Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Hugh Lawson
Referred: Wallace Capel, Jr
Case #: 3:16-cv-00325
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 06, 2016
Terminated:Sep 13, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 02, 2016 4:04 AM CDT
Defendant
David Peyser Sportswear, Inc.
90 Pence Street
Bay Shore, NY 11706
Represented By
Michael Sandlin Denniston
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Jonathan Corley Hill
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
John Edward Goodman
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Carrie Meade Hartfield
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Defendant
MV Corp., Inc.
16 Downing Drive
Phenix City, AL 36869
Represented By
Michael Sandlin Denniston
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Jonathan Corley Hill
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
John Edward Goodman
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Carrie Meade Hartfield
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Defendant
Alan Peyser
individually 1 Merrall Drive
Lawrence, NY 11559
Represented By
Michael Sandlin Denniston
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Jonathan Corley Hill
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
John Edward Goodman
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Carrie Meade Hartfield
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joshua Peyser
Represented By
Michael Sandlin Denniston
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Jonathan Corley Hill
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
John Edward Goodman
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Carrie Meade Hartfield
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Delta Apparel, Inc.
Represented By
Joshua Lyle Howard
Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice
contact info
Thomas Richard DeBray, Jr
Balch & Bingham, LLP
contact info
Will Hill Tankersley, Jr.
Balch & Bingham, LLP
contact info
Michael Sylvester Cashman
Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice
contact info
Plaintiff
Salt Life, LLC
Represented By
Joshua Lyle Howard
Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice
contact info
Thomas Richard DeBray, Jr
Balch & Bingham, LLP
contact info
Will Hill Tankersley, Jr.
Balch & Bingham, LLP
contact info
Michael Sylvester Cashman
Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Computer Generated Solutions, Inc.
CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Inc. 150 S. Perry Street
Montgomery, AL 36104
Represented By
Stephen Errol Whitehead
Lloyd Gray Whitehead & Monroe
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
David Peyser Sportswear, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Sandlin Denniston
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Jonathan Corley Hill
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
John Edward Goodman
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Carrie Meade Hartfield
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
MV Corp., Inc.
Represented By
Michael Sandlin Denniston
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Jonathan Corley Hill
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
John Edward Goodman
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Carrie Meade Hartfield
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Alan Peyser
Represented By
Michael Sandlin Denniston
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Jonathan Corley Hill
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
John Edward Goodman
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Carrie Meade Hartfield
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Joshua Peyser
Represented By
Michael Sandlin Denniston
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Jonathan Corley Hill
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
John Edward Goodman
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Carrie Meade Hartfield
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
85 85 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 09/13 3:50 PM
ORDER GRANTING 84 Joint MOTION to Dismiss; therefore ORDERING that all claims asserted by Plaintiffs Delta Apparel, Inc., Salt Life, LLC (f/k/a To The Game, LLC), in the above-captioned action are dismissed with prejudice; further ORDERING that the court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Parties' mutually agreed Confidential Settlement and Release Agreement upon a motion by either party and court order. Signed by Honorable Judge Hugh Lawson on 9/13/17. (djy, )
Related: [-]
84 84 motion Dismiss Wed 09/13 11:23 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Delta Apparel, Inc..(Howard, Joshua) Modified on 9/13/2017 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of David Peyser Sportswear, Inc., MV Corp., Inc., Joshua Peyser, & Alan Peyser (qc/djy, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss