Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jack Zouhary
Case #: 3:10-cv-02519
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2010
Terminated:Feb 29, 2012
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2016 5:07 PM EST
Defendant
Joelens (AL) Alcantara
Defendant
Melitian Enterprises, LTD
Defendant
Switzerland and America Trust, LLC
3411 Silverside Rd. Rodney Building, Suite 104
Wilmington, DE 19810
Represented By
Bruce S. Schoenberger
Gressley, Kaplin & Parker
contact info
George J. Conklin
contact info
Howard B. Hershman
Gressley, Kaplin & Parker
contact info
Plaintiff
Intergo, LLC
Represented By
Norman A. Abood
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Andreas Uresch
Terminated: 08/18/2011
Represented By
Bruce S. Schoenberger
Gressley, Kaplin & Parker
contact info
George J. Conklin
contact info
Howard B. Hershman
Gressley, Kaplin & Parker
contact info
Defendant
Khalid Mohamed
Terminated: 08/18/2011
Represented By
Bruce S. Schoenberger
Gressley, Kaplin & Parker
contact info
George J. Conklin
contact info
Howard B. Hershman
Gressley, Kaplin & Parker
contact info

GPO May 24 2011
Report and Recommendation recommending that 15 Joelens (AL) Alcantara and Melitian Enterprises, LTD's Motion to dismiss be denied. Objections to R&R due by 6/7/2011. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 5/24/11. (A,P)
GPO Jun 09 2011
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation 27 and denying re 15 Motion to dismiss complaint. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/9/11. (C,D)
GPO Aug 02 2011
Report and Recommendation recommending that 10 Motion to dismiss filed by Andreas Uresch and Khalid Mohamed be granted. Objections to R&R due by 8/16/2011. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 8/2/11. (A,P)
GPO Aug 18 2011
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation re 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 10) is granted and Plaintiff's claims against Andreas Uresch and Khalid Mohamed are dismissed without prejudice. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/18/11. (C,D)
GPO Feb 29 2012
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is granted (re 41). Plaintiff's Motion to Amend is denied (Re:43). The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/29/12. (C,D)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, February 29, 2012
47 47 Judgment Entry : Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is granted Related [+]. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend is denied. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/29/12. (C,D)
Related: [-] 41 43 46 Memorandum Opinion and Order
46 46 7 pgs Memorandum Opinion and Order : Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is granted Related [+]. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend is denied. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/29/12. (C,D)
Related: [-] 41 43
Copy of46 Memorandum Opinion and Order,47 Judgment, mailed to Melitian Enterprises, LTD and Joelens (AL) Alcantara on 3/1/12. Related document(s)46 ,47 . (C,D)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2012
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Jack Zouhary.This Court held a record hearing on the pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No.41 ) and Motion for leave to file Amended Complaint (Doc. No.43 ) on February 24, 2012. Appearances: Norman Abood, Bruce Schoenberger, and Howard Hershman. The Motion to Dismiss was granted. The Motion to Amend was denied. A brief Memorandum Opinion will follow. Time: 40 mins. (Court Reporter: Angela Nixon.)Time: 40 minutes.Related document(s)41 ,43 . (C,D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2012
45 45 Proposed Order in support of43 Motion for leave to file First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Intergo, LLC. Related document(s)43 .(Abood, Norman) Modified on 2/23/2012 to edit text and to note incorrect event used (B,TM).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2012
44 44 Opposition to41 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Intergo, LLC. (Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
43 43 Motion for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Intergo, LLC..(Abood, Norman) Modified on 2/22/2012 to edit text and event (B,TM).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Proposed First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Exhibits to First Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Proposed Order (has motion text )
Monday, February 13, 2012
Notice [non-document] of Record Hearing set for 2/24/12 at 2:00 PM (moved from 3:00 p.m.) in Courtroom 209 before Judge Jack Zouhary. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
Copy of42 Minute Order _ Telephone Conference, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Notice of Hearing or Conference mailed to Melitian Enterprises, LTD and Joelens (AL) Alcantara on 2/13/12. Related document(s)42 ,. (C,D)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2012
42 42 ORDER. Status Phone Conference held on 2/10/12. Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Instanter granted40 . Plaintiff's response due 2/21/12; no replies. Record Hearing set for 2/24/12 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 209 before Judge Jack Zouhary. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/10/12. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
41 41 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Switzerland and America Trust, LLC. (C,D) Modified on 2/13/2012 (no date on certificate of service) (B,TM).
Related: [-]
40 40 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for leave to file Motion to Dismiss for failure to sate a claim INSTANTER Related [+]. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/10/12.(C,D)
Related: [-] 39
Tuesday, February 07, 2012
39 39 Motion for leave to file Motion to Dismiss for failure to sate a claim INSTANTER filed by Defendant Switzerland and America Trust, LLC. (Hershman, Howard) Modified on 2/8/2012 to edit text and to note no specified date on certificate of service (B,TM).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, January 30, 2012
38 38 ORDER. Status Phone Conference held on 1/27/12. After discussion, another Status Phone Conference set for 2/10/12 at 9:00 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/30/12. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2012
Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 1/27/12 at 3:00 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. The Court will initiate the call. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2012
37 37 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion to substitute Howard B. Hershman for George J. Conklin Related [+]. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/17/12.(C,D)
Related: [-] 36
Copy of37 Order on Motion to substitute attorney mailed to Joelens (AL) Alcantara and Melitian Enterprises, LTD at 1088 Acadia Dr. S.E. Calgary, Alberta, T2J E03 on 1/17/12. Related document(s)37 . (C,D)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2012
36 36 Motion to substitute attorney Howard B. Hershman in place of attorney George J. Conklin filed by Andreas Uresch, Khalid Mohamed, Switzerland and America Trust, LLC. (Hershman, Howard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2011
35 35 Notice to take Deposition of Switzerland and America Trust, LLC Corporate Representative on Friday, December 16, 2011 at 1:00 pm filed by Intergo, LLC. (Abood, Norman) Modified on 11/18/2011 to correct date (B,TM).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2011
Copy of34 32 33 mailed to Joelens (AL) Alcantara and Melitian Enterprises, LTD on 11/17/11. (C,D)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2011
34 34 JERS ORDER re procedures for submission of Exhibits to be used with JERS program. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/14/11. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
33 33 TRIAL ORDER. Jury Trial set for 3/20/12 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 209 before Judge Jack Zouhary. Note: If a case settles "on the courthouse steps" -- that is, anytime within three weeks before trial -- jury costs will be assessed to the parties. Proposed Joint Statement of the Case, motions in limine, proposed voir dire questions and joint proposed jury instructions due 2 weeks before trial. If videotape depositions will be presented in lieu of live trial testimony, counsel shall file a complete written transcript of the videotape deposition, with objections noted, no later than 2 weeks before trial. Counsel shall exchange exhibits and bring to court one set for use at trial. Do not file exhibits with the Clerk of Courts. Counsel shall file a "List of Exhibits" consistent with the JERS CD. Counsel shall notify Chambers well in advance of trial if counsel intend to utilize electronic presentation of evidence, have special needs for courtroom equipment or desire realtime. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/14/11. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER. Status Phone Conference held on 11/9/11. Discovery is ongoing. Jury Trial set for 3/20/12 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 209 before Judge Jack Zouhary. All parties are encouraged to consent to the Magistrate Judge. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/14/11. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2011
31 31 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation re10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No.10 ) is granted and Plaintiff's claims against Andreas Uresch and Khalid Mohamed are dismissed without prejudice. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/18/11. (C,D)
Related: [-]
Copy of31 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, Add and Terminate Parties,, mailed to Joelens (AL) ALcantara and Melitian Enterprises LTD on 8/18/11. Related document(s)31 . (C,D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2011
30 30 Report and Recommendation recommending that10 Motion to dismiss filed by Andreas Uresch and Khalid Mohamed be granted. Objections to R&R due by 8/16/2011. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 8/2/11. (A,P)
Related: [-]
Copy of30 Report and Recommendation mailed to Joelens (AL) Alcantara and Melitian Enterprises, LTD at 1088 Acadia Dr. S.E. Calgary, Alberta, T2J E03 on 8/2/11. Related document(s)30 . (A,P)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2011
29 29 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation27 and denying re15 Motion to dismiss complaint. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/9/11. (C,D)
Related: [-]
Copy of29 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, Terminate Motions mailed to Melitian Enterprises, LTD and Joelens Alcantara on 6/9/11. Related document(s)29 . (C,D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2011
28 28 Minute Order of Status Conference held on 6/1/11. Court discussed discovery issues and Plaintiffs counsel indicated there may be discovery dispute. Court urged counsel to attempt to resolve dispute. If counsel are unable to resolve dispute, certification of discovery dispute pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37.1 should be filed with the Court. Plaintiffs counsel indicated he is continuing to work to perfect service on Defendants Khalid Mohamed and Andreas Uresch. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 6/1/11. Time: 20 minutes(A,P)
Related: [-]
Copy of28 Minute Order mailed to Joelens (AL) Alcantara and Melitian Enterprises, LTD at 1088 Acadia Dr. S.E. Calgary, Alberta, T2J E03 on 6/2/11. Related document(s)28 . (A,P)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2011
27 27 Report and Recommendation recommending that15 Joelens (AL) Alcantara and Melitian Enterprises, LTD's Motion to dismiss be denied. Objections to R&R due by 6/7/2011. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 5/24/11. (A,P)
Related: [-]
26 26 Notice of Service of answer and responses to discovery filed by Switzerland and America Trust, LLC. (Conklin, George) Modified on 5/25/2011 (B,TM).
Related: [-]
Copy of27 Report and Recommendation mailed to Joelens (AL) Alcantara and Melitian Enterprises, LTD at 1088 Acadia Dr. S.E. Calgary, Alberta, T2J E03 on 5/25/11. Related document(s)27 . (A,P)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2011
25 25 Marginal Entry Order granting23 Stipulation that Switzerland and America Trust shall have until 5/23/11 to respond to plaintiff's interrogatories, requests for production of documents and requests for admissions. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 5/17/11.(A,P)
Related: [-]
24 24 Order granting in part22 plaintiff's Motion to Extend time to 7/30/11 to perfect service of process on Defendants Andreas Uresch and Khalid Mohamed or dismiss them from the case without prejudice. No further extensions will be granted. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 5/17/11.(A,P)
Related: [-]
Copy of25 Marginal Entry Order and24 Order mailed to Joelens (AL) Alcantara and Melitian Enterprises, LTD at 1088 Acadia Dr. S.E. Calgary, Alberta, T2J E03 on 5/18/11. Related document(s)25 ,24 . (A,P)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2011
23 23 Stipulated Motion for extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests and Requests for Admissions until May 23, 2011 filed by Defendant Switzerland and America Trust, LLC. (Conklin, George) Modified text on 5/18/2011 (M,L).
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 14, 2011
22 22 Motion for extension of Service of Process until September 4, 2011 filed by Plaintiff Intergo, LLC. Related document(s)19 . (Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2011
21 21 Opposition to15 Motion to dismiss filed by Intergo, LLC. (Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2011
20 20 Notice of Service regarding Discovery Documents served via email upon counsel filed by Intergo, LLC. (Abood, Norman) Modified on 4/6/2011 (G,D).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2011
19 19 Order of Case Management Conference held on 3/29/11. Case is assigned to standard track. Discovery re: Liability due 9/2/11 and Damages due by 11/4/2011. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 5/2/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 10/3/2011, response due 11/3/11, reply due 11/18/11. Status Conference set for 6/1/2011 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 318 before Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II. Plaintiff shall have 60 days from this order (5/30/11) to perfect service on Defendants Andreas Uresch and KhalidMohamed or to dismiss them from the case without prejudice. Failure to do so will result in the Court granting the Motion to dismiss10 . Plaintiff is granted leave to file Opposition to Motion to Dismiss15 by 4/8/11. Defendants Alcantara and Melitian Enterprises may file a Reply by 4/18/11. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 3/29/11. Time: 30 minutes(A,P)
Related: [-]
Copy of19 Order of Case Management Conference mailed to Joelens (AL) Alcantara & Melitian Enterprises, LTC on 3/29/11. Related document(s)19 . (A,P)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2011
18 18 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Attachment 1 , filed by Intergo, LLC. Related document(s)17 .(Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 24, 2011
Notice [non-document] of vacating Case Management Conference set for 3/2/11 upon request of defendant Joelens (AL) Alcantara & Melitian Enterprises, LTC and rescheduling it for 3/29/2011 at 09:00 AM at Chambers 318 before Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II. Counsel and parties reminded to refer to Case Management Ordered issued on 2/4/1117 .Related document(s)17 . (A,P)
Related: [-]
Copy of Notice of Hearing or Conference e:mailed to Joelens (AL) Alcantara & Melitian Enterprises, LTC at Al.Melitian@gmail.com on 2/24/11. (A,P)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2011
Notice [non-document] of vacating Case Management Conference set for 3/1/11 and rescheduling it for 3/2/2011 at 09:00 AM at Chambers 318 before Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II. Counsel and parties reminded to refer to Case Management Ordered issued on 2/4/1117 . (A,P)
Related: [-]
Copy of NEF re: Notice of vacating CMC and rescheduling it mailed to Joelens (AL) Alcantara & Melitian Enterprises, LTC on 2/9/11. (A,P)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2011
17 17 Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice : with case management conference to be held on 3/1/2011 at 09:00 AM at Chambers 318 before Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II. (B,TM) Modified on 2/7/2011 (G,D).
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2011
16 16 Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Switzerland and America Trust, LLC. (Schoenberger, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2011
15 15 Motion to dismiss complaint filed by Joelens (AL) Alcantara and Melitian Enterprises, LTD. (B,TM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 30, 2010
14 14 Response to10 Motion to dismiss party filed by Intergo, LLC.(Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit 1, Affidavit of Service on Khalid Mohamed,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, Affidavit of Service on Andreas Uresch
Wednesday, December 22, 2010
13 13 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Melitian Enterprises, LTD on 12/14/2010, filed on behalf of Intergo, LLC Related document(s)3 . (Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
12 12 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Joelens (AL) Alcantara on 12/14/2010, filed on behalf of Intergo, LLC Related document(s)3 . (Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2010
Order [non-document]granting11 defendant Switzerland and America Trust, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 1/13/2011. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 12/15/10.(A,P)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2010
11 11 Motion for extension of time until January 13, 2011 to answer filed by Defendant Switzerland and America Trust, LLC.(Conklin, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 Motion to dismiss party filed by Andreas Uresch, Khalid Mohamed.(Conklin, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, 2 and 3
9 9 Attorney Appearance by Bruce Schoenberger and George J. Conklin filed by on behalf of Andreas Uresch, Khalid Mohamed, Switzerland and America Trust, LLC. (Conklin, George) Modified on 12/15/2010 (G,D).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2010
8 8 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Khalid Mohamed on 11/24/2010, filed on behalf of Intergo, LLC Related document(s)5 . (Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
7 7 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Andreas Uresch on 11/24/2010, filed on behalf of Intergo, LLC Related document(s)5 . (Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
6 6 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Switzerland and America Trust, LLC on 11/24/2010, filed on behalf of Intergo, LLC Related document(s)3 . (Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2010
Order (non-document) referring case to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/12/2010. Track: Standard. Trial Date:February 2012.(C,D) Modified on 11/15/2010 (G,D).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2010
5 5 Alias Summons issued to attorney for service upon Andreas Uresch, Khalid Mohamed. (C,D)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2010
4 4 Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons . filed by Intergo, LLC.(Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Thursday, November 04, 2010
3 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Andreas Uresch, Joelens (AL) Alcantara, Khalid Mohamed, Melitian Enterprises, LTD, Switzerland and America Trust, LLC. (Attachmen: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (M,C)
Related: [-]
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Intergo, LLC. (Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs Complaint with jury demand against all defendants. Filing fee paid $ 350, Receipt number 0647-4385375. Filed by Intergo, LLc. (Abood, Norman) Modified on 11/4/2010 (L,V).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 39 pgs Exhibit 1-6,
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet
Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,C)
Related: [-]
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Knepp. (M,C)
Related: [-]
Notice by Clerk that Intergo, LLC failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (M,C)
Related: [-]