 31 order Order on Motion to Continue ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date Mon 12/12 9:28 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's27 Motion to Continue. Clerk directed to renote Defendants'25 MOTION to dismiss from 12/16/2016 to 1/6/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Mon 12/12 9:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting26 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and Extend Deadlines, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2016
29 29 respm Response to Motion Thu 12/08 10:35 AM
RESPONSE, by Defendants City of Bellevue, Jamie Collins, Matthew McDade, Dion Robertson, Eric Steppe, to27 MOTION to Continue Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Dkt # 25] . (Grindeland, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
28 28 order Order to Re-Note Motion Wed 12/07 11:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER directing the Clerk to renote Plaintiff's27 MOTION to Continue Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Dkt #25 ]; Noting Date is 12/9/2016. Defendant's response due 12/9/2016. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2016
27 27 motion Continue Tue 12/06 11:18 PM
MOTION to Continue Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Dkt # 25] by Plaintiff Richard L Pope, Jr. Noting Date 12/6/2016, (Pope, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
26 26 motion Extension of Time-Other Tue 11/22 3:26 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Stay Discovery and Extend Deadlines by Defendants City of Bellevue, Jamie Collins, Matthew McDade, Dion Robertson, Eric Steppe. Noting Date 11/22/2016, (Grindeland, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
25 25 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 11/22 12:48 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants City of Bellevue, Jamie Collins, Matthew McDade, Dion Robertson, Eric Steppe. Noting Date 12/16/2016, (Grindeland, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 21, 2016
24 24 order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Mon 11/21 4:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER denying pltf's22 Motion for Reconsideration by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2016
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/18 11:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants, filed by Richard L Pope, Jr.(Pope, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
22 22 motion Reconsideration Tue 11/15 11:36 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re21 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Richard L Pope, Jr. Noting Date 11/15/2016, (Pope, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Reconsideration
Tuesday, November 01, 2016
21 21 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 11/01 1:08 PM
ORDER granting defendants'14 Motion to Dismiss; plaintiff granted leave to amend the complaint by 11/18/16 by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2016
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 09/30 3:21 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendants City of Bellevue, Jamie Collins, Matthew McDade, Dion Robertson, Eric Steppe, TO RESPONSE to14 MOTION to Dismiss (Grindeland, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2016
19 19 respm Response to Motion Mon 09/26 11:42 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Richard L Pope, Jr, to14 MOTION to Dismiss . (Pope, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2016
18 18 order Order to Re-Note Motion ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 09/08 12:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Plaintiff's17 MOTION to continue the noting date on Defendants' Rule 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Defendants'14 Motion is renoted for 9/30/2016. (PM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2016
17 17 motion Continue Wed 09/07 11:56 PM
MOTION to Continue Defendants Rule 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiff Richard L Pope, Jr. Noting Date 9/7/2016, (Pope, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue Defendants Rule 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Thursday, August 18, 2016
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date Thu 08/18 7:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting the15 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and Extend Deadlines. Defendants'14 Rule 12(c) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings is RENOTED for 9/16/2016. The status conference with the Court, currently set for 9/13/2016 13 is VACATED to be rescheduled at least 7 days after the Court rules on Defendants'14 Motion. (PM)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2016
15 15 motion Extension of Time-Other Mon 08/15 9:31 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Stay Discovery and Extend Deadlines by Defendants City of Bellevue, Jamie Collins, Matthew McDade, Dion Robertson, Eric Steppe. Noting Date 8/15/2016, (Grindeland, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 04, 2016
14 14 motion Dismiss Thu 08/04 8:07 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants City of Bellevue, Jamie Collins, Matthew McDade, Dion Robertson, Eric Steppe. Noting Date 8/26/2016, (Huebner, Kasey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 06, 2016
13 13 notice Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Wed 07/06 2:56 PM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders the Status Conference RESET from 8/9/16 to 9/13/16 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(PP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/01 10:16 AM
ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Jamie Collins, Matthew McDade, Dion Robertson, Eric Steppe.(Grindeland, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2016
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/31 10:52 PM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant City of Bellevue on 3/30/2016 (Pope, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2016
10 10 service Waiver of Service Thu 05/05 4:52 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Eric Steppe mailed on 4/28/2016 (Pope, Richard)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Thu 05/05 4:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Dion Robertson mailed on 4/28/2016 (Pope, Richard)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Thu 05/05 4:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Matthew McDade mailed on 4/28/2016 (Pope, Richard)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Thu 05/05 4:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Jamie Collins mailed on 4/28/2016 (Pope, Richard)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/05 3:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by City of Bellevue.(Grindeland, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2016
5 5 misc JCC-Set Status Conference Mon 05/02 9:08 AM
MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 8/9/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Discovery and Depositions Order (form) Mon 05/02 9:07 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2016
3 3 misc Verification of State Court Records Fri 04/29 11:23 AM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant City of Bellevue (Grindeland, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Judge Assignment Letter Fri 04/29 9:41 AM
LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (copy mailed to plaintiff via U.S. Postal Service) (ST)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/29 9:39 AM
U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (ST)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to Filer Fri 04/29 9:50 AM
NOTICE TO FILER: Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and Local General Rule 2(h), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signors' names' printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines." Attorney Kasey D Huebner was listed on the Notice of Removal, but did not include an original signature or an electronic signature (i.e., /s/John Doe). You do not have to re-file this document, but please be sure all future documents are properly signed. Thank you. (ST)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation/Remark (public entry) Fri 04/29 3:40 PM
Plaintiff Richard L. Pope, Jr. is an attorney admitted in the Western District of Washington. He status had been updated on the court docket to reflect this. Documents1 ,2 ,3 were regenerated via ECF to Mr. Pope. (PM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2016
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/28 9:45 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 16 2-09210 1; Related [+], filed by City of Bellevue.(Grindeland, Geoffrey)
Related: [-] ceipt # 0981-4430824
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet