North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:N C Tilley, Jr
Referred: L Patrick Auld
Case #: 1:16-cv-00441
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:7407 IRS Civil Injunction
Case Filed:May 11, 2016
Terminated:Mar 19, 2018
Last checked: Monday Nov 07, 2016 4:39 AM EST
Defendant
LESLIE LOUISE BREWSTER
28790-057 HAZELTON FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 5000
BRUCETON MILLS, WV 26525
Defendant
JENNIFER DIANE BULLOCK
252 Lynnbank Estates Road
Kittrell, NC 27544
Defendant
NNEKA AYANNA DAVIS
30167-057 RRM RALEIGH OLD NC 75 HIGHWAY
BUTNER, NC 27509
Defendant
SAICHELLE CHARI MCNEILL
1911 Greymouth Road Apt. 306
Charlotte, NC 28262
Defendant
TIFFANY LADEVA ROGERS
28779-057 ALDERSON FEDERAL PRISON CAMP Inmate Mail/Parcels GLEN RAY RD. BOX A
ALDERSON, WV 24910
Defendant
DAWN KIRBY WILLIAMS
28780-057 RRM RALEIGH OLD NC 75 HIGHWAY
BUTNER, NC 27509
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES
DOJ Tax Division P.O. Box 227
Washington, DC 20044
Represented By
RICHARD J. HAGERMAN
U. S. Department Of Justice
contact info
STEPHANIE A. SASARAK
U. S. Department Of Justice
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
NIKKI ANNE BREWSTER
Terminated: 09/29/2016
56641-053 MARIANNA FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 7007
MARIANNA, FL 32447
Defendant
KEITH DARNELL DILLARD, JR.
Terminated: 09/29/2016
30169-057 PHILADELPHIA RRM 2nd & Chestnut St. 7th Floor
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106
Defendant
TASHA RENEE SMITH
Terminated: 09/29/2016
30086-057 RRM RALEIGH OLD NC 75 HIGHWAY
BUTNER, NC 27509
Defendant
CLAUDE ARTHUR VERBAL, II
Terminated: 09/29/2016
98879-004 BUTNER MEDIUM I FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 1000
BUTNER, NC 27509


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
35 35 misc Mail Returned Tue 04/10 3:59 PM
Envelope Containing34 Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction, addressed to LESLIE LOUISE BREWSTER #28790-057 FCI HAZELTON P.O. BOX 5000, BRUCETON MILLS, WV 26526` returned to court by postal service, marked undeliverable because Not Deliverable as Addressed (Inmate release 9/1/2017 per BOP website). (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 19, 2018
34 34 order Judgment Permanent Injunction Mon 03/19 4:51 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION against defendants Leslie Louise Brewster, Nneka Ayanna Davis, Tiffany Ladeva Rogers, and Dawn Kirby Williams. Signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 3/19/2018. (Daniel, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
utility Motions Submitted Wed 08/02 12:17 PM
Motions Submitted:33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Leslie Louise Brewster, Nneka Ayanna Davis, Tiffany Ladeva Rogers, and Dawn Kirby Williams to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. (Winchester, Robin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2017
33 33 motion Default Judgment Fri 06/16 1:59 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Leslie Louise Brewster, Nneka Ayanna Davis, Tiffany Ladeva Rogers, and Dawn Kirby Williams by UNITED STATES. Response to Motion due by 7/10/2017(SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 20, 2017
32 32 order Permanent Injunction Mon 03/20 4:33 PM
STIPULATED JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to JENNIFER DIANE BULLOCK. Signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 3/20/2017. (Daniel, J)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Permanent Injunction Mon 03/20 4:31 PM
STIPULATED JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to SAICHELLE CHARI MCNEILL. Signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 3/20/2017. (Daniel, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2017
30 30 order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Thu 02/23 2:16 PM
Clerk's Entry of DEFAULT AGAINST JENNIFER DIANE BULLOCK signed by JOHN S. BRUBAKER on 2/23/2017 for failing to plead or otherwise defend in this action. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
29 29 motion Entry of Default Wed 02/22 4:22 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Jennifer Diane Bullock by UNITED STATES.(SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 09, 2016
misc Mail Returned Fri 12/09 2:51 PM
Envelope Containing28 Clerk's Entry of Default addressed to DAWN KIRBY WILLIAMS #28780-057 RALEIGH RRM OLD NC 75 HIGHWAY BUTNER, NC 27509. returned to court by postal service, marked undeliverable because Released 9/23/2016. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Returned Fri 12/09 2:58 PM
Envelope Containing28 Clerk's Entry of Default addressed to NNEKA AYANNA DAVIS #30167-057 RALEIGH RRM OLD NC 75 HIGHWAY BUTNER, NC 27509 returned to court by postal service, marked undeliverable because Released. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2016
28 28 order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Wed 11/09 12:27 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default signed by John S. Brubaker on 11/9/2016 as to defendants Leslie Louis Brewster, Nneka Ayanna Davis, Saichelle Chari McNeill, Tiffany Ladeva Rogers, and Dawn Kirby Williams pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), for failing to plead or otherwise defend in this action. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2016
27 27 motion Entry of Default Tue 11/08 12:09 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendants Leslie Louise Brewster, Nneka Ayanna Davis, Saichelle Chari McNeill, Tiffany Ladeva Rogers, and Dawn Kirby Williams by UNITED STATES.(SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Sasarak Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default
Thursday, September 29, 2016
26 26 order Permanent Injunction Thu 09/29 9:47 AM
STIPULATED JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to TASHA RENEE SMITH. Signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 9/29/2016. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Permanent Injunction Thu 09/29 9:46 AM
STIPULATED JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to KEITH DARNELL DILLARD, JR. Signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 9/29/2016. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Permanent Injunction Thu 09/29 9:45 AM
STIPULATED JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to NIKKI ANNE BREWSTER. Signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 9/29/2016. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Permanent Injunction Thu 09/29 9:43 AM
STIPULATED JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to CLAUDE ARTHUR VERBAL, II. Signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 9/29/2016. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2016
22 22 service Waiver of Service of Summons Fri 08/19 10:06 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by UNITED STATES. JENNIFER DIANE BULLOCK waiver sent on 8/9/2016, answer due 10/11/2016. (SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2016
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Order on Motion for Service by Publication Tue 08/16 12:02 PM
TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part16 Motion to Extend Time to Effect Service and for Leave to Serve by Publication and extending the deadline for the United States to make service on Defendant Jennifer Diane Bullock to 11/07/2016. The United States has established good cause under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) for the requested extension of time to effect service; however, it is premature to conclude that service of process reasonably cannot be made by means other than publication. As to the latter matter, given Defendant Bullock's status as a supervised releasee, it would seem steps beyond having a process server make cold-calls on her residence might reasonably be available to secure personal service. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 08/16/2016. (AULD, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2016
21 21 misc Withdrawal of Motion Thu 08/11 12:24 PM
WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Plaintiff UNITED STATES re18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Leslie Louise Brewster filed by UNITED STATES . (SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2016
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/09 2:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES as to LESLIE LOUISE BREWSTER served on 8/9/2016, answer due 8/30/2016. (SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 08/09 9:35 AM
Motions Referred: RE:18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Leslie Louise Brewster , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Winchester, Robin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2016
19 19 3 pgs respm Memorandum Mon 08/08 3:10 PM
MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES re18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Leslie Louise Brewster filed by UNITED STATES.(SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stephanie Sasarak,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
18 18 motion Extension of Time-Other Mon 08/08 3:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Leslie Louise Brewster by UNITED STATES. (SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 08/08 2:07 PM
Motions Referred: RE:16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Bullock MOTION for Service by Publication upon defendant Bullock , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Winchester, Robin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2016
17 17 3 pgs respm Memorandum Fri 08/05 10:46 AM
MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES re16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Bullock MOTION for Service by Publication upon defendant Bullock filed by UNITED STATES.(SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stephanie Sasarak,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, August 04, 2016
16 16 motion Extension of Time-Other Service by Publication Thu 08/04 2:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Bullock , MOTION for Service by Publication upon defendant Bullock by UNITED STATES.(SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Stephanie Sasarak,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, July 14, 2016
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/14 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RICHARD J. HAGERMAN on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES (HAGERMAN, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2016
utility Case Referred to Judge Wed 07/13 2:00 PM
CASE REFERRED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR regarding Stipulations of Claude Verbal, II, Nikki Ann Brewster and Keith Darnell Dillard, Jr. (Winchester, Robin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2016
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/11 9:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES as to SAICHELLE CHARI MCNEILL served on 7/2/2016, answer due 7/25/2016. (SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2016
13 13 misc Stipulation Fri 07/08 1:54 PM
STIPULATION to entry of permanent injunction by defendant Dillard and United States by UNITED STATES.(SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
12 12 misc Stipulation Fri 07/08 1:53 PM
STIPULATION to entry of permanent injunction by defedant Nikki Anne Brewster and United States by UNITED STATES.(SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
11 11 misc Stipulation Fri 07/08 1:51 PM
STIPULATION to entry of permanent injunction by defedant Verbal and United States by UNITED STATES.(SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 27, 2016
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/27 2:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES as to NIKKI ANNE BREWSTER served on 6/17/2016, answer due 7/8/2016. (SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2016
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/14 4:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES as to DAWN KIRBY WILLIAMS served on 6/7/2016, answer due 6/28/2016. (SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/14 4:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES as to TIFFANY LADEVA ROGERS served on 6/7/2016, answer due 6/28/2016. (SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/14 4:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES as to TASHA RENEE SMITH served on 6/10/2016, answer due 7/1/2016. (SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/14 3:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES as to NNEKA AYANNA DAVIS served on 6/8/2016, answer due 6/29/2016. (SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/14 3:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES as to CLAUDE ARTHUR VERBAL, II served on 6/10/2016, answer due 7/1/2016. (SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2016
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/06 3:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES as to KEITH DARNELL DILLARD, JR served on 5/31/2016, answer due 6/21/2016. (SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2016
3 3 notice Notice of Right to Consent Thu 05/12 4:38 PM
Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties.(Coyne, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 05/12 4:37 PM
Summons Issued as to LESLIE LOUISE BREWSTER, NIKKI ANNE BREWSTER, JENNIFER DIANE BULLOCK, NNEKA AYANNA DAVIS, KEITH DARNELL DILLARD, JR, SAICHELLE CHARI MCNEILL, TIFFANY LADEVA ROGERS, TASHA RENEE SMITH, CLAUDE ARTHUR VERBAL, II, DAWN KIRBY WILLIAMS.(Coyne, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verbal,
Att: 2 Smith,
Att: 3 Rogers,
Att: 4 L. Brewster,
Att: 5 Brewster,
Att: 6 McNeill,
Att: 7 Dillard,
Att: 8 Davis,
Att: 9 Bullock
Wednesday, May 11, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/11 11:11 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by UNITED STATES.(SASARAK, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet