Salutria Pharmaceuticals LLC
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mary Grace Diehl |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-57532 |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2016 |
Debtor
Salutria Pharmaceuticals LLC
6430 River Chase Cir
Sandy Springs, GA 30328-3551 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2016 12:01 AM EDT |
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) for Non-Individual Fee $ 335, Filed by David W. Cranshaw of Morris, Manning & Martin, L.L.P. on behalf of Salutria Pharmaceuticals LLC. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/26/2016. (Cranshaw, David) | |
Att: 1 Attachment to Petition | ||
2 | 2 Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-57532 [misc,1011aty] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 41647174. Fee Amount 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) | |
3 | 3 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtor filed by David W. Cranshaw on behalf of Salutria Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Cranshaw, David) | |
4 | 4 Attorney Disclosure Statement filed by David W. Cranshaw on behalf of Salutria Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Cranshaw, David) | |
5 | 5 Schedule A/B filed by David W. Cranshaw on behalf of Salutria Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Cranshaw, David) | |
6 | 6 Schedule D filed by David W. Cranshaw on behalf of Salutria Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Cranshaw, David) | |
7 | 7 Schedule E/F filed by David W. Cranshaw on behalf of Salutria Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Cranshaw, David) | |
8 | 8 Schedule G filed by David W. Cranshaw on behalf of Salutria Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Cranshaw, David) | |
9 | 9 Schedule H filed by David W. Cranshaw on behalf of Salutria Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Cranshaw, David) | |
10 | 10 Statement of Financial Affairs filed by David W. Cranshaw on behalf of Salutria Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Cranshaw, David) | |
11 | 11 Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Debtor filed by David W. Cranshaw on behalf of Salutria Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Cranshaw, David) | |
12 | 12 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by David W. Cranshaw on behalf of Salutria Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Cranshaw, David) |