CHC Group Ltd. and CHC Helicopters (Barbados) SRL
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barbara J Houser |
Case #: | 3:16-bk-31854 |
Case Filed: | May 05, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 22, 2016 |
Claims Deadline: | Aug 26, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 17, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Mar 03, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Debtor
CHC Helicopter (4) S.a.r.l.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Lloyd Bass Strait Helicopters Pty. Ltd.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Lloyd Helicopters International Pty. Ltd.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Integra Leasing AS
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Heli-One Leasing (Norway) AS
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Management Aviation Limited
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Heli-One (UK) Limited
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th FL
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Heliworld Leasing Limited
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Helicopter (5) S.a.r.l.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Heli-One Leasing ULC
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Helicopter (1) S.a.r.l
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Heli-One Canada ULC
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th FL.
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Heli-One Holdings (UK) Limited
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th FL.
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Helicopter (2) S.a.r.l.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Holding (UK) Limited
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Norway Acquisition Co AS
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Global Operations Canada (2008) ULC
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Heli-One (Netherlands) B.V.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Helicopter Australia Pty. Ltd
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Lloyd Helicopter Services Limited
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Holding NL B.V.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Helicopter Holding S.a.r.l.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Heli-One (Norway) AS
600 East Las Colinas Blvd.,10th FL
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Lloyd Helicopter Services Pty. Ltd.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Helicopter (3) S.a.r.l.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Global Operations International ULC
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Heli-One (U.S.) Inc.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., Ste 1000
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Global Operations (2008) ULC
600 East Las Colinas Blvd. 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Heli-One USA Inc.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd. 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
6922767 Holding SARL
600 East Las Colinas Blvd. 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Capital Aviation Services B.V.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd. 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Cayman ABL Borrower Ltd.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd. 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Cayman ABL Holdings Ltd.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd. 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Cayman Investments I Ltd.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd. 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
|
Debtor
CHC Den Helder B.V.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd. 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Hoofddorp B.V.
600 E. Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Helicopter S.A.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Helicopters (Barbados) Limited
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Netherlands B.V.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Helicopters (Barbados) SRL
600 East Las Colinas Blvd., 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
CHC Group Ltd.
600 East Las Colinas Blvd. 10th Floor
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:16 PM CST |
Accountant
Majid Mahallati
|
|
Accountant
PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
300 Madison Avenue
Manhattan, NY 10017 |
|
Appraiser
Sage-Popovich, Inc.
|
|
Attorney
Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP
1601 Elm Street Suite 3000
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Duston McFaul
Sidley Austin LLP 1000 Louisiana Suite 6000
Houston, TX 77002 |
|
Auditor
Ernst & Young LLP
|
|
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
Creditor
0921528 BC Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
A.M.Mahallati & Co.
|
|
Creditor
ANZ Leasing (Vic) Pty. Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ANZ National Bank Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Consortium of Holders of 9.375% Senior Unsecured Notes Due 2021
325 N. St. Paul, Suite 3600
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Noteholder Group
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Airbus Helicopters (SAS)
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Angelo, Gordon & Co.
245 Park Ave., 26th Floor
New York, NY 10167 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aviall Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BNP Paribas S.A.
co Kenneth E. Noble 31 West 52nd Street, 12th Floor
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Banc of American Credit Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bank of New York Mellon
Global Corporate Trust 6525 W. Campus Oval Road Suite 200
New Albany, OH 43054 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRG Financial, LLC
100 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
Carrollton-Farmers Branch ISD
Law Offices of Robert E. Luna, P.C. 4411 N. Central Expy.
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cross Ocean Eur ESS II Sarl
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cross Ocean Partners
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cross Ocean SIF ESS II Sarl
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cross Ocean SIF ESS III Sarl
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cross Ocean USD ESS II Sarl
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cross Ocean USSS Fund I (A) LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cross Ocean USSS SIF I LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger, Goggan, Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Laurie Spindler Huffman 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dallas County Utiltity & Reclamation District
500 E Border Street Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Monica Dardi
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mark, Executor Dobbin
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ECN Capital (Aviation) Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Element Capital Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Element Financial Corporation
1 Landmark Square
Stamford, CT 06901 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Era Leasing LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Euclid Claims Recovery LLC
945 McKinney Street, PMB 434
Houston, TX 77002 |
|
Creditor
Export Development Canada
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GE Capital Aviation Services LLC and its affiliates
Sidley Austin LLP 787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GE Capital Equipment Finance Ltd. and its affiliates
Sidley Austin LLP 787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Global Helicopter Pilots Association
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HFSI One Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HSBC Bank plc, as Administrative Agent for RCF Secured Lenders
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HSBC France S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HSFUOne Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Health Administration Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Helicopter Support, Inc. d/b/a Sikorsky Commercial, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hunter Aero Trim
|
|
Creditor
KLS Diversified Asset Management LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KPMG Law Advokatfirma AS
|
|
Creditor
KPMG Tax AS
|
|
Creditor
LCI Helicopters (Ireland) Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Law Debenture Trust Company of New York
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Leonardo Helicopter (1) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Leonardo Helicopter (2) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Leonardo Helicopter (3) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Leonardo Helicopter (4) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Leonardo Helicopter (5) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Leonardo Helicopter (6) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Leonardo Helicopter (7) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jeannette A. Lietzau
13 Addison Lane
Bella Vista, AR 72715 |
|
Creditor
Roy A. Lietzau
13 Addison Lane
Bella Vista, AK 72715 |
|
Creditor
Lombard North Central PLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Macquarie Rotarcraft Leasing (Ireland), Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oerlikon Metco (US) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Omni Taxi Aereo S.A
Greenberg Traurig, LLP 1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 1700
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter Nemer c/o Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St., 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Parilease S.A.S.
co Kenneth E. Noble 31 West 52nd Street, 12th Floor
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pratt & Whitney Component Solutions
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Precision Aviation Group, Inc. d/b/a Precision Accessories & Instruments
495 Lake Mirror Road, Bldg. 800
Atlanta, GA 30349 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Precision Heliparts, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pryor Cashman LLP
7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Safran Helicopter Engines S.A.S.
|
|
Creditor
Safran Helicopter Engines USA, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
|
|
Creditor
Sandycove Aviation Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC
19772 MacArthur Blvd # 200
Irvine, CA 92612 |
|
Creditor
Sparebank 1 SR-Finans AS
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sparebanken Finans Nord-Norge AS
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TURBOMECA USA
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Milestone Aviation Group Limited and its affiliates
Sidley Austin LLP 787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Waypoint Leasing (Ireland) Limited and its affiliates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of CHC Group Ltd.
Gardere Wynne Sewell 3000 Thanksgiving Tower 1601 Elm Street
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
VLC Associates, Ltd
2 W. Delaware Place, Ste 1807
Chicago, IL 60610 |
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
PJT Partners LP
280 Park Ave
New York, NY 10017 |
|
Financial Advisor
Seabury Corporate Advisors LLC
1350 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019 |
|
Interested Party
Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
JAS Forwarding (USA), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Lobo Leasing SPV A Limited
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
William R. McKenzie
4550 E. Wild Coyote Trl.
Tucson, AZ 85739 |
|
Interested Party
Moody's Investors Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc., as Administrative Agent
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Smith, Gambrill & Russell, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States Securities & Exchange Commission
175 W. Jackson Blvd. Suite 900
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Represented By
|
Other Professional
CDG Group, LLC
650 Fifth Ave
New York, NY 10019 |
|
Other Professional
Robert A. Del Genio
co CDG Group, LLC, 650 Fifth Ave
New York, NY 10019 |
|
Other Professional
Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC
|
|
Other Professional
Greenhill & Co, LLC
300 Park Ave
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
DLA Piper
|
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022 |
|
Spec. Counsel
Mourant Ozannes
|
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Represented By
|
1. | CHC Group emerges from Chapter 11 Bankruptcy after receiving $300M in new capital (airmedandrescue.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/27/2017 | |
2. | CHC seeks Chapter 11 protection after failing to keep a market capitalization of $15 million (oedigital.com) |
Submitted Thu 05/05/2016 | |
3. | Helicopter Operator CHC Group Files for Bankruptcy Protection (wsj.com) |
Submitted Fri 05/06/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago |