Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:16-cr-00554
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2016
Terminated:Aug 05, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 06, 2017 2:14 PM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David Matthew Paxton
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Hector Raul Saucedo-Garcia (1)
Terminated: 08/05/2016
Represented By
Nadia S. Medrano
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/03/2024 1:07 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 26, 2016
1 1 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Hector Raul Saucedo-Garcia (1) count(s) 1, filed. (jengonzalez, 7) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/10/2016) (cjones, 7).
Related: [-]
2 2 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Hector Raul Saucedo-Garcia, filed.(jengonzalez, 7) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/4/2016) (drodriguez, 7). (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/10/2016) (cjones, 7).
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF ARREST WARRANT as to Hector Raul Saucedo-Garcia ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter E. Ormsby) Parties notified. (jengonzalez, 7)
Related: [-]