SHERROD et al v. MCHUGH et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Rudolph Contreras |
Referred: | G Michael Harvey |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00816 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 02, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 29, 2016 6:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PHILLIP MCHUGH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
441 4th Street NW
Washington, DC 20001 |
|
Defendant
SCHULZ SCHULZ
Harbor Square Condominiums 506 N Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024 |
|
Defendant
DIANE LEE SCHULZ
Harbor Square Condominiums 506 N Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024 |
Represented By
|
Lead Plaintiffs
VASHTI SHERROD
920 Lake Front Drive
Mitchellville, MD 20721 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EUGENE SHERROD
920 Lake Front Drive
Mitchellville, MD 20721 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Terminated: 06/14/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
100 | 100
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 03/19 3:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of all claims between all parties with prejudice by EUGENE SHERROD, VASHTI SHERROD. (Enslein, Peter) |
|
99 | 99
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 03/19 3:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of all claims including claims for punitive damages against Defendant Phillip McHugh with prejudice by EUGENE SHERROD, VASHTI SHERROD. (Enslein, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
98 | 98
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Tue 03/12 4:05 PM
STIPULATION re41 Amended Complaint Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Count 11 of the Second Amended Complaint Against Defendant Schulz by EUGENE SHERROD, VASHTI SHERROD. (Enslein, Peter) |