California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:16-mj-01282
Case Filed:May 04, 2016
Terminated:May 12, 2016
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2018 12:02 AM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Steven Lee
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ramon Hernandez-Betamen (1)
Terminated: 05/12/2016
Represented By
Samuel L. Eilers
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info


Wednesday, May 04, 2016
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ramon Hernandez-Betamen(dls)(jrd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Ramon Hernandez-Betamen: Initial Appearance set for 5/4/2016 before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes.. (no document attached) (tkl)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Initial Appearance as to Ramon Hernandez-Betamen held on 5/4/2016. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Ramon Hernandez-Betamen. Bond set as to Ramon Hernandez-Betamen (1) No Bail. Govt oral motion to detain (flight). Detention Hearing - RF set for 5/10/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Preliminary Hearing set for 05/17/2016 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes.Arraignment set for 05/31/2016 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes.F/A submitted.(Interpreter Salvador Castellanos). (CD# 5/4/2016 3:10-3:20). (Plaintiff Attorney Alicia Williams, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Kimberly Trimble and Becky Fish, FD). (no document attached) (tkl)
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Ramon Hernandez-Betamen (no document attached) (tkl)
Related: [-]
5 5 Oral MOTION to Detain by USA as to Ramon Hernandez-Betamen. (no document attached) (tkl)
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Ramon Hernandez-Betamen (tkl)
Related: [-]