Matheson v. Deutsche Bank National Trust
Original Case: 1:16-cv-01759
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-01543 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 15, 2017 3:33 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Matthew Maltese
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Becky North
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Caryn Edwards
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Laura Hescott
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Steve Broviak
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Dutchess County Supreme Court
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Judge Christine A. Sproat
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Peter B. Skelos, Appellate Division Justice
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Attorney Gerard J. Pisanelli
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ras Boriskin Law Office
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Linda J. Menfredi, Esq.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jeff Bondoc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Aaron Batelic
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jasco Home Improvements
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph Amorosso
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
US Best Repair
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
James Chang
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph C. Aimetti
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph F. Battista, Esq.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Indymac Bank, AKA One West Bank
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Wells Fargo National Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
America Servicing Company, AKA ASC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ocwen Financial Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
William C. Erbey, Executive Chairman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Chase Manhattan Bank, AKA JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MERCORP-INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JP Morgan Chase & Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Judge Augustus J. Agate
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Andrew Morganstern
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Frenkel, Lamber, Weis, Weisman & Gordon LLP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Marilyn E. Matheson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Yvonne E. Chaplin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/15/2017 3:28 AM EST |
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Yvonne E. Chaplin and Marilyn E. Matheson, copy to pro-se litigant sent, FILED. [1772575] 16-1543 [Entered: 05/16/2016 11:22 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/14/2016, RECEIVED.[1772606] 16-1543 [Entered: 05/16/2016 11:34 AM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/09/2016, RECEIVED.[1772635] 16-1543 [Entered: 05/16/2016 11:44 AM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Yvonne E. Chaplin and Marilyn E. Matheson, district court receipt # 4l5401152E.16, FILED.[1772641] 16-1543 [Entered: 05/16/2016 11:49 AM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, copy to pro-se litigant sent, FILED.[1772643] 16-1543 [Entered: 05/16/2016 11:51 AM] |