Minnesota District Court
Judge:John R Tunheim
Referred: Katherine M Menendez
Case #: 0:16-cv-01127
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause20:1681 Sex/Blindness Discrimination in Educational Programs
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 26, 2016 4:43 AM CDT
Defendant
University of St. Thomas
Represented By
Ellen A Brinkman
Briggs & Morgan, PA
contact info
Michael M Sawers
Briggs & Morgan, PA
contact info
David A Schooler
Briggs & Morgan, PA
contact info
Maren F Grier
Briggs & Morgan, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe
Represented By
Beau D McGraw
Mcgraw Law Firm, PA
contact info

GPO Mar 01 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant's 43 Motion to Dismiss. The motion is GRANTED as to Counts, I, II, III, IV, and V. Plaintiff's claims for Declaratory Judgment (Count I), Breach of Contract (Count IV), and Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing (Count V) are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims for Violation of Title IX Erroneous Outcome (Count II) and Violation of Title IX Deliberate Indifference (Count III) are dismissed without prejudice. The motion is DENIED with respect to the negligence claims found in Count VI of the Amended Complaint.(Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on March 1, 2017. (DML)

Docket last updated: 03/22/2017 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
67 67 order Order Tue 3:12 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/21/17.(kt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
66 66 misc Redacted Document (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings) Wed 4:11 PM
Redacted Document for65 Sealed Answer . (Schooler, David)
Related: [-]
65 65 misc Sealed Document Wed 4:06 PM
SEALED Answer re34 Amended Complaint, by University of St. Thomas. (Schooler, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2017
64 64 notice Notice to Attorney - Case Reassigned to DTS Tue 11:05 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz, this case is reassigned to him. Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 16-cv-1127 JRT/DTS . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Please contact Katie Haagenson 612-664-5460, for scheduling or other matters related to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (kt)
Related: [-]