Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10541

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-50726
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 11, 2016
Terminated:Jun 13, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ryan Smith & Carbine, Ltd.
Represented By
Ryan Smith & Carbine, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
SRC Liquidation, LLC
Represented By
Justin R. Alberto
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Gregory Joseph Flasser
Bayard, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, June 13, 2016
court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/13 1:06 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50726 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2016
4 4 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 06/10 5:07 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by SRC Liquidation, LLC (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, June 09, 2016
3 3 motion Approve - Motion Thu 06/09 3:56 PM
Motion to Approve Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by SRC Liquidation LLC Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by SRC Liquidation, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/27/2016 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/23/2016. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 05/12 8:41 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50726 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8012601, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2016
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 05/11 2:27 PM
Adversary case 16-50726 Complaint by SRC Liquidation, LLC against Ryan Smith & Carbine, Ltd.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 08/9/2016. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives