David Moss, et al v. Marko Princip, et al
Original Case: 3:14-cv-03088
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-pcd-10605 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 16, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 21, 2019 12:04 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellant
MARKO PRINCIP, doing business as Videogames YouTube Channel, Individually, doing business as Achievement Guide, doing business as Game Guide L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
BRYAN MARTIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
DAVID TYLER MOSS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
BRANDON KEATING
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 16 2019
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [16-10605 Affirmed and Remanded ] Judge: PEH , Judge: EHJ , Judge: JEG. Mandate issue date is 02/07/2019 [16-10605] |
Docket last updated: 02/21/2019 12:04 AM CST |
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Bryan Martin and Mr. Marko Princip 16-10605 (RAJ) |