Linn Midwest Energy LLC DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE. Jointly Administered under Case #16-60040-H2-11. This message does not apply to adversary proceedings or claims registers.
Member Case
Lead case is: 6:16-bk-60040
Lead case is: 6:16-bk-60040
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 6:16-bk-60048 |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 5,001-10,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Linn Midwest Energy LLC
JPMorgan Chase Tower 600 Travis, Suite 5100
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
trustee
Remark (batch)
Tue 10/17 5:17 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. . (DawnaKelly) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 10/15 1:54 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ltie) |
||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Objection
Tue 01/17 3:40 PM
Objection by Automotive Rentals Inc. to Plan of Reoganization . Filed by Automotive Rentals Inc. (Holmes, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Thu 01/05 2:31 PM
Withdrawal of Claim: 12 (Siewert, Kara) |
|
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Mon 07/11 7:23 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual (Filed By Linn Midwest Energy LLC ). (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Schedule A/B
Mon 07/11 7:22 PM
Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H Non-Individual- Codebtors (Filed By Linn Midwest Energy LLC ). (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Saturday, May 14, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/14 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/14/2016. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/14 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/14/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
court
Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Submitted
Fri 05/13 4:45 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of Social Security Number Filed. Does this document change the social security number for one or more debtors?. Has the Meeting of Creditors been set in this case?. (mmap) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
court
Document
Thu 05/12 3:27 PM
An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: Linn Energy, LLC, Case No. 16-60040 Berry Petroleum Company, LLC, Case No. 16-60041 LinnCo, LLC, Case No. 16-60042 Linn Acquisition Company, LLC, Case No. 16-60043 Linn Energy Finance Corp., Case No. 16-60044 Linn Energy Holdings, LLC, Case No. 16-60039 Linn Exploration & Production Michigan LLC, Case No. 16-60045 Linn Exploration Midcontinent, LLC, Case No. 16-60046 Linn Midstream, LLC, Case No. 16-60047 Linn Midwest Energy LLC, Case No. 16-60048 Linn Operating, Inc., Case No. 16-60049 Mid-Continent I, LLC, Case No. 16-60050 Mid-Continent II, LLC, Case No. 16-60051 Mid-Continent Holdings I, LLC, Case No. 16-60052 Mid-Continent Holdings II, LLC, Case No. 16-60053 The docket in Case No. 16-60040 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 16-60040 (DRJ) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order for Joint Administration
Thu 05/12 2:53 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Signed on 5/12/2016. (aalo) |
|
4 | 4
court
No Creditor Mailing List
Thu 05/12 11:59 AM
No Creditor Mailing List (rsaladi) |
|
3 | 3
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Thu 05/12 6:30 AM
|
|
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 05/12 8:39 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Hector Duran (Duran, Hector) |
||
Wednesday, May 11, 2016 | ||
2 | 2 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Linn Midwest Energy LLC (Tomasco, Patricia) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1 33 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Linn Midwest Energy LLC. (Tomasco, Patricia) | |
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-60048 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 17913446. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |