Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:16-cr-00131
Case Filed:May 18, 2016
Terminated:Dec 14, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 06, 2017 6:14 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Shawn Smith-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Kate Rumsey-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Chad Everett Clifton (1)
Terminated: 12/14/2016
Represented By
Raul A Canez
Law Office Of Raul A Canez
contact info
Douglas C Greene, Sr
Greene Law Firm
contact info
Peter Michael Fleury-FPD
Federal Public Defender - Fort Worth
contact info
Cody Cofer-FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Shawn Douglas Cropp (4)
Terminated: 10/18/2016
Represented By
Emily Louise LaChance
Schneider Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Jack Gossett (2)
Terminated: 11/08/2016
Represented By
Leon Haley, Jr
Law Office Of Leon Haley
contact info
Loren Green
Green Law Texas
contact info
Defendant
Mandy Marie Turner (3)
Terminated: 10/04/2016
Represented By
Kara L. Carreras
Goza Carreras PC
contact info
Defendant
Michael Lyle Young (5)
Terminated: 10/18/2016
Represented By
William Reynolds Biggs
William R Biggs PLLC
contact info

GPO Jun 15 2016
Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Shawn Douglas Cropp. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 6/15/2016.) (mlm)

Docket last updated: 04/17/2021 3:06 AM CDT
Monday, March 28, 2016
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Albert Ceniceros (1), Chad Everett Clifton (2), Silton Russell Goutreaux (3), Brian Thomas Gibbons (4), Jack Gossett (5), Terri Faulkner (6), Jennifer Marie Morrison (7), Chris Sphabmisai (8), Candace Whitten (9). (jah) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Rondalyn Joy Addison (1), Shawn Douglas Cropp (2), Kacey Croxton (3), Stephanie Ann Hatley (4), Michael Clay Heaslet (5), Michael Jordan (6), Larry Daniel Maxey (7), James Allen Owens (8), Trae Short (9). (jah) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Jerry Duarte (1), Billy Fred Gentry, Jr (2), Avelino Gresham (3), Chayce Daniel Hodges (4), Kari Nicole Neal (5), Terry Ryan Nichols (6), Hector Berzosa Pando (7), Martha Jane Rodgers (8), Jonathan Ruckman (9), Chad Shulka (10), Shauna Lynn Vickers (11), Adrian Blair Wallace (12), Michael Lyle Young (13), Brian Lee Zimmerman (14). (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2016
Arrest of Albert Ceniceros, Jack Gossett, Jennifer Marie Morrison, Candace Whitten (jah) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to Chad Everett Clifton to Appear Instanter before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton, Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/1/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2016
7 7 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Loren Green for Jack Gossett appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/4/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
10 10 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Albert Ceniceros, Jack Gossett, Jennifer Marie Morrison, Candace Whitten held on 4/4/2016. Date of Arrest: 4/1/2016. Defts executed financial affidavits; O/appointing atty Rob Herrington for Deft Ceniceros; atty Loren Green for Deft Gossett; atty Randy Nunn for Deft Morrison; atty John Stickels for Deft Whitten entered; Preliminary & detention hearing set 4/7/16 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; O/temp detention entered. Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - n/a. (Court Reporter: remote Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :05. (jah) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
12 12 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jack Gossett. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
15 15 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Albert Ceniceros, Jack Gossett, Jennifer Marie Morrison, Candace Whitten. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION AND SCHEDULING DETENTION AND PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Albert Ceniceros, Jack Gossett, Jennifer Marie Morrison, Candace Whitten: Detention Hearing set for 4/7/2016 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/4/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2016
18 18 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/1/2016 as to Albert Ceniceros, Jack Gossett, Jennifer Marie Morrison, Candace Whitten. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2016
19 19 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Detention & Preliminary Hearing as to Albert Ceniceros, Jack Gossett, Jennifer Marie Morrison, Candace Whitten held on 4/7/2016, Preliminary Hearing as to Albert Ceniceros, Jack Gossett, Jennifer Marie Morrison, Candace Whitten held on 4/7/2016. Gov't witness Travis Dendy sworn & testified; Defense witness Melody Mitchell sworn & testified as to Deft Ceniceros; Defense witness Chelsea Hughes sworn & testified as to Deft Morrison; Court finds PC as to all Defts; o/detention as to Deft Gossett & Whitten entered; Defts Ceniceros & Morrison executed PR bonds and advised of conditions of pretrial release; O/setting conditions of pretrial release entered as to both Defts released on conditions Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Rob Herrington; Loren Green; Randall Nunn; John Stickels. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:05. (jah) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
21 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Loren Green appearing for Jack Gossett. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting15 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to Jack Gossett (5). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/7/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
Chad Everett Clifton appeared on a writ (jah) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
29 29 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Jack Gossett (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
36 36 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Chad Everett Clifton held on 4/12/2016. Appeared on writ: 4/12/2016; Deft executed financial affidavit; O/appointing atty Cody Cofer entered; Deft waives PC & Detention; Court finds PC; O/detention pending trial entered; Deft allowed to reopen detention at later date; Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Cody Cofer. (Court Reporter: Ana Warren) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (jah) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
37 37 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Cody L Cofer for Chad Everett Clifton appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
38 38 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Chad Everett Clifton. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
39 39 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cody L Cofer appearing for Chad Everett Clifton. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
41 41 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Chad Everett Clifton. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
42 42 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting41 Motion for Detention as to Chad Everett Clifton (2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2016
43 43 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 28 Joint Motion to Continue as to Albert Ceniceros (1); granting29 Joint Motion to Continue as to Jack Gossett (5); granting 30 Joint Motion to Continue as to Jennifer Marie Morrison (7); granting 31 Joint Motion to Continue as to Candace Whitten (9) CONTINUED UNTIL 5/19/16 (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/13/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2016
44 44 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Chad Everett Clifton (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
Shawn Douglas Cropp appeared on ASR (jah) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
Terry Ryan Nichols, Michael Lyle Young appeared on writs (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested.) as to Mandy Marie Turner (1). (plp) [4:16-mj-00253-BJ]
Related: [-]
47 47 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Emily Louise LaChance for Shawn Douglas Cropp appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (wrb) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
48 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Shawn Douglas Cropp held on 4/22/2016. Date of Appearance on writ 4/22/2016. Preliminary and Detention hearing set for 4/26/16 at 10:30 am; AUSA read complaint; order of temp detention entered; deft remanded. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Emily LaChance, appointed. (Court Reporter: 2) Related [+] (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (wrb) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-] mote
49 49 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Shawn Douglas Cropp (wrb) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
50 50 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Emily Louise LaChance appearing for Shawn Douglas Cropp (wrb) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
51 51 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting44 Motion to Continue as to Chad Everett Clifton (2); granting 45 Motion to Continue as to Terri Faulkner (6): continued until 5/19/2016. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00165-BJ]
Related: [-]
51 51 Government's MOTION for pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Shawn Douglas Cropp (wrb) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
52 52 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION AND SCHEDULING PRELIMINARY AND DETENTION HEARING as to Shawn Douglas Cropp: Detention Hearing set for 4/26/2016 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/26/2016 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. Re:51 MOTION for pretrial Detention (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (wrb) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
60 60 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney William Reynolds Biggs for Michael Lyle Young appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (wxc) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
61 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Terry Ryan Nichols, Michael Lyle Young held on 4/22/2016. Date of Arrest: 4/22/2016. Defendant young waives probably cause and detention. Defendant remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Brett Boone for Terry Nichols and William Biggs for Michael Young. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :2. (wxc) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
63 63 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Michael Lyle Young (wxc) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
65 65 Entry of Appearance of Counsel by William Reynolds Biggs appearing for Michael Lyle Young (wxc) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
66 66 Government's Motion for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Terry Ryan Nichols, Michael Lyle Young (wxc) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
68 68 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL66 Motion for Detention as to Michael Lyle Young GRANTED (13) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (wxc) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2016
54 54 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Detention & Preliminary Hearing as to Shawn Douglas Cropp held on 4/26/2016, Gov't witness Mike McCurdy sworn & testified; defense proffered testimony; Court finds PC; O/detention pending trial entered; Deft continued in custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Emily LaChance. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :35. (jah) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
55 55 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting51 Motion for Detention as to Shawn Douglas Cropp (2) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/26/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2016
3 3 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to Mandy Marie Turner to Appear on Instanter at Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. certified copy to USM and AUSA (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 5/4/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00253-BJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2016
74 74 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Shawn Douglas Cropp (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2016
75 75 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting74 Joint Motion to Continue to Indict as to Shawn Douglas Cropp (2): continued until 6/16/16 (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 5/13/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2016
Mandy Marie Turner appeared on writ (jah) [4:16-mj-00253-BJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Kara Carreras for Mandy Marie Turner appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 5/16/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00253-BJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Mandy Marie Turner held on 5/16/2016. Date of Arrest: 5/16/2016 appeared on writ; Deft executed financial affidavit; O/appointing Atty Kara Carreras entered; Deft waives detention at this time; Deft allowed to reopen detention at later date; Preliminary hearing set 5/19/16 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; O/detention pending trial entered; Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Kara Carreras. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (jah) [4:16-mj-00253-BJ]
Related: [-]
7 7 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Mandy Marie Turner (jah) [4:16-mj-00253-BJ]
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Mandy Marie Turner (jah) [4:16-mj-00253-BJ]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting8 Motion for Detention as to Mandy Marie Turner (1) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 5/16/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00253-BJ]
Related: [-]
10 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Mandy Marie Turner: Preliminary Hearing set for 5/19/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. Attorneys & Deft to be in courtroom 15 minutes prior to hearing start time. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 5/16/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00253-BJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2016
90 90 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Michael Lyle Young (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
92 92 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting90 Joint Motion to Continue Time to Indict as to Michael Lyle Young (13): continued to June 16, 2016 (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 5/17/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2016
66 66 INDICTMENT as to Chad Everett Clifton (1) count(s) 1, Jack Gossett (2) count(s) 1. (wxc)
Related: [-]
68 68 ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Chad Everett Clifton, Jack Gossett: Arraignment set for 5/25/2016 at 9:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. Re:66 Indictment. All attorneys are to be present in the courtroom no later than 9:00am. (Ordered by Judge Reed C O'Connor on 5/18/2016) (chmb)
Related: [-]
69 69 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Chad Everett Clifton, Jack Gossett: Jury Trial set for 6/28/2016 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C O'Connor. Motions due by 6/7/2016. (Ordered by Judge Reed C O'Connor on 5/18/2016) (trt).
Related: [-]